Vision Films, Inc. v. Does 1-11
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00858

Tags
Last Updated September 15, 2016 at 5:41 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by Plaintiff Vision Films, Inc. of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Bass, Leon)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to File Show Cause Response - extension to 10/17/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 10/10/2013. (kk2)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to File
      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 10/17/2013. by Plaintiff Vision Films, Inc.. (Bass, Leon)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
        ORDER denying [3] Motion for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Plaintiff shall show cause w/in fourteen (14) days why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 9/23/2013. (kk2)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Motion for Discovery
          Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Application for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Vision Films, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Vision Films, Inc.. (Bass, Leon)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Complaint
              COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Does 1-11 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4242764), filed by Vision Films, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit A1, # (4) Exhibit A2, # (5) Exhibit B) (Bass, Leon)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 99 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?