Elderberry of Weber City, LLC v. Living Centers - Southeast, In
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 13-2176

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2017 at 5:28 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4230 - Rent Lease Ejectment
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405550351 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
(ENTRY RESTRICTED) PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 6:12-cv-00052-NKM-RSB. [999624425]. [13-2176]--[Edited 08/11/2015 by CT] (CT)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00404865882 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
    FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated, Mariner Health Care, Incorporated and Appellee Elderberry of Weber City, LLC. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 02/27/2014. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Yes. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999305828] [13-2176] James Segroves
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 13-2176 opn.p.arg. Decision: Affirmed in part, vacated in part, and remanded. Originating case number: 6:12-cv-00052-NKM-RSB. Entered on Docket Date: 08/10/2015. [999637583] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [13-2176] (CT)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
        AMENDED PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 6:12-cv-00052-NKM-RSB. [999637551]. [13-2176]--[Edited 08/11/2015 by CT] (CT)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 49 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
          COURT ORDER filed [999637549] granting Motion for rehearing [46] and to amend opinion. Copies to all parties.. [13-2176] (CT)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
            Case reopened upon grant of rehearing/rehearing en banc. Originating case number: 6:12-cv-00052-NKM-RSB. [13-2176] (CT)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
              Mandate stayed by FRAP 41(d)(1). [13-2176] (CT)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                PETITION for rehearing (FRAP 40; Local Rule 40(a)-(c)) by Appellants Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated and Mariner Health Care, Incorporated. [13-2176] James Segroves
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                  JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 13-2176 opn.p.arg. Decision: Affirmed in part, vacated in part, remanded. Originating case number: 6:12-cv-00052-NKM-RSB. Entered on Docket Date: 07/21/2015. [999624439] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [13-2176]--[Edited 07/21/2015 by CT] (CT)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                    PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 6:12-cv-00052-NKM-RSB. [999624425]. [13-2176] (CT)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                      ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee Elderberry of Weber City, LLC. [999489960] [13-2176] James Crockett
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                        ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellants Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated and Mariner Health Care, Incorporated. Counsel arguing: James F. Segroves Opening argument time: TBD Rebuttal argument time: TBD [999489764] [13-2176] James Segroves
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                          CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 01/28/2015. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. [13-2176] (JLC)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                            CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 1/27/15 - 1/29/15 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 11/24/2014 [13-2176] (JLC)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                              CASE CONTINUED FROM TENTATIVE CALENDAR TO AWAITING CALENDAR. [999441003] [13-2176] (JLC)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE RE: CONFLICT WITH PROPOSED ARGUMENT DATES by Appellee Elderberry of Weber City, LLC. Argument Session: 12/14 Days you are available: 0 [13-2176] James Crockett
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                  CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 12/9/14 - 12/11/14 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 09/15/2014 [13-2176] (JLC)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                    FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated, Mariner Health Care, Incorporated and Appellee Elderberry of Weber City, LLC. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 02/27/2014. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Yes. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999305828] [13-2176] James Segroves
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                      BRIEF by Appellants Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated and Mariner Health Care, Incorporated in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/27/2014. [999305814] [13-2176] James Segroves
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                        CHANGE OF ADDRESS Notice by Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated and Mariner Health Care, Incorporated... [13-2176] James Segroves
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                          ORDER filed [999276395] granting Motion to extend filing time [22], updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 02/27/2014. Response brief due 03/31/2014. Copies to all parties. [13-2176] (CT)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                            MOTION by Appellants Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated and Mariner Health Care, Incorporated to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until February 27, 2014. Date and method of service: 01/13/2014 ecf. [999276049] [13-2176] James Segroves
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by James S. Crockett, Jr. for Elderberry of Weber City, LLC.[999253742] [13-2176] James Crockett
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                ORDER filed [999252395] granting Motion to extend filing time [19], updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 02/06/2014. Response brief due 03/10/2014. Copies to all parties. [13-2176] (CT)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION by Appellants Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated and Mariner Health Care, Incorporated to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until February 5, 2014. Date and method of service: 12/04/2013 ecf. [999252028] [13-2176] James Segroves
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                    BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/06/2014. Response Brief due 02/10/2014 [13-2176] (CT)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Evans & Company. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motions hearing - 08/02/2013 before Judge Moon. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Travis Knobbe. Originating case number: 6:12-cv-00052-NKM-RSB. Transcript due from Evans & Company, Contract Court Reporter on 11/12/2013. [13-2176] (CT)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Elderberry of Weber City, LLC for Shelly Tyree. [13-2176] Travis Knobbe
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-2176] (SLW)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lori D. Thompson for Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated and Mariner Health Care, Incorporated.[999210689] [13-2176] Lori Thompson
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                              DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated and Mariner Health Care, Incorporated. [13-2176] James Segroves
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Mariner Health Care, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999210639] [13-2176] James Segroves
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999210637] [13-2176] James Segroves
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999210636] [13-2176] James Segroves
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999210635] [13-2176] James Segroves
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by James F. Segroves for Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated and Mariner Health Care, Incorporated.[999210633] [13-2176] James Segroves
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Elderberry of Weber City, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999210207] [13-2176] Milton Mantiply
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by M. Mallory Mantiply for Elderberry of Weber City, LLC.[999210017] [13-2176] Milton Mantiply
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Travis A. Knobbe for Elderberry of Weber City, LLC.[999209751] [13-2176] Travis Knobbe
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                DISTRICT COURT UPDATE. ORDER granting [193] Motion to Stay and to Approve Supersedeas Bond. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on September 30, 2013 [13-2176] (JB)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 6:12-cv-00052-NKM-RSB. [13-2176] (CT)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:12-cv-00052-NKM-RSB. Case manager: CTyree. [13-2176] (CT)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 190 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?