Optical Devices LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co Ltd et al.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01529
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2017 at 1:41 PM EST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Optical Devices, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William David Belanger +1 617 204 5101 +1 617 204 5150 belangerw@pepperlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Boundy boundyc@pepperlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Brooks brooksr@pepperlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EDMOND D. JOHNSON +1 302 777 6539 +1 302 421 8390 johnsone@pepperlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noah V. Malgeri +1 617 204 5100 malgerin@pepperlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Gordon McMillan, III +1 302 777 6556 +1 302 421 8390 mcmillanj@pepperlaw.com
v.
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas James Whilt +1 805 430 5372 +1 213 430 6407 nwhilt@omm.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan K Yagura +1 213 430 6189 +1 213 430 6407 ryagura@omm.com
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co Ltd"

Toggle Switch Represented by Novak Druce, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis DiGiovanni +1 302 658 9141 frank.digiovanni@novakdruce.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) (see document for patent numbers). (ntl) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Optical Devices LLC as to Defendants Samsung Eectronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Johnson, Edmond) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Change of Address by Francis DiGiovanni (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
        MOTION to Stay Action Pending ITC Determination - filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan K. Yagura and Nicholas J. Whilt - filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to December 4, 2013 - filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert A. Brooks - filed by Optical Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification by Robert A. Brooks)(McMillan, James) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William D. Belanger, Noah V. Malgeri, Christopher Boundy, and Alexandra C. Fennell - filed by Optical Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification by William D. Belanger, # 2 Certification by Christopher Boundy, # 3 Certification by Alexandra C. Fennell, # 4 Certification by Noah V. Malgeri)(McMillan, James) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                  Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Optical Devices LLC identifying Corporate Parent OD Management Systems, LLC for Optical Devices LLC.. (McMillan, James) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Samsung Electronics America, Inc. on 9-5-2013, filed by Optical Devices LLC. (McMillan, James) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,809,995 B2; 6,847,597 B2; 6,904,007 B2; 6,970,410 B2; 7,196,979 B2; 7,839,729 B2; 8,416,651 B2; RE40,927 E; RE42,913 E; RE43,681 E. (els) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (els) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Electronics Co Ltd - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1360325.) - filed by Optical Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K and L, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 215 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?