Lakeland Rgnl Health System v. Kathleen Sebelius
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 13-5282

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 9, 2016 at 10:05 AM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 2151 - Contract: Medicare Act Overpay
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207577199 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1483806] by Lakeland Regional Health System to dismiss case voluntarily [Service Date: 03/13/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [13-5282] (Rubin, Lori)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207567297 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
    CLERK'S ORDER filed [1478079] granting appellant's consent motion to extend the briefing schedule [1477865-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 03/20/2014. APPELLEE Brief due on 04/21/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 05/05/2014. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 05/12/2014. Final Briefs due 05/27/2014. [13-5282]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207566930 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
      CONSENT UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1477865] by Lakeland Regional Health System to extend time to file brief to 03/20/2014. [Service Date: 01/31/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [13-5282] (Rubin, Lori)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207555992 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1471351] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 02/03/2014. APPELLEE Brief due on 03/05/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 03/19/2014. Deferred APPENDIX due 03/26/2014. Final Briefs due 04/09/2014. [13-5282]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207540908 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
          CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1463178] by Kathleen Sebelius [Service Date: 10/25/2013 ] [13-5282] (Klein, Alisa)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207540903 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
            ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1463175] by Alisa B. Klein on behalf of Appellee Kathleen Sebelius. [13-5282] (Klein, Alisa)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207538637 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
              CLERK'S ORDER filed [1461879] considering motion to hold case in abeyance [1461499-2]; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellant/petitioner [1456393-2] APPELLANT dispositive motions due 11/08/2013; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellee/respondent [1456393-3] APPELLEE certificate as to parties, ect. due 10/25/2013. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 11/08/2013. APPELLEE procedural motions due 10/25/2013 [13-5282]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207537952 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                CONSENT UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1461499] by Kathleen Sebelius to hold case in abeyance Pages: 1-10. [13-5282] (Biddle, Barbara)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207537931 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                  ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1461492] by Barbara Cozad Biddle on behalf of Appellee Kathleen Sebelius. [13-5282] (Biddle, Barbara)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207537614 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                    UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1461329] by Lakeland Regional Health System [Service Date: 10/15/2013 ] [13-5282] (Rubin, Lori)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207537611 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                      TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1461328] by Lakeland Regional Health System [Service Date: 10/15/2013 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [13-5282] (Rubin, Lori)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207537608 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                        STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1461327] by Lakeland Regional Health System [Service Date: 10/15/2013 ] [13-5282] (Rubin, Lori)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207537605 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                          STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1461326] by Lakeland Regional Health System [Service Date: 10/15/2013 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [13-5282] (Rubin, Lori)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207537602 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                            DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1461325] by Lakeland Regional Health System [Service Date: 10/15/2013 ] [13-5282] (Rubin, Lori)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207537599 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1461324] by Lakeland Regional Health System [Service Date: 10/15/2013 ] [13-5282] (Rubin, Lori)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207537596 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                STATEMENT FILED [1461323] by Lakeland Regional Health System with Disclosure Listing [Service Date: 10/15/2013 ] [13-5282] (Rubin, Lori)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207537584 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                  ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1461319] by Lori A. Rubin on behalf of Appellant Lakeland Regional Health System. [13-5282] (Rubin, Lori)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207529234 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                    CLERK'S ORDER filed [1456393] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/15/2013. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 10/15/2013. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/15/2013. APPELLANT underlying decision due 10/15/2013. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 10/15/2013. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 10/15/2013. APPELLANT transcript status report due 10/15/2013. APPELLANT procedural motions due 10/15/2013. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 10/28/2013; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 10/15/2013. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 10/15/2013. APPELLEE procedural motions due 10/15/2013. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/28/2013 [13-5282]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207529227 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1456389] by Lakeland Regional Health System seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:12-cv-00600-RJL. Assigned USCA Case Number [13-5282]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?