TCYK, LLC v. Doe 97
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 5:13-cv-00425-WTH-PRL

Tags
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 9:16 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fee & Jeffries, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard E. Fee +1 813 229 8008 +1 813 229 0046 rfee@feejeffries.com
Space Catherine Fly Yant +1 813 229 8008 cyant@feejeffries.com
v.
No Logo Richard Figueroa, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of John C Kiyonaga

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley W. Plappert +1 239 304 8412 +1 888 399 3129 splappert@earthlink.net
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
        RESPONSE in Opposition re 11 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by TCYK, LLC. (Fee, Richard) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: 4/8/2014 Copyright Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: 4/7/2014 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: 4/2/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: 4/2/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Summons Issued
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 Amended Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting 5 Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve third party subpoena before Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 10/4/2013. (AR)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Related case order and track 2 notice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of pendency of related cases
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 5 Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve third party subpoena before Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 10/4/2013. (AR)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?