USA v. Vreeland
Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-02040-W

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
Space Caroline Pineda Han +1 619 557 5220 +1 619 235 2757 Caroline.Han@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo John Michael Vreeland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Matthew Mangan +1 619 234 8467 +1 619 687 2666 Frank_Mangan@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Diego
Filed 6/18/2008
County San Diego
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
308-mj-01777-LSP
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113(a) - Bank Robbery
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Consent to PleaCourt Filing
CONSENT TO PLEA before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas by John Michael Vreeland. (cap)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Plea Agreement
    PLEA AGREEMENT as to John Michael Vreeland. (cap)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Findings and RecommendationCourt Filing
      FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION as to John Michael Vreeland: Recommending that the district judge accept the defendant's plea of guilty. The sentencing hearind will be before United States District Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 12/29/08 at 9:00 a.m. Objections must be filed within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas on 9/2/08. (cap)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas:Change of Plea Hearing as to John Michael Vreeland held on 9/2/2008. Plea Agreement Filed. PSR Ordered. Guilty Plea tendered by John Michael Vreeland on count 1 of the Indictment. Excludable(s) XK Proposed Plea Agreement and XT1 Interest of Justice - Tendered A Guilty Plea started 9/2/2008 until 12/29/2008 as to John Michael Vreeland. Motions withdrawn as to John Michael Vreeland. Pending hearings vacated except Sentencing Hearing. Accept Plea with P.O. Report set for 12/29/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 07 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (Tape #LSP08-10:14-10:31).(Plaintiff Attorney Jamie Parks S/A AUSA).(Defendant Attorney Frank Mangan FD). (jmj)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
          NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant John Michael Vreeland. At defense counsel's request: Change of Plea Hearing set for 9/2/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas. (r1r)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Motion Hearing/Trial SettingCourt Filing
            Minute Entry :Continuance of Motion Hearing/Trial Setting as to John Michael Vreeland held on 8/14/2008 before Judge Whelan. At the request of defense counsel, the Court orders the Motion Hearing/Trial Setting continued to 9/15/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 07 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (Court Reporter Melissa Pierson).(Plaintiff Attorney Caroline Han).(Defendant Attorney Frank Mangan, Fed Def Inc.). (ct)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008, Terminated: 9/2/2008 Motion for Reciprocal Discovery
              MOTION for Reciprocal Discovery by USA as to John Michael Vreeland. (Han, Caroline) (cap).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Response in Opposition
                RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to John Michael Vreeland re [11] MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Preserve Evidence MOTION to Suppress Statements MOTION for Leave to File Further Motions (Han, Caroline) (cap).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008, Terminated: 9/2/2008 Motion for Discovery
                  MOTION for Discovery, MOTION to Preserve Evidence, MOTION to Suppress Statements, MOTION for Leave to File Further Motions by John Michael Vreeland. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities)(Mangan, Frank) (cap).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Motion SettingCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry :Motion Setting as to John Michael Vreeland held on 6/30/2008 before Judge Whelan. The Court orders the case set for Motion Hearing/Trial Setting on 8/14/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 07 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan.) (Court Reporter Melissa Pierson).(Plaintiff Attorney Caroline Han).(Defendant Attorney Frank Mangan, Fed Def Inc.). (ct)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Caroline Pineda Han appearing for USA. (Han, Caroline)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas:Arraignment on Indictment as to John Michael Vreeland (1) Count 1 held on 6/19/2008. Not Guilty plea entered. Motion Setting set for 6/30/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 07 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (Tape #LSP08-9:39-9:42).(Plaintiff Attorney Greg Noonan AUSA).(Defendant Attorney Frank Mangan). (jmj)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Indictment
                          INDICTMENT as to John Michael Vreeland (1) count(s) 1. (asw) (jcj).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Frank Matthew Mangan appearing for John Michael Vreeland (Mangan, Frank)(mam).[3:08-mj-01777-LSP]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                              ORDER Setting Conditions of Release Bond set for John Michael Vreeland (1) $50,000 C/CS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas on 6/6/08. (jmp)[3:08-mj-01777-LSP]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by John Michael Vreeland (1). (jjh)[3:08-mj-01777-LSP]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas: Initial Appearance on complaint as to John Michael Vreeland (1) held on 6/6/2008. Federal Defenders appointed for John Michael Vreeland (1). Bond set as to John Michael Vreeland (1) $50,000 C/CS. (Preliminary Hearing set for 6/19/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas.) (Tape #13:55-14:11).(Plaintiff Attorney Greg Noonan, AUSA).(Defendant Attorney James Chavez, FD-S/A). (jjh)[3:08-mj-01777-LSP]
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT as to John Michael Vreeland (1). (knh) (jcj).[3:08-mj-01777-LSP]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Arrest
                                      Arrest of John Michael Vreeland (1) on 6/5/2008. (jjh)[3:08-mj-01777-LSP]
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 91 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?