Health Dimensions Rehabilitation, Inc., et al. v. RehabCare Group Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:07-cv-03294
District Judge Paul A. Magnuson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Health Dimensions Rehabilitation, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M Bye +1 612 371 3259 +1 612 371 3207 jbye@lindquist.com
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "United States of America, ex rel."

Toggle Switch Represented by Joyce-NA R. Branda

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joyce-NA R. Branda

Toggle Switch Represented by Susan-NA C. Lynch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan-NA C. Lynch

Toggle Switch Represented by Tracy-NA L. Hilmer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tracy-NA L. Hilmer

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad A Blumenfield +1 612 664 5600 chad.blumenfield@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory G Brooker +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 greg.brooker@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bahram Samie +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 bahram.samie@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D Gerald Wilhelm +1 612 664 5600 gerald.wilhelm@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Health Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rehab Systems of Missouri, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean C Cenawood +1 212 768 6700 sean.cenawood@dentons.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Charles Colton +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 glenn.colton@dentons.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. McCarty Thornton +1 301 814 4155 d.mccarty.thornton@snrdenton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael M Krauss +1 612 766 8514 +1 612 766 1600 mkrauss@faegre.com
No Logo Rehabcare Group East, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rehabcare Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Armstrong Teasdale LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James G. Martin +1 314 621 5070 jmartin@armstrongteasdale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L. Schultz +1 314 621 5070 +1 314 621 5065 jschultz@armstrongteasdale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Sindberg Porter +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 esindbergporter@greeneespel.com
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 5/3/2012 before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (58 pages). Court Reporter: Ron Moen (E-mail: Ron_Moen@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1222). Redaction Request due 6/11/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (RJM) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (RJM) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
      Memorandum and Order: 1) Denying without prejudice RehabCare Group and RehabCare Group East's Motion to Dismiss 55 ; 2) Granting RehabCare Group and RehabCare Group East's Motion to Transfer Venue 57 ; and 3) Denying without prejudice in part and Granting in part Health Systems, Inc. and Rehab Systems of Missouri's Motion to Transfer or, in the alternative, to Dismiss 60 . This matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by The Honorable Paul A. Magnuson on 05/08/2012. (LLM) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Appearance by Bahram Samie on behalf of United States of America, ex rel.. (Samie, Bahram) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri re 97 Notice of Appearance, 99 Notice of Appearance, 98 Notice of Appearance for Sean Cenawood, Glenn Colton and D. McCarty Thornton (Krauss, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by D. Mccarty Thornton on behalf of Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Krauss, Michael) Modified text on 4/25/2012 (MMP). (Entered: 04/25/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Colton on behalf of Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Krauss, Michael) Modified text on 4/25/2012 (MMP). (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance Sean C. Cenawood on behalf of Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Krauss, Michael) Modified text on 4/25/2012 (MMP). (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for D. McCarty Thornton by Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Krauss, Michael) Fee paid. Receipt number 4-62192. Modified on 4/24/2012 (MAP). (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc. re 94 Reply to Response to Motion, 93 Reply to Response to Motion (Martin, James) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 57 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Martin, James) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 55 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Martin, James) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                          REPLY re 86 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Cenawood, Sean) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                            LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri . (Krauss, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 60 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss/General , 55 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Health Dimensions Rehabilitation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bye, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 60 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss/General , 57 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Health Dimensions Rehabilitation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bye, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION of Chad A. Blumenfield re 87 Response in Opposition to Motion, by United States of America, ex rel. . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C)(Blumenfield, Chad) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss/General , 55 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by United States of America, ex rel.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blumenfield, Chad) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss/General , 57 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by United States of America, ex rel.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blumenfield, Chad) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey L. Schultz by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for James G. Martin by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service By Mail)(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc. re 55 MOTION to Dismiss/General Complaint (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc. re 77 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc. re 80 Declaration in Support, 78 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 79 Declaration in Support Motion to Transfer/Change Venue, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc. re 57 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Declaration of James Lincoln in Support of 78 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 57 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc.. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Declaration of Patricia Henry in Support of 58 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 78 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc.. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 57 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 55 MOTION to Dismiss/General Complaint filed by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                          EXHIBIT INDEX re 72 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B)(Cenawood, Sean) Modified TEXT on 3/16/2012 (MMP). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri re 74 Declaration in Support, 72 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 73 Declaration in Support.(Cenawood, Sean) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Declaration of Patricia Henry in Support of 60 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Cenawood, Sean) Modified on 3/15/2012 (kt). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                Declaration of James Lincoln in Support of 60 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Cenawood, Sean) Modified on 3/15/2012 (kt). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 60 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Attachments: # 1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: REFILE WITH INDEX Exhibit(s) A, # 2 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: REFILE WITH INDEX Exhibit(s) B, # 3 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cenawood, Sean) Modified on 3/15/2012 (kt). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE by United States of America, ex rel. of Consent to Voluntary Partial Dismissal (Blumenfield, Chad) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Glenn Colton by Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Krauss, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE by Health Dimensions Rehabilitation, Inc. of Partial Dismissal (Bye, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 1 Complaint, Acknowledgement filed by Health Dimensions Rehabilitation, Inc.. (Bye, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri re 66 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Glenn Colton, 60 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss/General , 64 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Sean C. Cenawood, 63 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 61 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 65 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for D. McCarty Thornton, 62 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Krauss, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Glenn Colton by Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Krauss, Michael) Modified on 2/10/2012 (MMP). (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR--REPLACED BY DOCUMENT 96--MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for D. McCarty Thornton by Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Krauss, Michael) Modified on 4/24/2012 (MAP). (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Sean C. Cenawood by Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Krauss, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Krauss, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Krauss, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 60 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Krauss, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Dismiss/General by Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Krauss, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc. re 58 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 57 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue , 55 MOTION to Dismiss/General , 56 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 57 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue : Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc.. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 55 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss/General by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc.. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Michael M Krauss on behalf of Health Systems, Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Krauss, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc. re 52 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 51 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 50 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, Defendant RehabCare Group Inc., by and through its undersigned counsel, hereby states that it is a Delaware corporation that is wholly owned by RehabCare Group, Inc. RehabCare Group, Inc. is wholly owned by Kindred Healthcare Operating, Inc. Kindred Healthcare Operating Inc. is wholly owned by Kindred Healthcare, Inc., a publicly traded company. (Luger, Andrew) Modified text on 1/24/2012 (MMP). Modified on 1/25/2012 (jz). (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, Defendant RehabCare Group East, Inc., by and through its undersigned counsel, hereby states that it is a Delaware corporation that is wholly owned by RehabCare Group, Inc. RehabCare Group, Inc. is wholly owned by Kindred Healthcare Operating, Inc. Kindred Healthcare Operating Inc. is wholly owned by Kindred Healthcare, Inc., a publicly traded company. (Luger, Andrew) Modified text on 1/24/2012 (MMP). (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for RehabCare Group East, Inc., RehabCare Group, Inc.. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against RehabCare Group Inc., Rehab Systems of Missouri, Health Systems Inc., Rehabcare Group East Inc., filed by United States of America, ex rel.. (Blumenfield, Chad) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: AMENDED COMPLAINT against Health Dimensions Rehabilitation, Inc., RehabCare Group Inc., filed by United States of America, ex rel.. (Blumenfield, Chad) Modified on 12/5/2011 (TSS). (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ELECTION TO INTERVENE IN PART AND TO DECLINE TO INTERVENE IN PART by United States of America, ex rel. (Attachments: Proposed Order, Certificate of Service and Cover Letter) (akl) Modified on 8/10/2011 (TSS). (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 08/05/11. (TSS) Modified on 8/9/2011 (TSS). (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against RehabCare Group Inc. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 14691.) assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Filed by Health Dimensions Rehabilitation, Inc. Civil Cover Sheet.(LJG) Modified on 7/12/2007 (mkc). Modified on 08/10/11. (TSS) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 203 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?