TCYK, LLC v. DOE
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-07074

Tags
Last Updated October 3, 2016 at 12:49 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
Space Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
v.
No Logo Doe, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Ginsburg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen Elizabeth O'Neill +1 312 368 0100 koneill@lgattorneys.com
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Notice of Motion
NOTICE of Motion by Kristen Elizabeth O'Neill for presentment of motion to quash[13] before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 12/5/2013 at 09:15 AM. (O'Neill, Kristen)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Memorandum
    MEMORANDUM motion to quash[13] by Doe Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Quash Subpoena, Vacate Order Granting Discovery, and to Dismiss (O'Neill, Kristen)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Motion to Quash
      MOTION by Defendant Doe to quash Subpoena, Vacate Order Granting Discovery, and to Dismiss (O'Neill, Kristen)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Attorney Appearance
        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Doe by Kristen Elizabeth O'Neill (O'Neill, Kristen)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Order
          ENTER ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY PRIOR TO RULE 26(f)CONFERENCE. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/11/2013. Mailed notice(tbk, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Order on Motion for Discovery
            MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference [7] is granted. Order to follow. Mailed notice (tbk, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Notice of Motion
              NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery[7] before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/10/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                MEMORANDUM by TCYK, LLC in support of motion for discovery[7] Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Motion for Discovery
                  MOTION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule 3.2
                    NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Copyright Report
                      MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (ea, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Attorney Appearance
                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Attorney Appearance
                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 civil cover sheet
                            CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT filed by TCYK, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8789391. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 157 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?