TCYK LLC v. Does 1-35
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-01022
District Judge Lynn Adelman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 29, 2016 at 8:24 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull Run Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith A Vogt +1 773 340 9469 KeithVogt.JD@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Does 1-35, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by JOHN DOE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Doe
No Logo John Does, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/14/14 denying [8] Motion to Quash. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant John Doe #13 by TCYK LLC. (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 2/13/2014 (vkb)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Waiver of Service Executed
      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Doe 7 waiver sent on 1/24/2014, answer due 3/25/2014. (Vogt, Keith)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Motion for Extension of Time
        First MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by TCYK LLC. (Vogt, Keith)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK LLC as to Doe #4 (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 1/24/2014 (vkb)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: 12/13/2013 Response to Motion
            RESPONSE to Motion filed by TCYK LLC re [8] MOTION to Quash Filed By Doe 18. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Vogt, Keith)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/12/2013 Motion to Quash
            MOTION to Quash filed by Doe #18 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(jcl)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
            ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/16/13 granting [5] Motion Discovery. The plaintiff may serve a subpoena on the defendants internet service providers for the purpose of identifying the true name and address of the defendants. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
              BRIEF in Support filed by TCYK LLC re 5 MOTION Discovery . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Vogt, Keith)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION Discovery by TCYK LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vogt, Keith)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                  DISCLOSURE Statement by TCYK LLC. (Vogt, Keith)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by TCYK LLC. (Vogt, Keith)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (Vogt, Keith)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                        COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Does 1-35 by TCYK LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-1752980) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Cover Sheet)(Vogt, Keith) Modified on 9/25/2013 (jcl). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2013: # 4 Signature Page) (jcl).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 140 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?