Doe v. Lee
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-04029-LB
Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 1:37 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jane Doe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by bcgattorneys.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew M. Gold +1 510 832 5005 +1 510 832 5020 agold@bcgattorneys.com
v.
No Logo David Kuo Huei Lee, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit P.I.: Other
Office San Francisco
Filed 8/29/2013
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,CONSENT,ProSe
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: 11/11/2015 Response ( Non Motion )
RESPONSE to re [95] Objection, [94] Proposed Order - Declaration in Response to Defendant's Proposed Judgment by Jane Doe. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 11/11/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Objection
    OBJECTIONS to re [95] Objection Declaration of Armand Tinkerian by David Kuo Huei Lee. (Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Objection
      OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment by David Kuo Huei Lee. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Proposed Order
        Proposed Order re [81] Received Document, [93] Order,, Proposed Judgment by Jane Doe. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support of Proposed Judgment)(Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES. The court orders that the amount to be paid under the terms of the settlement agreement is $35,000. Pursuant to the terms of the MOU, it is payable in equal installments over 10 years, with simple interest at the rate of inflation. (ECF No. 81 at 5.) The parties must raise any objections to the proposed judgment for permanent injunction and damages (ECF No. 69-2) no later than November 10, 2015. The parties must efile any revision and then email a word version to the court's orders box at lbpo@cand.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/3/2015. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 92 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/13/2015 Motion HearingCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Motion Hearing for Attorney Fees via CourtCall held on 10/8/2015. Court will issue an order. (Digital FTR Recording: 3:56-4:06) Plaintiff Attorney: Andrew M. Gold. Defendant Attorney: Armand Tinkerian. This is a text only Minute Entry. ( lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/8/2015)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 91 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: 9/28/2015 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                CLERK'S NOTICE: Because the court is in trial on October 8, 2015, the court resets the Motion for Attorney Fees to 10/8/2015 at 2:15 P.M. in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015 Response ( Non Motion )
                  Declaration of Andrew M. Gold in Further Support of [85] Attorneys' Fees Calculation by Jane Doe. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 9/24/2015) Modified on 9/25/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 89 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: 9/22/2015 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                    CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Case Management Conference. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD:Please take notice that the case management conference currently scheduled for September 24, 2015 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler is VACATED. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015 Response ( Non Motion )
                      OPPOSITION to [85] Declaration/Motion for Attorney's Fees by David Kuo Huei Lee. (Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 9/17/2015) Modified on 9/18/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 87 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Sealed TranscriptCourt Filing
                        Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/20/15, before Judge Beeler. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela A. Batalo, Telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 9/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2015. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER TO PRO TEM REPORTER TO PRODUCE TRANSCRIPT: Re [83] Show Cause Hearing Motion Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/4/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: 9/2/2015 Declaration in Support
                            Declaration of Andrew M. Gold in Support of [83] Show Cause Hearing,,,, Motion Hearing,,, In Support of Attorneys' Fees Calculation filed byJane Doe. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[83]) (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: 9/1/2015 Declaration in Opposition
                              DECLARATION of Anthony Brooklier in Opposition to [81] Received Document filed byDavid Kuo Huei Lee. (Related document(s)[81]) (Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 82 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                Order finding as moot [69] Motion entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. At the August 20, 2015 hearing, the parties resolved their differences regarding the settlement agreement and in open court affirmed that the document filed at ECF No. 81 is their settlement agreement. Given the parties' settlement, the court denies the motion to enforce the settlement as moot. The parties will follow the briefing schedule set forth in ECF No. 80 regarding fees. The court will determine the amount of fees to be awarded. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 83 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: 8/31/2015 Show Cause HearingCourt Filing
                                  AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Show Cause Hearing held on 8/20/2015. Motion to Enforce and Enter Judgment Hearing held on 8/20/2015 Re: 69 Motion to Enforce Memorandum of Understanding and Enter Judgment Thereon filed by Jane Doe. Settlement Agreement to be filed under seal. Plaintiff's Attorney Fees filing due 9/3/2015. Supporting documentation for attorney fees to be submitted to the court in camera review. Defendant's Reply due September 17, 2015. Attorney Fee Hearing set for October 8, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. (Digital FTR Recording: 9:36-9:52; 11:16-11:26 - Under Seal - Counsel of record may obtain a copy of the under seal recording.) Plaintiff Attorney: Andrew Gold. Defendant Attorney: Armand Tinkerian. This is a text only Minute Entry.(lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/20/2015)
                                    LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 81 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: 8/20/2015 Received Document
                                    Sealed Document. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015) (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 80 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: 8/20/2015 Show Cause HearingCourt Filing
                                      See Amended Minute Order ECF No. 83 - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Show Cause Hearing held on 8/20/2015. Motion to Enforce and Enter Judgment Hearing held on 8/20/2015 Re: [69] Motion to Enforce Memorandum of Understanding and Enter Judgment Thereon filed by Jane Doe. Settlement Agreement to be filed under seal. Plaintiff's Attorney Fees filing due 9/3/2015. Supporting documentation for attorney fees to be submitted to the court in camera review. Defendant's Reply due September 17, 2015. Attorney Fee Hearing set for October 8, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. (Digital FTR Recording: 9:36-9:52; 11:16-11:26) Plaintiff Attorney: Andrew Gold. Defendant Attorney Armand Tinkerian. This is a text only Minute Entry. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/31/2015 (lsS, COURT STAFF).
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                        Set/Reset Hearing: Motion for Attorney Fees Hearing set for 10/8/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: 8/18/2015 Status Report
                                          STATUS REPORT Updated by Jane Doe. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 78 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                            CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING HEARING TIME ONLY: Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce and Enter Judgment Hearing reset to 8/20/2015 at 9:30 A.M. in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Order to Show Cause Hearing reset to 8/20/2015 at 9:30 A.M. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court sets a show-cause hearing for 11:00 a.m. on August 20, 2015 in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, United States District Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California 94102. The court orders the defendant's counsel to appear at the show-cause hearing in person. The plaintiff's counsel may appear at the show-cause hearing by telephone through CourtCall, although the court stated at the August 13, 2015 hearing that appearing in person may be more helpful. The court also orders the parties to meet and confer by Monday, August 17, 2015 and to submit a status update by 5:00 p.m. Pacific time on Tuesday, August 18, 2015. If the parties notify the court before then that they have agreed to settle this matter, the show-cause hearing will be vacated. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/20/2015 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/13/2015. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 76 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Motion Hearing held on 8/13/2015 Re: [69] Motion to Enforce Memorandum of Understanding and Enter Judgment Thereon filed by Jane Doe. Motion to Enforce and Enter Judgment Hearing set for 8/20/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Court will issue an Order To Show Cause. Plaintiff's counsel may appear by phone. Plaintiff's counsel to make the necessary arrangements through CourtCall. (Digital FTR Recording: 10:39-10:44) Plaintiff Attorney: Andrew M. Gold. Defendant Attorney: Not Present. This is a text only Minute Entry. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/13/2015)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                  NOTICE by Jane Doe of Unavailability (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                    REPLY (re [69] MOTION to Enforce Memorandum of Understanding and Enter Judgment Thereon ) filed byJane Doe. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Andrew M. Gold, # (2) Declaration Plaintiff)(Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on August 6, 2015 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. A Joint Case Management Statement (with updated information only) due by 9/17/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                        RESPONSE (re [69] MOTION to Enforce Memorandum of Understanding and Enter Judgment Thereon ) filed byDavid Kuo Huei Lee. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting [68] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                            RESPONSE (re [69] MOTION to Enforce Memorandum of Understanding and Enter Judgment Thereon , [68] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byDavid Kuo Huei Lee. (Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015, Terminated: 8/27/2015 Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                              MOTION to Enforce Memorandum of Understanding and Enter Judgment Thereon filed by Jane Doe. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 7/16/2015. Replies due by 7/23/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015, Terminated: 7/15/2015 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Declaration of Andrew M. Gold in Support of Motion to Enforce Memorandum of Understanding and Enter Judgment Thereon, # (4) Unredacted Version of Declaration of Andrew M. Gold in Support of Motion to Enforce Memorandum of Understanding and Enter Judgment Thereon)(Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE: Case Management Conference set for June 25, 2015 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler is VACATED. Case settled in mediation. Counsel to submit stipulated dismissal or a Joint Case Management Statement (with updated information only) due by 7/30/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2015)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: 6/4/2015 Certification of Mediation Session
                                                                    CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session by Mediator, Stephen H. Sulmeyer; Mediation session held 6/3/2015; Case settled; Mediation process is complete. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                      STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting [63] Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/16/2015. A Joint Case Management Statement (with updated information only) due by 6/18/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Counsel may appear by phone. Parties to make the arrangements through CourtCall. The ADR deadline extended to the end of June, 2015. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorney: Andrew Gold. Defendant Attorney: Armand Tinkerian (tele). This is a text only Minute Entry. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2015)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: 4/15/2015, Terminated: 4/16/2015 Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Protective Order filed by Jane Doe. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Case Management Statement
                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Updated and Order filed by Jane Doe. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER DIRECTING THE FILING OF A CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. On March 13, 2015, in light of the parties' April 9, 2015 mediation, the court continued the case management conference to April 16, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. and directed the parties to file a short Updated Case Management Conference Statement (with only new information) by April 10, 2015 at 1:00 p.m. The parties did not do that. Accordingly, the court directs the parties to file a case management statement by 9:00 a.m. on April 14, 2015. (This is a text entry order generated by the Court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/13/2015. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2015) Modified on 4/14/2015 (lsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: 3/18/2015 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting [59] Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel to make arrangements through CourtCall. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015, Terminated: 3/18/2015 Appear by Telephone
                                                                                  MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by David Kuo Huei Lee. (Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Clerks Notice
                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE: Given the parties' upcoming mediation on April 9, 2015, the court continues the case management conference to April 16, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. and directs the filing of a short Updated Case Management Conference Statement (with only new information) by April 10, 2015 at 1:00 p.m. If there are issues regarding the protective order that need to be navigated before the mediation, the parties must notify the court by joint submission about their differences by March 26, 2015. The parties are referred to the undersigned's standing order regarding the procedures for discovery disputes. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Case Management Statement
                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT , Updated Joint, and [Proposed] Order filed by Jane Doe. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                        Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 4/9/2015 at 09:00 AM at the Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, 16th Floor, San Francisco, CA. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Pre MED phone conference
                                                                                          Pre MED phone conference scheduled on 3/11/2015 at 2:00 PM. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
                                                                                            ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Stephen H. Sulmeyer, J.D., Ph.D. as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Order on Stipulation selecting MediationCourt Filing
                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS, Court Mediation by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting [54] Stipulation selecting Mediation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015, Terminated: 1/21/2015 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation
                                                                                                STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Jane Doe filed by Jane Doe. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  ADR Phone Conference held
                                                                                                  ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 1/15/2015 with Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  ADR Remark
                                                                                                    ADR Remark: Further ADR Phone Conference scheduled on 1/9/2015 at 12:15 PM Pacific time is rescheduled to 1/15/2015 at 12:15 PM Pacific time. Call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  ADR Phone Conference held
                                                                                                      ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Howard A. Herman Director, ADR Program on 12/29/2014. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 1/9/2015 at 12:15 PM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER (JURY): A Joint Case Management Statement (with updated information) due by 3/12/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 2/29/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 3/1/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 3/3/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 3/4/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Selection set for 2/29/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/22/2014. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
                                                                                                          ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 12/29/14 at 3:00 p.m. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 Case Management Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/18/2014. A Joint Case Management Statement (with updated information only) due by 3/12/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. This civil minute order will serve as notice to ADR Department that a conference call should be set for this matter to discuss ADR options. FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Andrew Gold. Defendant Attorney: Amand Tinkerian (telephonic). This is a text only Minute Entry. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on December 11, 2014 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Case Management Conference reset to 12/18/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. All parties may appear by phone. Counsel to make arrangements through CourtCall. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Jane Doe. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Entities by Jane Doe (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Statement
                                                                                                                    Statement Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by David Kuo Huei Lee. (Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting [44] Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel to make the necessary arrangements through CourtCall. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re [44] MOTION to Appear by Telephone by David Kuo Huei Lee. (Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014, Terminated: 12/3/2014 Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by David Kuo Huei Lee. (Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Answer
                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byDavid Kuo Huei Lee. (Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Order on Motion to Set Aside DefaultCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING [31] DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE HIS DEFAULT. Mr. Lee must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint within 21 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/10/2014. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME ONLY: Case Management Conference reset to 12/11/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING Motion to Set Aside Default Hearing on November 6, 2014 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The motion will be determined on the pleadings submitted. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/21/2014, Entered: 9/21/2014 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Armand Tinkerian (Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 9/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/21/2014, Entered: 9/21/2014 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re [31] MOTION to Set Aside Default ) filed byDavid Kuo Huei Lee. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 9/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re [31] MOTION to Set Aside Default ) filed byJane Doe. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Plaintiff, # (2) Declaration Andrew M. Gold)(Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: 9/4/2014 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on September 25, 2014 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2014. Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. The deadlines for the Motion to Set Aside Default are as follows: Opposition due 9/15/2014. Reply due 9/22/2014. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines as to [31] MOTION to Set Aside Default . Responses due by 9/15/2014. Replies due by 9/22/2014. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: 9/3/2014 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting [32] Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel to make the necessary arrangements through CourtCall. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/31/2014, Entered: 8/31/2014 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                Request for Judicial Notice re [31] MOTION to Set Aside Default filed byDavid Kuo Huei Lee. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit Title Page, # (2) Exhibit Bankruptcy Petition, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit Title Page, # (4) Exhibit Amended Bankruptcy)(Related document(s)[31]) (Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 8/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/30/2014, Entered: 8/30/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT by David Kuo Huei Lee. (Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 8/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/30/2014, Entered: 8/30/2014, Terminated: 9/3/2014 Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by David Kuo Huei Lee. (Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 8/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/30/2014, Entered: 8/30/2014, Terminated: 11/10/2014 Set Aside DefaultCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by David Kuo Huei Lee. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 11/20/2014. Replies due by 12/1/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit exhibit 1a, # (3) Exhibit exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit exhibit 2a)(Tinkerian, Armand) (Filed on 8/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: 7/16/2014 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                        CLERKS NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                          UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Jane Doe. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 7/15/2014) Modified on 7/16/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on May 29, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/17/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                              UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Jane Doe. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 5/1/2014) Modified on 5/1/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                CLERKS NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on March 27, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement (with updated informatio only) due by 5/22/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [Proposed] Order filed by Jane Doe. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT -Redacted per Court Order against David Kuo Huei Lee. Filed by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 2/18/2014) Modified on 2/18/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER (1) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND (2) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL THE COMPLAINT AND COURT FILE. To allow Plaintiff to proceed under a fictitious name, while at the same time avoiding the need for Plaintiff to re-file redacted versions of every filing that has been made so far in this action, the court ORDERS the following: (1) The Clerk of the Court directed to limit access of all documents filed in this action to date to case participants only. These documents are found on the Docket at ECF Nos. 1-22. (2) For this order (ECF No. 23), the court changes the caption for this action to list Plaintiff as "Jane Doe." The Clerk of the Court is directed to change the caption on ECF. (3) For all subsequent filings in this action, the parties shall use the new "Jane Doe" caption and shall refer to Plaintiff either as "Plaintiff" or "Jane Doe." (4) Plaintiff is directed to file by February 21, 2014 a redacted version of the Complaint that replaces the old caption with the new caption and replaces her name with "Plaintiff" or "Jane Doe" anywhere else that it appears. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/18/2014.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2014: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014, Terminated: 2/18/2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Andrew M. Gold, # (2) Proposed Order Re: Motion for Administrative Relief, # (3) Certificate/Proof of Service Re: Motion for Administrative Relief, # (4) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Motion to Seal, # (5) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Declaration of Plaintiff, # (6) Certificate/Proof of Service Re: Motion to Seal)(Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 1/28/2014) Modified on 2/18/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014, Terminated: 2/18/2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Seal Complaint and Court File filed by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Andrew M. Gold Re: Motion for Administrative Relief, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 1/27/2014) Modified on 2/18/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/23/2014. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2014: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on March 13, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff re [17] Clerks Notice, (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 12/10/2013) Modified on 2/18/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/5/2013 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/5/2013 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Plaintiff. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 12/5/2013) Modified on 2/18/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: 11/5/2013 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerks Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to David Kuo Huei Lee. (Related documents(s) [14])(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013, Terminated: 11/5/2013 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Entry of Default as to David Kuo Huei Lee filed by Plaintiff. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 10/28/2013) Modified on 11/2/2013 (farS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/18/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013, Terminated: 10/28/2013 Motion for Default Judgment - by the Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC [14] MOTION for Default Judgment by the Clerk as to Defendant David Kuo Huei Lee filed by Plaintiff. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 10/28/2013) Modified on 11/2/2013 (farS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/18/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge; by David Kuo Huei Lee. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013) Modified on 10/23/2013 (ls, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                                                                                                                              **SECOND** CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge due October 21, 2013. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S NOTICE TITLED "SPECIAL APPEARANCE TO CONTEST PERSONAL JURISDICTION." Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/2/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2013: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE re Special Appearance to Contest Personal Jurisdiction by David Kuo Huei Lee (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED as to David Kuo Huei Lee on 9/12/13 by Plaintiff (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 9/23/2013) Modified on 9/24/2013 (farS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/18/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 9/16/2013) Modified on 2/18/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge due September 20, 2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to David Kuo Huei Lee. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Summons. (Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against David Kuo Huei Lee ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-7965225.). Filed by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Gold, Andrew) (Filed on 8/29/2013) Modified on 2/18/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 303 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?