TCYK, LLC v. DOE 62
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-02210
District Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, presiding

Tags
Last Updated August 22, 2016 at 5:55 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fee & Jeffries, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Fee +1 813 229 8008 +1 813 229 0046 rfee@feejeffries.com
v.
No Logo DOE 62, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013 Notice of Appearance/
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 6 Motion to serve non-party subpoena. Please see Order for directives concerning service.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/25/2013. (CAW) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
        MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Leave to Serve Non-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit C)(Fee, Richard) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by TCYK, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Fee, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/10/2013. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/27/2013. (LYB) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
            Copyright Report sent to Washington. (LD) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by TCYK, LLC. (LD) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                COMPLAINT against DOE 62 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA19055) filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LD) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 198 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?