Vision Films, Inc. v. Does 1-38
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00855

Tags
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 9:32 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vision Films, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 1000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon David Bass +1 614 431 2277 +1 614 221 0554 ldb@lawbass.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David John Butler +1 614 221 2838 +1 614 221 2007 dbutler@taftlaw.com
v.
No Logo John Does 1-38, Defendant
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: 12/31/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service - extended to 4/30/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/30/2013. (pes1)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
    MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/29/2014. For Additional Time to Serve Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff Vision Films, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit J, # (12) Exhibit K, # (13) Exhibit L, # (14) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [3] Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 8/30/2013. (er1)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Motion for Discovery
      Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Application for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Vision Films, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Vision Films, Inc.. (Bass, Leon)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Complaint
          COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Does 1-38 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4242476), filed by Vision Films, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit A1, # (4) Exhibit A2, # (5) Exhibit B) (Bass, Leon)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 96 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?