Claudia Herrera et al v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-02702-SVW-MAN
District Judge Stephen V. Wilson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 9:03 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Claudia Herrera, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Peter Lowry, Plaintiff
v.
Eli Lilly and Company Eli Lilly and Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Xavier Imbroscio +1 202 662 5694 +1 202 778 5694 mimbroscio@cov.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phyllis A. Jones +1 202 662 5868 +1 202 778 5868 pajones@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clara J. Shin +1 415 591 6000 +1 415 591 6091 cshin@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David E Stanley +1 213 457 8000 +1 213 457 8080 dstanley@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Brown Woliver Insogna +1 213 457 8220 +1 213 457 8080 kinsogna@reedsmith.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (479) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Dismiss Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE Motion for Sanctions by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: In light of the history of the litigation in these cases and the facts and circumstances surrounding the motions at bar, the Court FINDS that sanctions against Defendant are not warranted. The Court therefore DENIES Plaintiffs' motions for sanctions. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (gk) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
        TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Pretrial Conference - Final, 349 , as to Plaintiff Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry Court Reporter. Court will contact Samantha Jison at sjison@baumhedlundlaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: August 3, 2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Esfandiari, Bijan) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Notice of Clerical Error (G-11)
          NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error: DUPLICATE ENTRY Re: Transcript (CV),, [380] (rd)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Transcript (CV)
            TRANSCRIPT for TRIAL - DAY 3 P.M. SESSION proceedings held on Thursday, August 6, 2015, at 1:32 P.M. Court Reporter: Debi Read, CSR at Readit3949@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2015. (rd)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: 9/9/2015 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER [375] by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. AND NOW, this 9TH day of September 2015, in consideration of the Parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs, it is hereby ORDERED. (lom)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 9th CCA Assigned Case Number Notice
                NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-56362, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals [376] as to Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (mat)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Representation Statement
                  REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals[376]. (Esfandiari, Bijan)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. Appeal of Judgment, [364] (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-16396209 paid.) (Esfandiari, Bijan)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: 9/1/2015 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                      Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File as to APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry[366] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Leckman, Terence)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 374 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                        NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/29/15 11:30 a.m. and 7/30/15 11:45 a.m. re Transcript [373], [372] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gackle, Deborah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Transcript (CV)
                          TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/30/15 11:45 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Deborah K. Gackle COURT REPORTER, phone number (213) 620-1140 DEBORAHGACKLE.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2015. (Gackle, Deborah)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Transcript (CV)
                            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/29/15 11:30 a.m.. Court Reporter: Deborah K. Gackle COURT REPORTER, phone number (213) 620-1140 DEBORAHGACKLE.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2015. (Gackle, Deborah)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 371 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                              NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/4, 5, 6/2015 and 8/7/15 10:20 AM re Transcript [370], [369], [367], [368] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gackle, Deborah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Transcript (CV)
                                TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/7/15 10:20 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah K. Gackle COURT REPORTER, phone number (213) 620-1140 DEBORAHGACKLE.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2015. (Gackle, Deborah)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Transcript (CV)
                                  TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/6/15 AM Session. Court Reporter: Deborah K. Gackle COURT REPORTER, phone number (213) 620-1140 DEBORAHGACKLE.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2015. (Gackle, Deborah)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Transcript (CV)
                                    TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/5/15 AM Session. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Deborah K. Gackle COURT REPORTER, phone number (213) 620-1140 DEBORAHGACKLE.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2015. (Gackle, Deborah)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Transcript (CV)
                                      TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/4/15 AM Session. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Deborah K. Gackle COURT REPORTER, phone number (213) 620-1140 DEBORAHGACKLE.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2015. (Gackle, Deborah)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: 8/25/2015 Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
                                        APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/11/2015 JudgmentCourt Filing
                                          JUDGMENT ON THE VERDICT FOR DEFENDANT(S) by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the plaintiff Claudia Herrera take nothing; that the action be dismissed on the merits; and that the defendant(s) Eli Lilly and Company, et al. recover of the plaintiff its costs of action, the sum to be determined. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (gk)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                            NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 08-06-2015 @ 1:32 P.M. re Transcript [353] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 365 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                              SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBITS 7, 8, and 13 through 16 to the Declaration of Emily Ullman in Support of Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Amended Motion to Exclude the General Expert Testimony Of Dr. Joseph Glenmullen. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(gk) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Transcript (CV)
                                                TRANSCRIPT for TRIAL - DAY 3 P.M. SESSEION proceedings held on 08-06-2015 @ 1:32 P.M. Court Reporter: Debi Read, CSR at Readit3949@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/31/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2015. (rd)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  JUDGMENT ON THE VERDICT FOR DEFENDANT(S) by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the plaintiff Claudia Herrera take nothing; that the action be dismissed on the merits; and that the defendant(s) Eli Lilly and Company, et al. recover of the plaintiff its costs of action, the sum to be determined. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (gk) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 365 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Exhibit
                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBITS 7, 8, and 13 through 16 to the Declaration of Emily Ullman in Support of Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Amended Motion to Exclude the General Expert Testimony Of Dr. Joseph Glenmullen. (Attachments: # (1) Part 2)(gk)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                      DEFENDANT ELI LILLY ANDCOMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS 7, 8, 13, 14, 15, AND 16 TO THEDECLARATION OF EMILY ULLMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S AMENDED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE GENERALEXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. JOSEPH GLENMULLEN PURSUANT TO L.R. 79-5.1 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (pj) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Unredacted Document
                                                        UNREDACTED VERDICT FORM Re: Redacted Verdict Form [359]. (gk)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                          UNREDACTED VERDICT FORM Re: Redacted Verdict Form 359 . (gk) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Unredacted Document
                                                            UNREDACTED Jury Note Number 1 filed Re: Redacted Jury Note [358]. (gk)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                              UNREDACTED Jury Note Number 1 filed Re: Redacted Jury Note 358 . (gk) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 360 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 jury instructions givenCourt Filing
                                                                COURT'S INSTRUCTIONS TO THE JURY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (gk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Jury Verdict
                                                                  REDACTED VERDICT FORM. (gk)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 358 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Jury Notes
                                                                    REDACTED Jury Note Number 1 filed. (gk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Receipt for Release of Exhibits to Counsel upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial (G-38)
                                                                      RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial; Pursuant to stipulation of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on the joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (gk)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial; Pursuant to stipulation of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on the joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (gk) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 List of Exhibits and Witnesses (G-65)
                                                                          LIST OF EXHIBITS AND WITNESSES at trial. (gk)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Jury Trial - CompletedCourt Filing
                                                                            MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 4th Day held and completed before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Closing arguments made. Court instructs jury. Bailiff(s) sworn. Jury retires to deliberate. Jury Verdict in favor of defendant(s) is read and filed. Jury polled. Filed Witness & Exhibit Lists. Filed jury notes. Filed jury instructions. Clerk reviewed admitted exhibits with counsel to be submitted to the Jury/Court for deliberation/findings. Counsel stipulate to the return of exhibits upon the conclusion of trial. Exhibit Release Form prepared and filed. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (gk)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 4th Day held and completed before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Closing arguments made. Court instructs jury. Bailiff(s) sworn. Jury retires to deliberate. Jury Verdict in favor of defendant(s) is read and filed. Jury polled. Filed Witness & Exhibit Lists. Filed jury notes. Filed jury instructions. Clerk reviewed admitted exhibits with counsel to be submitted to the Jury/Court for deliberation/findings. Counsel stipulate to the return of exhibits upon the conclusion of trial. Exhibit Release Form prepared and filed. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (gk) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                IN CHAMBERS TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Application referred to in the NOTICE of Manual Filing [312] is GRANTED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Jury Trial - Held and ContinuedCourt Filing
                                                                                  MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 3rd Day held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified. Defendant(s) rest. Jury Trial continued to 8/7/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle/Sheri Kleeger. (gk)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 3rd Day held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified. Defendant(s) rest. Jury Trial continued to 8/7/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle/Sheri Kleeger. (gk) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Jury Trial - Held and ContinuedCourt Filing
                                                                                      MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 2nd Day held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Plaintiff(s) rest. Motion for Judgment/Directed Verdict by Defendant is submitted. Jury Trial continued to 8/6/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle/Sheri Kleeger. (gk)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Jury Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                                                                                        MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 1st Day held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Jury empanelled and sworn. Opening statements made. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial is continued to 8/5/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle / Sheri Kleeger. (kss)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 2nd Day held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Plaintiff(s) rest. Motion for Judgment/Directed Verdict by Defendant is submitted. Jury Trial continued to 8/6/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle/Sheri Kleeger. (gk) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Pretrial Conference - FinalCourt Filing
                                                                                            MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Conference held. The Court advises counsel how it intends to rule on the various motions liminie submitted. The Court sets time deadlines on direct testimony. The Court rules that no printer will be allowed in the courtroom. Jury trial in CV12-9366-SVW-MAN is vacated. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (pj)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 In Limine - ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                              MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER REGARDING Motions in Limine by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court GRANTS IN PART Lilly's Motion to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Prozac [157]. The Court GRANTS Lilly's motion to exclude evidence and testimony relating to Cymbalta's foreign labeling [159] and DENIES Plaintiffs' motion to admit the European and other foreign Cymbalta labels [164]. The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Lilly's motion to exclude evidence or argument regarding labeling and marketing issues that Lilly describes as outside the scope of the case [160]. As to Lilly's motion to exclude evidence or argument regarding labeling and marketing issues that Lillydescribes as outside the scope of the case [162] and Plaintiffs' motion to admit the incidence rate of other Cymbalta risks, as reflected in Lilly's Cymbalta product label [165], the Court finds that portions of the U.S. Cymbalta label discussing risks other than the risk of discontinuation symptom are ADMISSIBLE. However, the Court EXCLUDES under Rule 403 evidence of such risks expressed in documents and evidence other than the label itself. The Court therefore GRANTS IN PART Lilly's motion and EXCLUDES under Rules 401, 402, and 403 evidence or argument regarding delays in FDA approval based on potential liver toxicity and manufacturing issues. The Court DENIES IN PART Lilly's motion to exclude evidence and argument on Lilly's alleged bad company conduct [167]; the Court EXCLUDES evidence and argument regarding Zyprexa. The Court DECLINES TO REACH this vague and undefined request before trial as to Lilly's motion to exclude other evidence or argument that Lilly engaged in or intended to engage in "unethical, immoral, or otherwise 'bad company' conduct." Upon Lilly's motion to exclude the 10/3/2012 issue of the Institute for Safe Medical Practices' ("ISMP") quarterly publicationcalled QuarterWatch [170], the Court EXCLUDES the QuarterWatch report. As to Plaintiffs' motion to exclude purportedly inadmissible character evidence regarding plaintiffs [166], The Court DECLINES TO REACH this motion to the extent that it seeks the generalizedexclusion of Plaintiff's risk-taking behaviors. The Court DENIES IN PART Plaintiffs' motion as to Herrera's use of prescriptions drugs other than Cymbalta to the extent that Lilly intends to use such evidence to show that Herrera would have taken Cymbalta in the face of stronger warnings. The Court DENIES IN PART the motion insofar as it relates to the use of this evidence to impeach Plaintiff or in relation to specific causation of Plaintiffs' injuries. The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs' motion to exclude any argument that the instant lawsuit is "lawyer-driven litigation" and any references to lawyer advertising [169] insofar as this motion concerns evidence relating to Plaintiffs' decision to file the case at bar. The Court DECLINES TO REACH this vague request re Plaintiffs' motion to exclude "argument and evidence concerning personal experiences with Cymbalta, depression, or Fibromyalgia by Lilly counsel and Lilly witnesses" [172]. The Court FINDS ADMISSIBLE Glenmullen's testimony that it is his professional opinion as a clinical psychiatrist that Cymbalta's label does not adequately reflect the clinical data regarding Cymbalta. See document for details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Conference held. The Court advises counsel how it intends to rule on the various motions liminie submitted. The Court sets time deadlines on direct testimony. The Court rules that no printer will be allowed in the courtroom. Jury trial in CV12-9366-SVW-MAN is vacated. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (pj) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 348 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 1st Day held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Jury empanelled and sworn. Opening statements made. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial is continued to 8/5/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle / Sheri Kleeger. (kss) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    CORRECTED ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. JOSEPH GLENMULLEN [138], [313], GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. JOSEPH GLENMULLEN [273], AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION AND SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. LOUIS MORRIS [139], [314] by Judge Stephen V. Wilson [338]. See document for details. (gk)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                      AMENDED JOINT Exhibit List filed by defendant Eli Lilly and Company.. (Paley, Kathleen)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER REGARDING Motions in Limine by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court GRANTS IN PART Lilly's Motion to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Prozac 157 . The Court GRANTS Lilly's motion to exclude evidence and testimony relating to Cymbalta's foreign labeling 159 and DENIES Plaintiffs' motion to admit the European and other foreign Cymbalta labels 164 . The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Lilly's motion to exclude evidence or argument regarding labeling and marketing issues that Lilly describes as outside the scope of the case 160 . As to Lilly's motion to exclude evidence or argument regarding labeling and marketing issues that Lillydescribes as outside the scope of the case 162 and Plaintiffs' motion to admit the incidence rate of other Cymbalta risks, as reflected in Lilly's Cymbalta product label 165 , the Court finds that portions of the U.S. Cymbalta label discussing risks other than the risk of discontinuation symptom are ADMISSIBLE. However, the Court EXCLUDES under Rule 403 evidence of such risks expressed in documents and evidence other than the label itself. The Court therefore GRANTS IN PART Lilly's motion and EXCLUDES under Rules 401, 402, and 403 evidence or argument regarding delays in FDA approval based on potential liver toxicity and manufacturing issues. The Court DENIES IN PART Lilly's motion to exclude evidence and argument on Lilly's alleged bad company conduct 167 ; the Court EXCLUDES evidence and argument regarding Zyprexa. The Court DECLINES TO REACH this vague and undefined request before trial as to Lilly's motion to exclude other evidence or argument that Lilly engaged in or intended to engage in "unethical, immoral, or otherwise 'bad company' conduct." Upon Lilly's motion to exclude the 10/3/2012 issue of the Institute for Safe Medical Practices' ("ISMP") quarterly publicationcalled QuarterWatch 170 , the Court EXCLUDES the QuarterWatch report. As to Plaintiffs' motion to exclude purportedly inadmissible character evidence regarding plaintiffs 166 , The Court DECLINES TO REACH this motion to the extent that it seeks the generalizedexclusion of Plaintiff's risk-taking behaviors. The Court DENIES IN PART Plaintiffs' motion as to Herrera's use of prescriptions drugs other than Cymbalta to the extent that Lilly intends to use such evidence to show that Herrera would have taken Cymbalta in the face of stronger warnings. The Court DENIES IN PART the motion insofar as it relates to the use of this evidence to impeach Plaintiff or in relation to specific causation of Plaintiffs' injuries. The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs' motion to exclude any argument that the instant lawsuit is "lawyer-driven litigation" and any references to lawyer advertising 169 insofar as this motion concerns evidence relating to Plaintiffs' decision to file the case at bar. The Court DECLINES TO REACH this vague request re Plaintiffs' motion to exclude "argument and evidence concerning personal experiences with Cymbalta, depression, or Fibromyalgia by Lilly counsel and Lilly witnesses" 172 . The Court FINDS ADMISSIBLE Glenmullen's testimony that it is his professional opinion as a clinical psychiatrist that Cymbalta's label does not adequately reflect the clinical data regarding Cymbalta. See document for details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Reply
                                                                                                          REPLY filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry to Lilly's Unauthorized Filing (Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            CORRECTED ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. JOSEPH GLENMULLEN 138 , 313 , GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. JOSEPH GLENMULLEN 273 , AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION AND SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. LOUIS MORRIS 139 , 314 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson 338 . See document for details. (gk) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                              REPLY in opposition DECLARATION OF JOSEPH GLENMULLEN filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Paley, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 8/2/2015, Entered: 8/2/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Joseph Glenmullen, M.D. re Pretrial Conference - Final,, Set/Reset Hearing, [337] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Wan at kwan@reedsmith.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: July 29-30, 2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Wan, Karen)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry Court Reporter. Court will contact Samantha Jison at sjison@baumhedlundlaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: July 29 and 30, 2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Esfandiari, Bijan)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015, Terminated: 8/10/2015 Leave
                                                                                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION to Bring and Use Printer in Court filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration) (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 For OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. JOSEPH GLENMULLEN [138, 313], GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. JOSEPH GLENMULLEN [273] by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: (pj)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Pretrial Conference - FinalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court orders that a detailed declaration be filed an emailed no later than noon on 8/2/2015. The pretrial conference will reconvene on 8/3/2015 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (gk)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The pretrial conference scheduled on August 3, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. is advanced to 2:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court orders that a detailed declaration be filed an emailed no later than noon on 8/2/2015. The pretrial conference will reconvene on 8/3/2015 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (gk) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Pretrial Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The pretrial conference in CV12-9366-SVW is postponed until 8/3/2015 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The conference to reconvene on 7/30/2015. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (gk)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The pretrial conference in CV12-9366-SVW is postponed until 8/3/2015 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The conference to reconvene on 7/30/2015. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (gk) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Khesraw Karmand on behalf of Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry (Attorney Khesraw Karmand added to party Claudia Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Khesraw Karmand added to party Peter Lowry(pty:pla))(Karmand, Khesraw)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/11/15 PM Session re Transcript [332] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gackle, Deborah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 Transcript (CV)
                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/11/15 PM Session. Court Reporter: Deborah K. Gackle COURT REPORTER, phone number (213) 620-1140 DEBORAHGACKLE.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2015. (Gackle, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/20/15 @ 1:30 pm re Transcript [329] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Kielwasser, Anne) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Transcript (CV)
                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 07/20/2015. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Anne Kielwasser, phone number AKtranscripts.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2015. (Kielwasser, Anne)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 RescheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF [311] Ex Parte Application to Reschedule Trials filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company [310] Ex Parte Application to Reschedule Trials filed by Defendant Eli Lillyand Company Motion Hearing held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Hearing held. The applications are denied. A pretrial conference in each case is set for Wednesday, July 29, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (pj)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF 311 Ex Parte Application to Reschedule Trials filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company 310 Ex Parte Application to Reschedule Trials filed by Defendant Eli Lillyand Company Motion Hearing held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Hearing held. The applications are denied. A pretrial conference in each case is set for Wednesday, July 29, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (pj) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Stipulation re: Exhibits Pretrial Trial
                                                                                                                                                  Joint PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits List. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015, Terminated: 8/10/2015 Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Reply in support of the Amended Motion to Exclude the General Expert Testimony of Lou Morris Under Fed.R.Evid. 702 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration) (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015, Terminated: 8/10/2015 Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Reply in support of the Amended Motion to Exclude the General Expert Testimony of Dr. Joseph Glenmullen filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration) (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry Court Reporter. Court will contact Samantha Jison at sjison@baumhedlundlaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: July 20, 2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Wan or Mary Hong at kwan@reedsmith.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 07/20/2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Wan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4-24-15 re Transcript [327] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Transcript (CV)
                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4-24-15. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: HUNTINGTON COURT REPORTERS, phone number (626) 792-7250. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2015. (ha)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition[309] JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company.(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re: Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude The General Expert Testimony Of Dr. Joseph Glenmullen [313] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit of Bijan Esfandiari, # (2) Exhibit 1-15, # (3) Exhibit 16-36)(Esfandiari, Bijan)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude The General Expert Testimony Of Lou Morris [314] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of T. Matthew Leckman, # (2) Exhibit 1-4)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reschedule Trials [310] : Hearing on the application is set for 7/20/2015 at 01:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re: Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude The General Expert Testimony Of Dr. Joseph Glenmullen 313 filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit of Bijan Esfandiari, # 2 Exhibit 1-15, # 3 Exhibit 16-36)(Esfandiari, Bijan) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED JOINT Exhibit List filed by Defendants Eli Lilly and Company.. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                            Witness List filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry.. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Seal (Document)
                                                                                                                                                                              DEFENDANT ELI LILLY ANDCOMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS 7, 8, 13, 14, 15, AND 16 TO THEDECLARATION OF EMILY ULLMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S AMENDED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE GENERALEXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. JOSEPH GLENMULLEN PURSUANT TO L.R. 79-5.1 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. correcting Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude The General Expert Testimony Of Lou Morris [314] Docket Text reads 8/3/2003 erroneously. Should be corrected to 8/3/2015 (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015, Terminated: 8/3/2015 ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude The General Expert Testimony Of Lou Morris filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/3/2003 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration with Exhibits, # (2) Proposed Order) (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015, Terminated: 7/31/2015 ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude The General Expert Testimony Of Dr. Joseph Glenmullen filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/3/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibits to Declaration, # (3) Proposed Order) (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company of Exhibits 7, 8, 13, 14, 15 and 16 to Declaration of Emily Ullman iso Eli Lilly's Amended Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Joseph Glenmullen. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reschedule Trials [310] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015, Terminated: 7/20/2015 Reschedule
                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reschedule Trials filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration w/Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order) (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Amended Complaint/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                            Corrected First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Eli Lilly and Company amending Amended Complaint/Petition[308], filed by Plaintiffs Peter Lowry, Claudia Herrera (Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Amended Complaint/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                              First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Eli Lilly and Company amending Complaint - (Discovery), [1], filed by Plaintiffs Peter Lowry, Claudia Herrera (Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT to Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,, Order on Motion for Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,, [306] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 For OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court DENIES Lilly's Motion for Summary Judgment on all of Plaintiffs' claims [120]. the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs LEAVE to file an amended complaint and to supplement their expert declarations to the extent that there is newly discovered evidence. Plaintiffs SHALL file their amended complaint and amended expert declarations on or before 6/29/2015. the Court GRANTS Lilly leave to file amended Daubert motions objecting to Plaintiff's expert witnesses. Lilly shall file any such amended motion on or before 7/7/2015. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs leave to file a response to Lilly's amended Daubert motions. Plaintiffs SHALL file any such response on or before 7/14/2015. the Court SETS this case for trial on 8/4/2015. The Parties are ORDERED to appear for a pretrial conference on 8/3/2015 at 3:00 PM. The Court DECLINES TO REACH the motions to exclude Glenmullen and Morris [138], [139], [273]. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company Court Reporter. Court will contact Mary Hong at mhong@reedsmith.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: June 11, 2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Wan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry Court Reporter. Court will contact Samantha Jison at sjison@baumhedlundlaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: June 11, 2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson RE: Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiffs [257]. The Court grants leave to file an amended complaint. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson RE: Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiffs 257 . The Court grants leave to file an amended complaint. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (gk) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL [301] by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the following documents shall be sealed pursuant to the protective order dated August 20, 2014 (Dkt. [80]): 1. Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and 2. Declaration of R. Brent Wisner in Support of Plaintiffs' SupplementalOpposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and its exhibits. (lom) Modified on 6/15/2015 (lom).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 300 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF R. BRENT WISNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 301 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the following documents shall be sealed pursuant to the protective order dated August 20, 2014 (Dkt. 80 ): 1. Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and 2. Declaration of R. Brent Wisner in Support of Plaintiffs' SupplementalOpposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and its exhibits. (lom) Modified on 6/15/2015 (lom). (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 299 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT-PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (lom) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 300 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF R. BRENT WISNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (pj) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition) filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration w/Exhibits)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 299 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT-PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (pj) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: 6/4/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Declaration of R. Brent Wisner in support thereof, Application and Order to File Under Seal. (Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: 6/3/2015 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company Court Reporter. Transcript portion requested: Other: Motion for Sanctions. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Wan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry Court Reporter. Court will contact Samantha Jison at sjison@baumhedlundlaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: June 1, 2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/3/2015 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF [257] MOTION for Sanctions filed by plaintiffs held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Hearing held. The Court GRANTS LEAVE for the parties to file supplemental briefing. Each sides brief shall be no longer than ten pages. Plaintiffs brief shall be due on or before Thursday, June 4, 2015. Defendants brief shall be due on or before Monday, June 8, 2015. Further hearing is set for June 11, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (kss)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF 257 MOTION for Sanctions filed by plaintiffs held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Hearing held. The Court GRANTS LEAVE for the parties to file supplemental briefing. Each sides brief shall be no longer than ten pages. Plaintiffs brief shall be due on or before Thursday, June 4, 2015. Defendants brief shall be due on or before Monday, June 8, 2015. Further hearing is set for June 11, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (kss) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Katherine B W Insogna counsel for Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Katherine W. Insogna is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Insogna, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson RE: Motion for Sanctions filed by plaintiffs [257]. The privilege log shall be served by 5/26/2015. The Court ORDERS Defendant to include the purportedly privileged documents' subject lines in the privilege log. The parties shall meet on or before 5/29/2015. Further hearing is set for 6/1/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson RE: Motion for Sanctions filed by plaintiffs 257 . The privilege log shall be served by 5/26/2015. The Court ORDERS Defendant to include the purportedly privileged documents' subject lines in the privilege log. The parties shall meet on or before 5/29/2015. Further hearing is set for 6/1/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (gk) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support of Supplemental MOTION for Order for Exclude the Expert Testimony of Joseph Glenmullen [273] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Ullman, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court acknowledges that given the multitude of filings and date changes on the docket the schedule in this case is somewhat unclear. The Court hereby clarifies that the parties are ORDERED to appear for a hearing regarding the motion for sanctions [257] on May 18, 2015 at 1:30 P.M. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in Support of Supplemental MOTION for Order for Exclude the Expert Testimony of Joseph Glenmullen 273 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Ullman, Emily) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION for Sanctions[257] : Counsel are reminded that hearing on the motion is set for May 18, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 288 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBITS 2, 4,5, 8 AND 10 TO DECLARATION OF BIJAN ESFANDIARI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR.JOSEPH GLENMULLEN (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 287 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR JOSEPH GLENMULLEN (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 288 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBITS 2, 4,5, 8 AND 10 TO DECLARATION OF BIJAN ESFANDIARI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR.JOSEPH GLENMULLEN (pj) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 286 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Seal (to seal document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT-ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 287 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR JOSEPH GLENMULLEN (pj) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 286 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT-ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (pj) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 285 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Seal (Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT-PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 284 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Supplemental MOTION for Order for Exclude the Expert Testimony of Joseph Glenmullen [273] [Filed conditionally under seal] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Bijan Esfandiari, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2 (Sealed), # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4 (Sealed), # (6) Exhibit 5 (Sealed), # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8 (Sealed), # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10 (Sealed), # (12) Exhibit 11)(Esfandiari, Bijan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 285 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT-PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (pj) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Supplemental Motion to Exclude Glenmullen, Declaration of B. Esfandiari iso Opposition, Plaintiff's Application to File Under Seal and Proposed Order re Application to Seal. (Esfandiari, Bijan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The hearing scheduled for May 11, 2015 regarding Defendant's supplemental motion to exclude Glenmullen's testimony is hereby vacated. The Court will issue an order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/16/15 1:30 pm re Transcript [280] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gackle, Deborah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Transcript (CV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/16/15 1:30 pm. Court Reporter: Deborah K. Gackle COURT REPORTER, phone number (213) 620-1140 DEBORAHGACKLE.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2015. (Gackle, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: 5/6/2015 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Order on Ex Parte Application for Order,,,,,,, Order on Ex Parte Application to Continue,,,,,, [152], as to Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry Court Reporter. Court will contact Kristen Varallo at kvarallo@pbmattorneys.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 03/16/2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS VACATING Trial Date and Rescheduling Defendants Supplemental Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Joseph Glenmullen [273, 273] by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: [273] In light of the pending motion for summary judgment, Defendants recently filed supplemental motion to exclude the expert testimony of Dr. Joseph Glenmullen (Glenmullen), and out of a concern for efficiency, the Court hereby VACATES the trial date currently set for May 12, 2015 in the Herrera action. Additionally, the Court continues the hearing regarding Defendants supplemental motions to exclude Glenmullens testimony from both the Herrera and Hexum actions to May 11, 2015 at 1:30 P.M. Plaintiffs in both of these actions shall file their oppositions on or before May 8, 2015. (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: While Defendant's motion for summary judgment remains pending the Court CONTINUES the jury trial date in this case from May 5, 2015 to May 12, 2015 at 9:00 a.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 278 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S REPLY to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (gk) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 278 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S REPLY to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Based upon Eli Lilly and Company's Application File Under Seal Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 276 , the Court finds that good cause exists to file under seal Defendant's Reply To Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (gk) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Seal (to seal document)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Based upon Eli Lilly and Company's Application File Under Seal Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [276], the Court finds that good cause exists to file under seal Defendant's Reply To Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 276 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION to File Under Seal Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.1. (gk) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS VACATING Trial Date and Rescheduling Defendants Supplemental Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Joseph Glenmullen [273, 273] by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: 273 In light of the pending motion for summary judgment, Defendants recently filed supplemental motion to exclude the expert testimony of Dr. Joseph Glenmullen (Glenmullen), and out of a concern for efficiency, the Court hereby VACATES the trial date currently set for May 12, 2015 in the Herrera action. Additionally, the Court continues the hearing regarding Defendants supplemental motions to exclude Glenmullens testimony from both the Herrera and Hexum actions to May 11, 2015 at 1:30 P.M. Plaintiffs in both of these actions shall file their oppositions on or before May 8, 2015. (pj) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 276 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Seal (Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION to File Under Seal Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.1. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: 4/29/2015, Terminated: 7/31/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND Supplemental MOTION for Order for Exclude the Expert Testimony of Joseph Glenmullen filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibits A-E)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: 4/29/2015 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company Court Smart (CS). Transcript portion requested: Other: 4/24/2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Insogna, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: 4/28/2015 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry.. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: 4/28/2015 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL BRIEF filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company.. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/28/2015 CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OFPLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE OF THE FINANCIAL BIASES OF LILLY CORPORATE WITNESSES WHO WILL TESTIFY AT TRIAL held before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle; denying [249] Ex Parte Application to Compel. Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application is DENIED for the reasons stated on the record. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Recorder: CS 04/24/15. (mz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OFPLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE OF THE FINANCIAL BIASES OF LILLY CORPORATE WITNESSES WHO WILL TESTIFY AT TRIAL held before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle; denying 249 Ex Parte Application to Compel. Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application is DENIED for the reasons stated on the record. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Recorder: CS 04/24/15. (mz) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                IN CHAMBERS ORDER TEXT-ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The hearing on all motions and motions in limine and pre-trial conference scheduled for April 27, 2015 are hereby VACATED and off calendar. The Court will issue an Order regarding scheduling on April 27, 2015. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 Audio Recording Form (AO-436)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPACT DISC Order for date of proceedings 4/24/2015 to 4/24/2015 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Court will contact Katherine W. Insogna at kinsogna@reedsmith.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 4/24/2015. FEE PAID. (Insogna, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibits 1-8)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 266 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of R. Brent Wisner in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4, # 4 Part 5, # 5 Part 6, # 6 Part 7, # 7 Part 8, # 8 Part 9, # 9 Part 10, # 10 Part 11, # 11 Part 12, # 12 Part 13, # 13 Part 14)(gk) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Jury instructions - Proposed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company.. (Jones, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Jury instructions - Proposed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry.. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING HEARING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle, re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel DISCLOSURE OF THE FINANCIAL BIASES OF LILLY CORPORATE WITNESSES WHO WILL TESTIFY AT TRIAL , [249]. Application set for hearing on 4/24/2015 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mz) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Notice of Clerical Error (G-11)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Order Granting Plaintiff's Application to File Under Seal [256]. Due to clerical error, the Order was docketed under seal. The PDF image has been made public and is attached hereto. (Attachments: # (1) Order Granting Plaintiff's Application to File Under Seal) (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The pretrial conference and hearing on all motions have been rescheduled to 04/27/2015 at 2:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel DISCLOSURE OF THE FINANCIAL BIASES OF LILLY CORPORATE WITNESSES WHO WILL TESTIFY AT TRIAL [249] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: 4/22/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel DISCLOSURE OF THE FINANCIAL BIASES OF LILLY CORPORATE WITNESSES WHO WILL TESTIFY AT TRIAL [249] : The application is referred to the Honorable Margaret A. Nagle, Magistrate Judge. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 259 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. (gk) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: 4/22/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re [246]EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to April 27, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry: The application is GRANTED. Eli Lilly shall file its opposition by noon on April 24, 2015 and that the Court will not consider any reply by Plaintiffs. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 258 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (gk) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 257 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 257 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions. (gk) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Seal (to seal document)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Upon Plaintiff's Application [255], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following documents shall be sealed pursuant to the protective order dated 8/20/2014: (1) Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Plaintiffs Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; (3) Declaration of R. Brent Wisner in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. (gk) ** SEAL RESTRICTION REMOVED PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR FILED 4/23/2015 [260] ** Modified on 4/23/2015 (gk).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Upon Plaintiff's Application 255 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following documents shall be sealed pursuant to the protective order dated 8/20/2014: (1) Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Plaintiffs Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; (3) Declaration of R. Brent Wisner in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. (gk) ** SEAL RESTRICTION REMOVED PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR FILED 4/23/2015 260 ** Modified on 4/23/2015 (gk). (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: 4/22/2015 Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting [233] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul W. Schmidt on behalf of Defendant, designating David E. Stanley as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 255 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION to File Under Seal. (gk) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: 4/21/2015, Terminated: 4/24/2015 Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel DISCLOSURE OF THE FINANCIAL BIASES OF LILLY CORPORATE WITNESSES WHO WILL TESTIFY AT TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Proposed Order)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 255 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Seal (Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION to File Under Seal. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Voir Dire Questions (Proposed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company.. (Attachments: # (1) Juror Questionnaire)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. correcting APPLICATION for attorney Paul W. Schmidt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.)[233] (adding MA Cert) (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting 233 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul W. Schmidt on behalf of Defendant, designating David E. Stanley as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015, Terminated: 4/22/2015 Shorten Time for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to April 27, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brent Wisner, # (2) Exhibit A to Wisner Declaration, # (3) Exhibit B to Wisner Declaration, # (4) Exhibit C to Wisner Declaration, # (5) Proposed Order)(Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence and Testimony Relating to Foreign Labeling [159] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Paul W. Schmidt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.)[233]. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Applicant failed to supply Good Standing Certificates for each of the state bar for each of the states that the attorney is admitted of that particular state bar. See LR 83-2.1.3.3 (MA). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Inadmissible Character Evidence, Including any Evidence that Plaintiffs Tend to Take Risks or Ignore Warnings or are Litigious [166] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Admit the European Cymbalta Label and Other Foreign Cymbalta Labels which Include a Specific Incidence Rate for Withdrawal Symptoms [164] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence or Argument re Issues Unrelated to Plaintiff's Alleged Cymbalta Discontinuation Symptoms [162] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence or Argument Relating to Prozac [157] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence Relating to the Quarterwatch Publication [170] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence or Argument Regarding Labeling and Marketing Issues Outside the Scope of the Case [160] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Exclude Evidence and Argument on Lilly's Alleged Bad Company Conduct [167] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry of Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions, Declaration of R. Brent Wisner In Support of Motion; [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Sactions; Application to File Under Seal and Proposed Order re Application. (Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Admit Incidence Rates of Other Cymbalta Risks, as Reflected in Lilly's Cymbalta Product Label [165] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Voir Dire Questions (Proposed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry.. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015, Terminated: 4/21/2015 Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for attorney Paul W. Schmidt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 For OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                IN CHAMBERS ORDER [229] EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for An Order Designating Order of Trials filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Herrera (2702) and Hexum (2701) cases shall be tried separately. The Herrera (2702) case shall be tried first, with trial occurring as scheduled on May 5, 2015. The Hexum (2701) trial date is vacated. Both cases will be addressed at the pretrial conference scheduled for April 27, 2015, at which time the Court will also set a new trial date in the Hexum (2701) case. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for an Order Designating Order of Trials [229] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Proposed Order)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 266 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of R. Brent Wisner in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # (1) Part 2, # (2) Part 3, # (3) Part 4, # (4) Part 5, # (5) Part 6, # (6) Part 7, # (7) Part 8, # (8) Part 9, # (9) Part 10, # (10) Part 11, # (11) Part 12, # (12) Part 13, # (13) Part 14)(gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 259 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 258 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 Notice of Lodging Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Appendix 1, # (3) Appendix 2)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015, Terminated: 4/17/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for an Order Designating Order of Trials filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition, Declaration of R.Wisner iso Supplemental Opposition, Plaintiffs' Supplemental Separate Statement. (Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs shall file the following: 1. Plaintiffs Supplemental Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Companys Motion for Summary Judgment; 2. Plaintiffs Supplemental Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Companys Motion for Summary Judgment; 3. Declarations of R. Brent Wisner in Support of Plaintiffs Supplemental Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Companys Motion for Summary Judgment with its accompanying exhibits; 4. Defendant will have seven days to file any response [199] (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs shall file the following: 1. Plaintiffs Supplemental Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Companys Motion for Summary Judgment; 2. Plaintiffs Supplemental Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Companys Motion for Summary Judgment; 3. Declarations of R. Brent Wisner in Support of Plaintiffs Supplemental Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Companys Motion for Summary Judgment with its accompanying exhibits; 4. Defendant will have seven days to file any response 199 (pj) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence Relating to the Quarterwatch Publication [170] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Bijan Esfandiari, # (2) Exhibit 1)(Esfandiari, Bijan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence or Argument Relating to Prozac [157] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Bijan Esfandiari, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7)(Esfandiari, Bijan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence Relating to the Quarterwatch Publication 170 filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bijan Esfandiari, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Esfandiari, Bijan) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence or Argument Regarding Labeling and Marketing Issues Outside the Scope of the Case [160] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum, # (2) Declaration of T. Matthew Leckman, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Proposed Order, # (7) Certificate of Service)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence or Argument Relating to Prozac 157 filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bijan Esfandiari, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Esfandiari, Bijan) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Exclude Evidence and Argument on Lilly's Alleged Bad Company Conduct [167] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum, # (2) Declaration of T. Matthew Leckman, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4, # (7) Proposed Order, # (8) Certificate of Service)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence or Argument Regarding Labeling and Marketing Issues Outside the Scope of the Case 160 filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of T. Matthew Leckman, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Proposed Order, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Leckman, Terence) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence and Testimony Relating to Foreign Labeling [159] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum, # (2) Declaration of T. Matthew Leckman, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6, # (9) Exhibit 7, # (10) Exhibit 8, # (11) Exhibit 9, # (12) Exhibit 10, # (13) Exhibit 11, # (14) Exhibit 12, # (15) Proposed Order, # (16) Certificate of Service)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence or Argument re Issues Unrelated to Plaintiff's Alleged Cymbalta Discontinuation Symptoms [162] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum, # (2) Declaration of T. Matthew Leckman, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Proposed Order, # (6) Certificate of Service)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Argument and Evidence Concerning Personal Experiences with Cymbalta, Depression, or Fibromyalgia by Lilly Counsel and Lilly Witnesses [172] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Any Argument that the Instant Lawsuits are Simply "Lawyer-Driven" Litigation, Including any Reference to Lawyer Advertising [169] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Inadmissible Character Evidence, Including any Evidence that Plaintiffs Tend to Take Risks or Ignore Warnings or are Litigious [166] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Admit Incidence Rates of Other Cymbalta Risks, as Reflected in Lilly's Cymbalta Product Label [165] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Admit the European Cymbalta Label and Other Foreign Cymbalta Labels which Include a Specific Incidence Rate for Withdrawal Symptoms [164] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 215 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of R. Brent Wisner in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # (1) Part 2, # (2) Part 3, # (3) Part 4, # (4) Part 5, # (5) Part 6, # (6) Part 7, # (7) Part 8, # (8) Part 9)(gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 214 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 215 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of R. Brent Wisner in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4, # 4 Part 5, # 5 Part 6, # 6 Part 7, # 7 Part 8, # 8 Part 9)(gk) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 213 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 214 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. (gk) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Seal (to seal document)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Upon Plaintiffs' Application [211], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the following documents shall be sealed pursuant to the protective order dated 8/20/2014 (Dkt. [80]): (1) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; and (3) Declarations of R. Brent Wisner in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment with its accompanying exhibits. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 213 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (gk) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to REQUEST for Leave to file Surreply to Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Joseph Glenmullen [207] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Upon Plaintiffs' Application 211 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the following documents shall be sealed pursuant to the protective order dated 8/20/2014 (Dkt. 80 ): (1) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; and (3) Declarations of R. Brent Wisner in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment with its accompanying exhibits. (gk) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/9/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Exhibit List Corrected filed by Plaintiffs' Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Proposed Supplemental Oppositions to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera and Peter Lowry. (gk) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/9/2015 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. correcting Exhibit List[187] (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015, Terminated: 8/10/2015 Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST for Leave to file Surreply to Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Joseph Glenmullen filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Surreply, # (2) Exhibit A to Surreply)(Esfandiari, Bijan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Seal (Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Proposed Supplemental Oppositions to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera and Peter Lowry. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015, Terminated: 4/15/2015 Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file a Supplemental Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Companys Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of R. Brent Wisner, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Proposed Order)(Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's MSJ, Declaration of R.Wisner iso Supplemental Opposition, Plaintiffs' Supplemental Separate Statement, Application to File Under Seal and Proposed Order re Application. (Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 206 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 1-8 AND 14-15 OF DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN PALEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING LABELING AND MARKETING ISSUES OUTSIDE THE SCOPE OF THE CASE 160 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of 5 part 2, # 2 Exhibit Part 2 of 5, # 3 Exhibit Part 3 of 5 part 1, # 4 Exhibit Part 3 of 5 part 2, # 5 Exhibit Part 4 of 5 part 1, # 6 Exhibit Part 4 of 5 part 2, # 7 Exhibit Part 5 of 5 part 1, # 8 Exhibit Part 5 of 5 part 2)(pj) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Exhibit List filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry.. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 205 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT to MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence or Argument Relating to Prozac 157 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (pj) Modified on 4/8/2015 (pj). (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiffs' Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 204 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBITS D, E, G AND H TO THE DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN E. PALEY IN SUPPORT OF LILLY'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT ON LILLY'S ALLEGED "BAD COMPANY" CONDUCT FILED CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL 167 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of 3 part 2, # 2 Exhibit Part 2 of 3 part 1, # 3 Exhibit Part 2 of 3 part 2, # 4 Supplement Part 3 of 3)(pj) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness List filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry.. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 203 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBITS 1 THROUGH 10 TO DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN E. PALEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING ISSUES UNRELATED TO PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGED CYMBALTA DISCONTINUATION SYMPTOMS FILED CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL 162 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 2)(pj) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 184 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 202 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBITS B AND C TO DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN E. PALEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO THE OUARTERWATCH PUBLICATION FILED CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL 170 (pj) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT Exhibit List filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company.. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 201 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBITS C AND E TO THE DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN E. PALEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY RELATING TO FOREIGN LABELING FILED CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL 159 (pj) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Witness List filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company.. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 200 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBITS B AND C TO DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN E. PALEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO THE OUARTERWATCH PUBLICATION FILED CONDITIONALLY UNDER. SEAL 170 (pj) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 206 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT 1-8 AND 14-15 OF DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN PALEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING LABELING AND MARKETING ISSUES OUTSIDE THE SCOPE OF THE CASE [160] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Part 1 of 5 part 2, # (2) Exhibit Part 2 of 5, # (3) Exhibit Part 3 of 5 part 1, # (4) Exhibit Part 3 of 5 part 2, # (5) Exhibit Part 4 of 5 part 1, # (6) Exhibit Part 4 of 5 part 2, # (7) Exhibit Part 5 of 5 part 1, # (8) Exhibit Part 5 of 5 part 2)(pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 205 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT to MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence or Argument Relating to Prozac [157] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (pj) Modified on 4/8/2015 (pj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 204 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBITS D, E, G AND H TO THE DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN E. PALEY IN SUPPORT OF LILLY'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT ON LILLY'S ALLEGED "BAD COMPANY" CONDUCT FILED CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL[167] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Part 1 of 3 part 2, # (2) Exhibit Part 2 of 3 part 1, # (3) Exhibit Part 2 of 3 part 2, # (4) Supplement Part 3 of 3)(pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING LABELING AND MARKETING ISSUES OUTSIDE THE SCOPE OF THE CASE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: 196 (pj) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 203 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBITS 1 THROUGH 10 TO DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN E. PALEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING ISSUES UNRELATED TO PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGED CYMBALTA DISCONTINUATION SYMPTOMS FILED CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL[162] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Part 2)(pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING LABELING AND MARKETING ISSUES OUTSIDE THE SCOPE OF THE CASE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (pj) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 202 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBITS B AND C TO DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN E. PALEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO THE OUARTERWATCH PUBLICATION FILED CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL[170] (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO PROZAC PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: 194 (pj) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 201 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBITS C AND E TO THE DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN E. PALEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY RELATING TO FOREIGN LABELING FILED CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL[159] (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO PROZAC PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (pj) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 200 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBITS B AND C TO DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN E. PALEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO THE OUARTERWATCH PUBLICATION FILED CONDITIONALLY UNDER. SEAL[170] (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO FOREIGN LABELING PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 192 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: (pj) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Seal (to seal document)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING LABELING AND MARKETING ISSUES OUTSIDE THE SCOPE OF THE CASE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: [196] (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO FOREIGN LABELING PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 (pj) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Seal (to seal document)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO PROZAC PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: [194] (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO THE OUARTERWATCH PUBLICATION CONDUCT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: 190 (pj) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Seal (to seal document)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO FOREIGN LABELING PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 [192] by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO THE QUARTERWATCH PUBLICATIO PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79- 5.1 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (pj) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Seal (to seal document)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO THE OUARTERWATCH PUBLICATION CONDUCT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: [190] (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING Defendants' ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT ON LILLY'S ALLEGED "BAD COMPANY" CONDUCT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: 188 (pj) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Seal (to seal document)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING Defendants' ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT ON LILLY'S ALLEGED "BAD COMPANY" CONDUCT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: [188] (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT ON LILLY'S ALLEGED "BAD COMPANY" CONDUCT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (pj) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Seal (to seal document)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ELI LILLY ANDCOMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING ISSUES UNRELATED TO PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGED CYMBALTADISCONTINUATION SYMPTOMS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79- 5.1 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting [181] Application to Seal (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Supplement, [173], Supplement, [177], Supplement, [175], Supplement, [176], Supplement[174]. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected.Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment.Title page is missing. The correct event is: Notice of Lodging under NOTICES. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (kss)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Seal (Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING LABELING AND MARKETING ISSUES OUTSIDE THE SCOPE OF THE CASE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Seal (Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO PROZAC PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Seal (Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO FOREIGN LABELING PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ELI LILLY ANDCOMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING ISSUES UNRELATED TO PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGED CYMBALTADISCONTINUATION SYMPTOMS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79- 5.1 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting 181 Application to Seal (pj) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Seal (Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO THE QUARTERWATCH PUBLICATIO PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79- 5.1 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Seal (Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT ON LILLY'S ALLEGED "BAD COMPANY" CONDUCT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING ISSUES UNRELATED TO PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGED CYMBALTA DISCONTINUATION SYMPTOMS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (pj) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Seal (Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING ISSUES UNRELATED TO PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGED CYMBALTA DISCONTINUATION SYMPTOMS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5.1 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT to MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Argument and Evidence Concerning Personal Experiences with Cymbalta, Depression, or Fibromyalgia by Lilly Counsel and Lilly Witnesses [172] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENT to MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Any Argument that the Instant Lawsuits are Simply "Lawyer-Driven" Litigation, Including any Reference to Lawyer Advertising [169] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORRECTED MINUTES as to date held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson 149 . (pj) Modified on 4/1/2015 (pj). (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT to MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Inadmissible Character Evidence, Including any Evidence that Plaintiffs Tend to Take Risks or Ignore Warnings or are Litigious [166] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT to MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Admit Incidence Rates of Other Cymbalta Risks, as Reflected in Lilly's Cymbalta Product Label [165] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Admit the European Cymbalta Label and Other Foreign Cymbalta Labels which Include a Specific Incidence Rate for Withdrawal Symptoms [164] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 8/10/2015 In Limine - ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Argument and Evidence Concerning Personal Experiences with Cymbalta, Depression, or Fibromyalgia by Lilly Counsel and Lilly Witnesses filed by Plaintiff Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Notice, # (2) Certificate of Service)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company of Exhibit B and C to Declaration iso Defendant's MIL to Bar Evidence or Argument relating to the Quarterwatch Publication; Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 8/3/2015 In Limine - ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence Relating to the Quarterwatch Publication filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibits Part 1, # (3) Exhibits Part 2)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Argument and Evidence Concerning Personal Experiences with Cymbalta, Depression, or Fibromyalgia by Lilly Counsel and Lilly Witnesses filed by Plaintiff Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Notice, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Leckman, Terence) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 8/10/2015 In Limine - ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Any Argument that the Instant Lawsuits are Simply "Lawyer-Driven" Litigation, Including any Reference to Lawyer Advertising filed by Plaintiff Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Notice, # (2) Certificate of Service)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company of Exhibit D, E, G H to Declaration iso MIL to Bar Evidence or Argument on Lilly's alleged Bad Company Conduct; Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence Relating to the Quarterwatch Publication filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibits Part 1, # 3 Exhibits Part 2)(Stanley, David) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 8/3/2015 In Limine - ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Exclude Evidence and Argument on Lilly's Alleged Bad Company Conduct filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibits A-B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibits D-H)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 8/3/2015 In Limine - ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Inadmissible Character Evidence, Including any Evidence that Plaintiffs Tend to Take Risks or Ignore Warnings or are Litigious filed by Plaintiff Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Notice, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Certificate of Service)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 8/3/2015 In Limine - AdmitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Admit Incidence Rates of Other Cymbalta Risks, as Reflected in Lilly's Cymbalta Product Label filed by Plaintiff Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Notice, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6, # (9) Certificate of Service)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 8/3/2015 In Limine - AdmitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Admit the European Cymbalta Label and Other Foreign Cymbalta Labels which Include a Specific Incidence Rate for Withdrawal Symptoms filed by Plaintiff Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Motion, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6, # (9) Exhibit 7, # (10) Exhibit 8, # (11) Exhibit 9, # (12) Exhibit 10, # (13) Exhibit 11, # (14) Exhibit 12, # (15) Exhibit 13, # (16) Exhibit 14, # (17) Exhibit 15, # (18) Exhibit 16, # (19) Exhibit 17, # (20) Exhibit 18, # (21) Exhibit 19, # (22) Exhibit 20, # (23) Exhibit 21, # (24) Exhibit 22, # (25) Exhibit 23, # (26) Exhibit 24, # (27) Exhibit 25, # (28) Exhibit 26, # (29) Certificate of Service)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY In Opposition MOTION for Order for Exclude the Expert Testimony of Joseph Glenmullen under Fed.R.Evid. 702 [138] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kathleen Paley, # (2) Exhibit A-E to Decl of Kathleen Paley)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 8/3/2015 In Limine - BarCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence or Argument re Issues Unrelated to Plaintiff's Alleged Cymbalta Discontinuation Symptoms filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1-11 to Decl of Kathleen Paley)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company of Exhibits 1-10 to Declaration of Kathleen Paley ISO MIL to Bar Evidence or Argument re Issues Unrelated to Pltff's Alleged Cymbalta Discontinuation Symptoms. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 8/3/2015 In Limine - BarCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence or Argument Regarding Labeling and Marketing Issues Outside the Scope of the Case filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibits to Declaration)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 8/3/2015 In Limine - BarCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence and Testimony Relating to Foreign Labeling filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A-F to Decl of Kathleen Paley, # (3) Exhibit G-I to Decl of Kathleen Paley)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company of Exhibits C and E to Declaration of Kathleen Paley ISO MIL to Bar Evidence and Testimony Relating to Foreign Labeling. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 8/3/2015 In Limine - BarCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Bar Evidence or Argument Relating to Prozac filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kathleen Paley, # (2) Exhibit 1-6 to Decl of Kathleen Paley)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company of Exhibts 1, 4, 5 and 6 to Declaration of Kathleen Paley In Support of MIL to Bar Evidence or Argument Relating to Prozac. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company of Exhibits 1-8, 14, 15; Application; Proposed Order. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 8/10/2015 StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Supplemental Declaration of Louis Morris filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in support of MOTION for Order for Exclude the Expert Testimony of Louis Morris Under Fed.R.Evid. 702 [139] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: 3/19/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings DECEMBER 10, 2014 10:57 A.M. re Transcript [150] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mwo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: 3/19/2015 Transcript (CV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on DECEMBER 10, 2014 10:57 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number 626-963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2015. (mwo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/18/2015 SUMMARY JUDGMENTCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE; [120] MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 56(a) filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company (CV13-2702) held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Conference held. The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The Court continues the pretrial conference to April 27, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Applications to Substitute Expert [125, 126] and Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Applications to Continue Briefing and Hearing Schedule [135, 143] by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: For the reasons discussed in Plaintiffs' applications and at the hearing held on March 16, 2015, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' applications. Plaintiffs in both actions are ORDERED to provide Glenmullen's report to defendant Eli Lilly and Company ("Eli Lilly") by the end of this week. Plaintiffs are further her ordered to schedule a time for Eli Lilly to depose Glerunullen immediately upon Glenmullen's return from Europe. As a sanction for Plaintiffs ' delay in moving to substitute Glerunullen and for failing to provide his rep01i, the Court GRANTS Eli Lilly leave to either submit a new expert or to augment an existing expert Plaintiffs in both actions also apply ex parte to continue the briefing and hearing dates regarding Eli Lilly's Daubert motions and Eli Lilly's motion for summary judgment in the Hexum case. (2701 Dkt. 135; 2702 Dkt. 143.) The Court GRANTS in part Plaintiffs' applications. Plaintiffs' oppositions to Lilly motions for summary judgment and Daubert motions, (2701 Dkts. 129, 130, 131; 2702 Dkts. 138& 139), shall be due on March 23, 2015. Defendant's replies shall be due on March 30, 2015. hearings regarding these motions shall be held on April 27, 2015 at 3:00P.M. The final pretrial conference is also CONTINUED to April 27, 2015 at 3:00 P.M (pj) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry Court Reporter. Court will contact Samantha Jison at sjison@baumhedlundlaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: March 16, 2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Esfandiari, Bijan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Order on Motion to Compel, Discovery Hearing[118], as to Plaintiff Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Kristen Varallo at kvarallo@pbmattorneys.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 12/10/2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE; 120 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 56(a) filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company (CV13-2702) held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Conference held. The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The Court continues the pretrial conference to April 27, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (lom) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 Amended MinutesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORRECTED MINUTES as to date held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson [149]. (pj) Modified on 4/1/2015 (pj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/19/2015 ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Applications to Substitute Expert [125, 126] and Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Applications to Continue Briefing and Hearing Schedule [135, 143] by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: For the reasons discussed in Plaintiffs' applications and at the hearing held on March 16, 2015, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' applications. Plaintiffs in both actions are ORDERED to provide Glenmullen's report to defendant Eli Lilly and Company ("Eli Lilly") by the end of this week. Plaintiffs are further her ordered to schedule a time for Eli Lilly to depose Glerunullen immediately upon Glenmullen's return from Europe. As a sanction for Plaintiffs ' delay in moving to substitute Glerunullen and for failing to provide his rep01i, the Court GRANTS Eli Lilly leave to either submit a new expert or to augment an existing expert Plaintiffs in both actions also apply ex parte to continue the briefing and hearing dates regarding Eli Lilly's Daubert motions and Eli Lilly's motion for summary judgment in the Hexum case. (2701 Dkt. 135; 2702 Dkt. 143.) The Court GRANTS in part Plaintiffs' applications. Plaintiffs' oppositions to Lilly motions for summary judgment and Daubert motions, (2701 Dkts. 129, 130, 131; 2702 Dkts. 138& 139), shall be due on March 23, 2015. Defendant's replies shall be due on March 30, 2015. hearings regarding these motions shall be held on April 27, 2015 at 3:00P.M. The final pretrial conference is also CONTINUED to April 27, 2015 at 3:00 P.M (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re: MOTION for Order for Exclude the Expert Testimony of Joseph Glenmullen under Fed.R.Evid. 702 [138] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Robert Brent Wisner, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6)(Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re: MOTION for Order for Exclude the Expert Testimony of Louis Morris Under Fed.R.Evid. 702 [139] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Louis A. Morris)(Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re: MOTION for Order for Exclude the Expert Testimony of Joseph Glenmullen under Fed.R.Evid. 702 138 filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Brent Wisner, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Wisner, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re: MOTION for Order for Exclude the Expert Testimony of Louis Morris Under Fed.R.Evid. 702 139 filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Louis A. Morris)(Wisner, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions from April 6, 2015 to April 13, 2015 Re: MOTION for Order for Exclude the Expert Testimony of Joseph Glenmullen under Fed.R.Evid. 702 [138],[143] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015, Terminated: 3/16/2015 Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions from April 6, 2015 to April 13, 2015 Re: MOTION for Order for Exclude the Expert Testimony of Joseph Glenmullen under Fed.R.Evid. 702 [138], MOTION for Order for Exclude the Expert Testimony of Louis Morris Under Fed.R.Evid. 702 [139], MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 56(a) [120] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David E Stanley counsel for Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Frank Chadwick Morriss is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting Application to Substitute Expert [126] (Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition) filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bijan Esfandiari on behalf of Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry (Attorney Bijan Esfandiari added to party Claudia Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Bijan Esfandiari added to party Peter Lowry(pty:pla))(Esfandiari, Bijan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015, Terminated: 8/3/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Exclude the Expert Testimony of Louis Morris Under Fed.R.Evid. 702 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/6/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Exhibits to Declaration)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015, Terminated: 7/31/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Exclude the Expert Testimony of Joseph Glenmullen under Fed.R.Evid. 702 filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/6/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Exhibits to Declaration)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 56(a) [120] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Response to Plaintiffs' Request or Additional Findings of Fact, # (2) Declaration of Kathleen Paley, # (3) Exhibits 12 to 18 of Kathleen Paley Declaration)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 137 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF R. BRENT WISNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION for Summary Judgment [120] (Attachments: # (1) Part 2, # (2) Part 3, # (3) Part 4, # (4) Part 5, # (5) Part 6, # (6) Part 7)(pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 137 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION OF R. BRENT WISNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION for Summary Judgment 120 (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4, # 4 Part 5, # 5 Part 6, # 6 Part 7)(pj) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 136 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT-PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES OF MATERIAL FACT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [120] (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 136 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT-PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES OF MATERIAL FACT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 120 (pj) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 135 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [120] (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 135 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 120 (pj) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL [132] by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the following documents shall be sealed pursuant to the protective order dated August 20, 2014 (Dkt. [80]): 1. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; 2. Plaintiff's Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; 3. Declaration of R. Brent Wisner in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. (lom) Modified on 3/2/2015 (lom).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 132 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the following documents shall be sealed pursuant to the protective order dated August 20, 2014 (Dkt. 80 ): 1. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; 2. Plaintiff's Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; 3. Declaration of R. Brent Wisner in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. (lom) Modified on 3/2/2015 (lom). (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. Lodged [Prop] Order. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. Lodged [Prop] Order. (lom) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 56(a) [120] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Companys Motion for Summary Judgment, # (2) Declaration of T. Matt Leckman Pursuant to FRCP 56(d), # (3) Proposed Order)(Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry of Plaintiffs' Opposition to MSJ, Plaintiffs Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact, Declaration of R. Brent Wisner, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Application to File Under Seal, and Proposed Order re Application to File Under Seal. (Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 56(a) 120 filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Companys Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration of T. Matt Leckman Pursuant to FRCP 56(d), # 3 Proposed Order)(Wisner, Robert) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert Brent Wisner on behalf of Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry (Attorney Robert Brent Wisner added to party Claudia Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Brent Wisner added to party Peter Lowry(pty:pla))(Wisner, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: 2/20/2015 Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Production [107] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit to Declaration of T. Matthew Leckman, # (3) Declaration of Phyllis of Jones)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: 2/19/2015 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION In Opposition To re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting Application to Substitute Expert [126] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Phyllis Jones, # (2) Exhibit 1 through 15)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015, Terminated: 3/16/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting Application to Substitute Expert filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Affidavit of Service, # (3) Declaration of Harris Pogust, # (4) Exhibit A, # (5) Exhibit B, # (6) Exhibit C, # (7) Exhibit D, # (8) Exhibit E, # (9) Exhibit F, # (10) Exhibit G)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form onlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: 2/11/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re Stipulation to Continue [122]. IT IS SO ORDERED that the hearing Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for March 9, 20015 is continued to Motion 3/16/2015 at 01:30 PM [120]. Plaintiffs' Response 2/23/2015; Defendant's Reply 3/2/2015 (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: 2/11/2015 Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form onlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 3/16/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: 2/11/2015 Stipulation to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment from March 9, 2015 to March 16, 2015 Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 56(a) [120] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Production [107] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015, Terminated: 6/19/2015 SUMMARY JUDGMENTCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 56(a) filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Judgment, # (2) L.R. 56-1 Proposed Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, # (3) Declaration of Kathleen Paley, # (4) Exhibit 1 to Paley Declaration, # (5) Exhibit 2 to Paley Declaration, # (6) Exhibit 3 to Paley Declaration, # (7) Exhibit 4 to Paley Declaration, # (8) Exhibit 5 to Paley Declaration, # (9) Exhibit 6 to Paley Declaration, # (10) Exhibit 7 to Paley Declaration, # (11) Exhibit 8 to Paley Declaration, # (12) Exhibit 9 to Paley Declaration, # (13) Exhibit 10 to Paley Declaration, # (14) Exhibit 11 to Paley Declaration)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT - JOINT STATUS REPORT ON PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Discovery HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle:granting in part and denying in part [107] Motion to Compel.Court Recorder: CS. (ec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of address by Kathleen E Paley attorney for Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Changing attorneys address to One CityCenter, 850 Tenth Street, NW, Washington, DC 20001-4956. Filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Paley, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle:granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion to Compel.Court Recorder: CS. (ec) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of address by Phyllis A Jones attorney for Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Changing attorneys address to One CityCenter, 850 Tenth Street, NW, Washington, DC 20001-4956. Filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Jones, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of address by Michael X Imbroscio attorney for Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Changing attorneys address to One CityCenter, 850 Tenth Street, NW, Washington, DC 20001-4956. Filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Imbroscio, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of address by Brett C Reynolds attorney for Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Changing attorneys address to One CityCenter, 850 Tenth Street, NW, Washington, DC 20001-4956. Filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Reynolds, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of address by Emily S Ullman attorney for Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Changing attorneys address to One CityCenter, 850 Tenth Street, NW, Washington, DC 20001-4956. Filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Ullman, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of address by Jaclyn E Martinez Resly attorney for Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Changing attorneys address to One CityCenter, 850 Tenth Street, NW, Washington, DC 20001-4956. Filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Martinez Resly, Jaclyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle rescheduling telephonic hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production [107] from 12/9/2014 to 12/10/2014 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ec) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle scheduling Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production [107] for hearing on 12/9/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ec) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT REPORT of DISCOVERY REQUESTS filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Production [107] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration of T. Matthew Leckman)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014, Terminated: 12/10/2014 Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production filed by PLAINTIFFS' Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Discovery HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle regarding Plaintiffs' Motions. The Court hears argument regarding Plaintiffs Motions. The Court directs counsel to meet and confer in a good faith effort to narrow the issues presented in Plaintiffs Motions. Upon the completion of the meet and confer process, the Court is advised that counsel have agreed upon resolutions of certain issues presented in Plaintiffs Motions. The Court is further advised that counsel will continue to meet and confer to further narrow the issues presented in Plaintiffs Motions. With regard to any remaining disputed issues, counsel shall submit briefing on those issues by Friday, November 14, 2014. Court Recorder: CS. (ec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Conference held. The Court is advised that plaintiffs counsel filed a request to establish aMulti-District Litigation (MDL) matter. The plaintiffs attorney is ORDERED to advise the MDL Board that this Court has no particular expertise or special knowledge regarding Cymbalta. Plaintiffs attorney shall also advise the MDL Board that this Court does not request assignment of the MDL. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle regarding Plaintiffs' Motions. The Court hears argument regarding Plaintiffs Motions. The Court directs counsel to meet and confer in a good faith effort to narrow the issues presented in Plaintiffs Motions. Upon the completion of the meet and confer process, the Court is advised that counsel have agreed upon resolutions of certain issues presented in Plaintiffs Motions. The Court is further advised that counsel will continue to meet and confer to further narrow the issues presented in Plaintiffs Motions. With regard to any remaining disputed issues, counsel shall submit briefing on those issues by Friday, November 14, 2014. Court Recorder: CS. (ec) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Conference held. The Court is advised that plaintiffs counsel filed a request to establish aMulti-District Litigation (MDL) matter. The plaintiffs attorney is ORDERED to advise the MDL Board that this Court has no particular expertise or special knowledge regarding Cymbalta. Plaintiffs attorney shall also advise the MDL Board that this Court does not request assignment of the MDL. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (pj) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING NOTICE: The matter is set for a Status Conference on 11/4/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Production [102] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration Declaration of T. Matthew Leckman, # (3) Declaration Declaration of Phyllis A. Jones)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014, Terminated: 11/14/2014 CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. Motion set for hearing on 11/4/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS. The document is stricken from the record, RE: MOTION to Compel Discovery Production and Responses , [98]. (mz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Compel Discovery Production and Responses [98]. The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely.Incorrect event selected.Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Docket entry description does not match the title of the document.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Discovery Production and Responses [98] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration of T. Matthew Leckman, # (3) Declaration Phyllis A. Jones)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014, Terminated: 10/9/2014 CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (STRICKEN) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Discovery Production and Responses filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. Motion set for hearing on 11/4/2014 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. (Leckman, Terence) Modified on 10/9/2014 (mz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting [94] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin M. O'Brien on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating Matthew R. Lopez as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form onlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting 94 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin M. O'Brien on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating Matthew R. Lopez as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case)(CV 34)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:12-CV-9366 SVW(MANx). Case transferred from Judge George H. King and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:13-cv-2702 SVW(MANx). Signed by Judge Stephen V. Wilson (esa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014, Terminated: 10/3/2014 Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Kevin M. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14545938 paid.) filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Proposed Order)(Lopez, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES (In Chambers) Order re: Plaintiff's L.R. 16-14 Application to Modify the Scheduling Order by Judge George H. King. Plaintiff has not satisfied this standard. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Application is hereby DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/18/2014 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9-9-2014 10:04 a.m. re Transcript [91] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/18/2014 Transcript (CV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9-9-2014 10:04 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number 626-963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2014. (kch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Phyllis A. Jones in opposition to MOTION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 4/24/2015[86] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Volume 1 (Exhibits 1-10), # (2) Exhibit Volume 2 (Exhibits 11-26))(Imbroscio, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 4/24/2015[86] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Imbroscio, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014, Terminated: 9/22/2014 Extend Discovery Cut-Off DateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 4/24/2015 filed by Plaintiff Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. Motion set for hearing on 10/6/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits A-D, # (2) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk. DOCUMENT STRICKEN FOR NON-COMPLIANCE AND NO PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED. RE: Corrected APPLICATION for attorney Kevin M. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14417729 paid.)[82]. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk. DOCUMENT STRICKEN FOR NON-COMPLIANCE AND NO PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED. RE: Corrected APPLICATION for attorney Kevin M. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14417729 paid.) 82 . (lom) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES INELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk. STRICKEN AS IMPROPER, RE: Notice of Lodging [79]. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES INELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk. STRICKEN AS IMPROPER, RE: Notice of Lodging 79 . (lom) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: 9/10/2014 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Corrected APPLICATION for attorney Kevin M. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14417729 paid.)[82]. The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment.Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Submitted Good Standing Certificates that are over 30 days old. Certificate from PA was issued on 6/6/14, certificate from NJ was issued on 8/8/14, and certificate from FL was issued on 8/1/14. Application was filed on 9/8/14. See Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3. See also, Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64).. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/10/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: Case called. Counsel make their appearance. Court hears argument. The Court gives its tentative ruling. Court orders the parties to meet and confer forthwith. Break Case recalled. Defendants motion for protective order is denied in part, defendant is directed to produce documents as stated on the record. Court Recorder: CS 9/9/14. (es)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: Case called. Counsel make their appearance. Court hears argument. The Court gives its tentative ruling. Court orders the parties to meet and confer forthwith. Break Case recalled. Defendants motion for protective order is denied in part, defendant is directed to produce documents as stated on the record. Court Recorder: CS 9/9/14. (es) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014, Terminated: 4/22/2015 Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN - Corrected APPLICATION for attorney Kevin M. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14417729 paid.) filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Lopez, Matthew) Modified on 9/15/2014 (lom). (document is stricken, see doc no. [88].)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Lodging, [79]. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Application [62] filed on 7/3/14 was STRICKEN by the court on 7/9/14. There is no pending Application attached for Court's consideration. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE: Telephonic status conference held regarding discovery dispute. Parties make their appearance. Court finds that plaintiffs are entitled to priority in questioning certain witnesses. (jm) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 9/9/2014 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE: Telephonic status conference held regarding discovery dispute. Parties make their appearance. Court finds that plaintiffs are entitled to priority in questioning certain witnesses. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING PROTECTION OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: granting [72] Motion for Protective Order : Note Changes Made by Court: (see attached) (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN - NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION for attorney Kevin M. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14065235 paid.)[62] (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing-Florida, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing-New Jersey, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing-Pennsylvania)(Lopez, Matthew) Modified on 9/15/2014 (lom). (Document is stricken, see doc no. [87].)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING PROTECTION OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: granting 72 Motion for Protective Order : Note Changes Made by Court: (see attached) (jm) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for precluding any discovery on Prozac or fluoxetine, including the following discovery served to date: (1) Requests for Production of Documents Nos. 125, 140, and 141 in the Carter, Herrera, and Hexum cases; (2) Notice of[72] Plaintiffs' L.R. 37-2.3 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE JOINT APPLICATION FOR A TELEPHONIC HEARING by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: granting [76] Application for Hearing : AND NOW, this 18th day of August 2014, in consideration of the Parties' Joint Application for a Telephonic Conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the Telephonic Conference will be scheduled for August 21, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE JOINT APPLICATION FOR A TELEPHONIC HEARING by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: granting 76 Application for Hearing : AND NOW, this 18th day of August 2014, in consideration of the Parties' Joint Application for a Telephonic Conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the Telephonic Conference will be scheduled for August 21, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. (jm) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014, Terminated: 8/18/2014 Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint APPLICATION for Hearing TELEPHONIC, re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion, [73], filed by PLAINTIFF Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER re: MOTION for Protective Order for precluding any discovery on Prozac or fluoxetine[72] : The Court is in receipt of defendants' motion for protective order filed on August 12, 2014 with a hearing date of September 2, 2014. Any supplemental memoranda pursuant to L.R. 37.2.3 shall be filed no later than August 19, 2014. The hearing on the motion is continued to September 9, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER re: MOTION for Protective Order for precluding any discovery on Prozac or fluoxetine 72 : The Court is in receipt of defendants' motion for protective order filed on August 12, 2014 with a hearing date of September 2, 2014. Any supplemental memoranda pursuant to L.R. 37.2.3 shall be filed no later than August 19, 2014. The hearing on the motion is continued to September 9, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. (jm) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION for Protective Order for precluding any discovery on Prozac or fluoxetine, including the following discovery served to date: (1) Requests for Production of Documents Nos. 125, 140, and 141 in the Carter, Herrera, and Hexum cases; (2) Notice of[72] filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Leckman, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Protective Order for precluding any discovery on Prozac or fluoxetine, including the following discovery served to date: (1) Requests for Production of Documents Nos. 125, 140, and 141 in the Carter, Herrera, and Hexum cases; (2) Notice of[72] filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration Phyllis A. Jones, # (3) Declaration T. Matthew Leckman)(Jones, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014, Terminated: 8/20/2014 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for precluding any discovery on Prozac or fluoxetine, including the following discovery served to date: (1) Requests for Production of Documents Nos. 125, 140, and 141 in the Carter, Herrera, and Hexum cases; (2) Notice of Video Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) on Eli Lillys 1997 Research Symposium on Discontinuation Syndrome served in Carter; and (3) the Subpoena served on Maurizio Fava, M.D., and Jerrold F. Rosenbaum, M.D. filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Motion set for hearing on 9/2/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (Jones, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014 Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge George H. King: granting [68] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jaclyn E. Martinez Resly on behalf of Defendant Ely Lilly and Company, designating David Stanley as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge George H. King The document is accepted as filed RE: APPLICATION for attorney Jaclyn E. Martinez Resly to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14197261 paid.)[68] (shb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Jaclyn E. Martinez Resly to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14197261 paid.)[68]. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): No signature on Application. Local counsel did not sign the application. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014, Terminated: 7/31/2014 Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for attorney Jaclyn E. Martinez Resly to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14197261 paid.) filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Insogna, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Stipulation for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Insogna, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 224 Transferring Reference/Discovery purs LR 83.1.3.1 (Related Case (CV 34a)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:13-cv-2700 GHK(FFMx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for Discovery. The case number will now read as follows: 2:13-cv-2702 GHK(FFMx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 Reassign Case - Self-Recusal - pursuant to GO 14-03 (CV-52)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 14-03 by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:13-cv-02702 GHK(ASx). (esa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 7/9/2014 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge George H. King. DOCUMENT STRICKEN AS INCOMPLETE. RE: APPLICATION for attorney Kevin M. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14065235 paid.)[62]. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: 7/7/2014 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Kevin M. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14065235 paid.)[62]. The following error(s) was found: Certification of Good Standing is not attached to Pro Hac Vice Application. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014, Terminated: 7/9/2014 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN - APPLICATION for attorney Kevin M. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14065235 paid.) filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Lopez, Matthew) Modified on 7/9/2014 (lom). (See Order, doc no. [64].)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 7/1/2014 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. RE: APPLICATION for attorney Frank Chadwick Morriss to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13999351 paid.)[54], APPLICATION for attorney Kathleen Paley to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14008669 paid.)[56], APPLICATION for attorney Emily Ullman to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13999480 paid.)[55] (shb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: 6/26/2014 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Frank Chadwick Morriss to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13999351 paid.)[54], APPLICATION for attorney Kathleen Paley to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14008669 paid.)[56], APPLICATION for attorney Emily Ullman to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13999480 paid.)[55]. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): No signature on Application. Local counsel did not sign the application. Stamp is not a signed signature. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/26/2014 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge George H. King: granting [56] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathleen E. Paley on behalf of Defendant Eli Lilly and Company, designating David Stanley as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/26/2014 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge George H. King: granting [55] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Emily Ullman on behalf of Defendant Eli Lilly and Company, designating David Stanley as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/26/2014 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge George H. King: granting [54] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Frank Chadwick Morriss on behalf of Defendant Eli Lilly and Company, designating David Stanley as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: 6/23/2014, Terminated: 6/25/2014 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for attorney Kathleen Paley to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14008669 paid.) filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Insogna, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014, Terminated: 6/25/2014 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney Emily Ullman to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13999480 paid.) filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Insogna, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014, Terminated: 6/25/2014 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for attorney Frank Chadwick Morriss to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13999351 paid.) filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Insogna, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge George H. King: granting [52] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brett C. Reynolds on behalf of Defendant, designating David Stanley as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: 6/10/2014, Terminated: 6/16/2014 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for attorney Brett C. Reynolds to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13941661 paid.) filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Insogna, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: 6/5/2014 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Telephonic Conference held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Discovery status conference held to discuss proposed stipulated protective order, on June 5, 2014, at 11:00 a.m.Court Recorder: XTR 6/5/14. (mr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING MATTER FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Thursday, June 5, 2014, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (213) 894-0800 and using the access codes listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Codes (Please follow the prompts and enter the codes below): Meeting ID: 1114# User Password: 4555# (mr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge George H. King: granting [46] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Harris Pogust on behalf of plaintiff, designating Matthew Lopez as local counsel. (ak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge George H. King: granting [45] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney T Matthew Leckman on behalf of plaintiffs, designating Matthew Lopez as local counsel. (ak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE BY THE COURT to Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically filed documents: The document is accepted as filed. Application have been denied by the Court on 10/25/13 RE: Application for attorney T. Matthew Leckman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.)[36], Application for attorney Harris L. Pogust to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.)[37]. (ir)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013, Terminated: 11/1/2013 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second APPLICATION for attorney Harris L. Pogust to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Lopez, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013, Terminated: 11/1/2013 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second APPLICATION for attorney T. Matthew Leckman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Lopez, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge George H. King: denying [37] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Harris Pogust. Denied for failure to pay the required Pro Hac Vice appearance fee (ak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge George H. King: denying [36] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice for T. Leckman. Denied for failure to pay the required pro hac vice appearance fee (ak).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Harris L. Pogust to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.)[37], APPLICATION for attorney T. Matthew Leckman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.)[36]. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT (see document for further details) by Judge George H. King. (sw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. King. Any stipulation or motion to amend as to any claims, defenses and/or parties shall be lodged/filed by no later than November 21, 2013, failing which it shall be deemed that partys waiver of any such amendments in this action. All discovery (fact and expert) shall be COMPLETED by no later than December 13, 2014. The parties shall designate their expert witnesses, and make the required disclosures, by no later than September 22, 2014, and do likewise for any rebuttal expert witnesses by no later than October 22, 2014. The parties shall comply with Local Rule 16-15 by no later than January 12, 2015. (See order for further details). Court Reporter: N/A. (shb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge George H. King: A deadline for dispositive motions has been set in the above-captioned case. Any motion(s) for summary judgment SHALL comply with all Federal and Local Rules, as well as this Order. Please be advised that this Order contains requirements more specificthan the Local and Federal Rules. (See order for details) (shb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew Ramon Lopez on behalf of Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Lopez, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013, Terminated: 10/25/2013 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Harris L. Pogust to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Claudia Herrera. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Lopez, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013, Terminated: 10/25/2013 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for attorney T. Matthew Leckman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Claudia Herrera. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Lopez, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES: (In Chambers) Order Discharging OSC: We have reviewed Plaintiffs' response to our September 23, 2013 Order to Show Cause. In light of Plaintiffs' timely response, the OSC [32] is hereby DISCHARGED IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge George H. King. (ir)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Response to Order to Show Cause [33]. The following error was found: Document should be linked to Order to Show Cause. Document is accepted as filed. (ir)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Claudia Herrera to Order to Show Cause (Lopez, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/25/2013 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS; ORDER RE-SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. King: This matter was set for scheduling conference before us on Monday, September 23, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel for plaintiffs in each action failed to appear. Counsel for defendant was present. Due to the absence of plaintiffs counsel, scheduling conference cannot proceed in any meaningful way. Accordingly, we order as follows: Plaintiffs counsel are ordered to show cause, in writing, within 14 days hereof, why they should not be sanctioned for their un-excused failure to appear as ordered for the scheduling conference. Failure to timely oradequately show cause as required herein will result in the imposition of an appropriate sanction against counsel. Scheduling Conference re-set for October 21, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel primarily responsible for the conduct of these actions shall appear in person at that time. (shb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: 9/18/2013 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING NOTICE re: Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2013 at 1:30 PM before Chief Judge George H. King. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-10 days, filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company.. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER: PARTIES ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that the above-captioned case has been reassigned to the calendar of the Hon. George H. King, U.S. District Judge, for all further proceedings. On all documents subsequently filed in this case, please substitute the initials GHK after the case numberin place of the initials of the prior judge, so that the case number will read CV 13-2702 GHK (SSx). This is very important because documents are routed to the assigned judges by means of the initials. Parties are further notified that Judge King is located in the Roybal Federal Building, 255 E. TempleStreet, Los Angeles, CA 90012, and his Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Beatrice Herrera, can be reached at (213) 894-6907. Parties are further notified all dates presently calendared are hereby VACATED pending further order ofthe Court IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge George H. King. (ir)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/21/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge George H. King: granting [26] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael X. Imbroscio on behalf of Defendant, designating David Stanley as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case)(CV 34)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 13-02700 GHK(SSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh and Judge George H. Wu to Judge George H. King and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 13-02702 GHK(SSx). Signed by Judge George H. King (rn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013, Terminated: 8/20/2013 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for attorney Michael X. Imbroscio to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12575834 paid.) filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-10 days, filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company.. (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: 8/9/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting [22] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Phyllis A. Jones on behalf of Defendant, designating David Stanley as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. Related Case(s): 2:13-cv-02700 GHK (SSx); 2:13-cv-02701 CBM (Ex) (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013, Terminated: 8/8/2013 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for attorney Phyllis A. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12506312 paid.) filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine Brown Woliver Insogna on behalf of Defendant Eli Lilly and Company (Insogna, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David E Stanley on behalf of Defendant Eli Lilly and Company (Stanley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: denying [13] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Terming Attorney Michael X Imbroscio. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.3.4 - This Court requires local counsel to maintain an office within the Central District. Ms. Shin is in the Northern District. PHV Counsel will have until August 5, 2013 to comply with Local Rules. Fee shall be returned by the Clerk if counsel has not complied. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: denying [14] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Terming Attorney Phyllis A Jones. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.3.4 - This Court requires local counsel to maintain an office within the Central District. Ms. Shin is in the Northern District. PHV Counsel will have until August 5, 2013 to comply with Local Rules. Fee shall be returned by the Clerk if counsel has not complied. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu. On the Courts own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for August 29, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than August 15, 2013. See Civil L.R. 26-1. (See order for details.) (kti)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint [15]. The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (kti)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: 7/26/2013 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), [1] filed by defendant Eli Lilly and Company.(Shin, Clara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013, Terminated: 7/29/2013 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for attorney Phyllis Alene Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12436053 paid.) filed by defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Shin, Clara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013, Terminated: 7/29/2013 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Michael Xavier Imbroscio to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12436019 paid.) filed by defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Shin, Clara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: 7/1/2013 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company, (Shin, Clara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: 6/25/2013 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Eli Lilly and Company answer now due 7/26/2013, filed by defendant Eli Lilly and Company.(Shin, Clara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Clara J Shin on behalf of Defendant Eli Lilly and Company (Shin, Clara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 PDF Document(s) Received and Attached Re Local Rule 3-2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PDF DOCUMENTS ATTACHED TO DOCKET RE LOCAL RULE 3-2. The following PDF Documents were attached to the Court docket on 4/24/13: Initiating Documents. (mg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 PDF Document(s) Received Re Local Rule 3-2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PDF DOCUMENTS RECEIVED RE LOCAL RULE 3-2. The following PDF Documents were received by the Court on 4/22/13: Initiating Documents. (mg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 E-mail/Telephone Notification Re Local Rule 3-2Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERKS E-MAIL RE LOCAL RULE 3-2 TO COUNSEL on 4/22/13 addressed to mlopez@lopezmchugh.com. COURT REQUIRES YOUR IMMEDIATE RESPONSE. Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2, you are required to e-mail, within 24 hours of filing, a Filed stamped copy of your complaint and other civil case initiating documents, in PDF format to the Court. To date, we have not received the PDF images of your filing. Please do so within 24 hours or this matter will be referred to the Judge for further proceedings. (mg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See order for details.) (kti)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013 Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to T. Matthew Leckman for Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013 Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Harris L. Pogust for Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Claudia Herrera, Peter Lowry. (et) (mg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013 Complaint - (Discovery)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50 inclusive, Eli Lilly and Company. Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Peter Lowry, Claudia Herrera.(et) (mg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) [1] as to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company. (et)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 1,703 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?