Optical Devices LLC v. Nintendo Co. Ltd. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01528
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2017 at 1:55 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Optical Devices, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William David Belanger +1 617 204 5101 +1 617 204 5150 belangerw@pepperlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Boundy boundyc@pepperlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Brooks brooksr@pepperlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EDMOND D. JOHNSON +1 302 777 6539 +1 302 421 8390 johnsone@pepperlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noah V. Malgeri +1 617 204 5100 malgerin@pepperlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Gordon McMillan, III +1 302 777 6556 +1 302 421 8390 mcmillanj@pepperlaw.com
v.
Nintendo Company, Ltd. Nintendo Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Nintendo Co. Ltd."

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Jacobs +1 302 658 9200 kjacobs@mnat.com
Nintendo of America, Inc. Nintendo of America, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) (see attached list). (ntl) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Optical Devices LLC as to Defendants Nintendo Co., Ltd. and Nintendo of America, Inc. (McMillan, James) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
      MOTION to Stay Action Pending ITC Determination (Unopposed) - filed by Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amol A. Parikh of McDermott Will & Emery - filed by Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel R. Foster and Christopher D. Bright - filed by Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
            Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 4, 2013 - filed by Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc., Optical Devices LLC. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert A. Brooks - filed by Optical Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification by Robert A. Brooks)(McMillan, James) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William D. Belanger, Noah V. Malgeri, Christopher Boundy, and Alexandra C. Fennell - filed by Optical Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification by William D. Belanger, # 2 Certification by Christopher Boundy, # 3 Certification by Alexandra C. Fennell, # 4 Certification by Noah V. Malgeri)(McMillan, James) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                  Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Optical Devices LLC identifying Corporate Parent OD Management Systems, LLC for Optical Devices LLC.. (McMillan, James) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Optical Devices LLC. Nintendo of America Inc. served on 9/4/2013, answer due 9/25/2013. (McMillan, James) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,809,995 B2; US 6,847,597 B2; US 6,904,007 B2; US 6,970,410 B2; US 7,196,979 B2; US 7,839,729 B2; US 8,416,651 B2; US RE40,927 E; US RE42,913 E; US RE43,681 E. (dmp, ) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (dmp, ) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-1360311.) - filed by Optical Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K & L, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 138 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?