Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. TP-LINK Technologies, Co.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00384
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 4:08 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
No Logo Bose Corporation, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Buffalo Technology (usa), Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Emerson Electric Company, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Emerson Electric Co."
No Logo TP-Link USA Corporation, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo TP-LINK Technologies, Co. , Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward S. Quon (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED heather.auyang@ltlw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry C Wang +1 213 612 3737 +1 213 612 3773 henry.wang@ltlw.com
No Logo TP-Link USA Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Adtran, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Peter Bolus +1 205 521 8000 +1 205 521 8800 pbolus@babc.com
No Logo Bose Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Nathan T. Harris +1 617 395 7000 +1 617 395 7070 nharris@proskauer.com
No Logo Buffalo Technology (usa), Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ryan.hales@bakermckenzie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Myall S. Hawkins +1 713 427 5020 +1 713 427 5099 myall.hawkins@bakermckenzie.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Hayes Meyerhoff +1 214 978 3035 +1 214 978 3099 Lisa.Meyerhoff@Bakernet.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tan Hoang Pham +1 713 427 5019 +1 713 427 5099 tan.pham@bakermckenzie.com
No Logo Crestron Electronics, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William C Bergmann +1 202 861 1549 +1 202 861 1783 wbergmann@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry Lee Gillam, Jr. +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 gil@gillamsmithlaw.com
No Logo Denon Electronics (USA), LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Jackson +1 214 953 6109 +1 214 661 6645 jjackson@jw.com
No Logo Dish Network LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J Race +1 903 561 1600 drace@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alyssa Margaret Caridis +1 213 612 2020 +1 213 612 2499 acaridis@orrick.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED I. Neel Chatterjee +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 nchatterjee@orrick.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monte M.F. Cooper mcooper@orrick.com
No Logo Emerson Electric Company, Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "Emerson Electric Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Moore Landrey LLP (Austin)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan L Shaw +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 elshaw@shawcowart.com
Honeywell International, Inc. Honeywell International, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Thad Heartfield +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 thad@jth-law.com
No Logo Zebra Technologies Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashley N Pate +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 ashleypate@potterminton.com
No Logo Zyxel Communications, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF S. J. CHRISTINE YANG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria Der-Lung Hao , +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 vhao@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 595 3111 debby@yw-lawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (225) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER that Plaintiff shall inform the Court of its intention to prosecute the case against Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc by 10-23-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/09/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. ADTRAN, Inc's Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination and Inter Partes Review 190 is GRANTED pending the completion of the initial IPR proceeding as to claim 6 of the '597 patent filed by Nissan. This action is STAYED and administratively CLOSED until the PTO has issued its final decisions on the inter partes review of claim 6 of the '597 Patent. Parties shall file a status report within ten days of issuance of the IPR decision of claim 6 of the '597 Patent. The parties may either file an agreed upon status report or individual motions which inform the court of the ruling of the IPR and how the parties would like to proceed with the case. ADTRAN, in accordance with its agreement during the 10-14-2014 hearing, is estopped from asserting invalidity contentions raised and adjudicated in the Nissan IPR proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/08/14. (mll, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Brief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Report of Mediation
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediator
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Brief
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Chart/Prehearing Statement
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Opposed MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination and Inter Partes Review of the Patents-In-Suit by ADTRAN, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Paul Sykes, # 2 Exhibit A-1 Reexam Historical Data, # 3 Exhibit A-2 '689 Reexam Grant, # 4 Exhibit A-3 '689 Reexam Final Rejection, # 5 Exhibit A-4 '689 Petition for IPR, # 6 Exhibit A-5 P's Disclosure of Asserted Claims, # 7 Exhibit A-6 '597 Reexam Cert, # 8 Exhibit A-7 '597 Reexam 2 Dismissal, # 9 Exhibit A-8 '597 Petition for IPR, # 10 Exhibit A-9 Norman Letter to ADTRAN re Accused Products, # 11 Exhibit A-10 '555 Reexam Cert, # 12 Exhibit A-11 '555 Reexam Final Rejection, # 13 Exhibit A-12 '555 Appeal Brief, # 14 Exhibit A-13 '555 Reexam 3 Grant, # 15 Exhibit A-14 '555 IPR 1 Judgment, # 16 Exhibit A-15 '555 Petition for IPR, # 17 Text of Proposed Order to Stay All Proceedings)(Holt, Angela) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Compliance Regarding No Current Disputes as to Claims of Privileged Documents (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by ADTRAN, Inc., Denon Electronics (USA), LLC, TP-Link USA Corporation of Compliance Regarding Service of P.R. 4-2 disclosures (Jackson, John) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 185 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Chester Jianbon Shiu terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination and Inter Partes Review of the Patents-In-Suit by ADTRAN, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Paul Sykes, # 2 Exhibit A-1 Reexam Historical Data, # 3 Exhibit A-2 '689 Reexam Grant, # 4 Exhibit A-3 '689 Reexam Final Rejection, # 5 Exhibit A-4 '689 Petition for IPR, # 6 Exhibit A-5 Exhibits for Joint Motion to Stay\P's Disclosure of Asserted Claims, # 7 Exhibit A-6 '597 Reexam Cert, # 8 Exhibit A-7 '597 Reexam 2 Dismissal, # 9 Exhibit A-8 '597 Petition for IPR, # 10 Exhibit A-9 Exhibits for Joint Motion to Stay\Norman Letter to ADTRAN re Accused Products, # 11 Exhibit A-10 '555 Reexam Cert, # 12 Exhibit A-11 '555 Reexam Final Rejection, # 13 Exhibit A-12 '555 Appeal Brief, # 14 Exhibit A-13 '555 Reexam 3 Grant, # 15 Exhibit A-14 '555 IPR 1 Judgment, # 16 Exhibit A-15 '555 Petition for IPR, # 17 Text of Proposed Order for Motion to Stay All Proceedings)(Holt, Angela) Modified on 7/10/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Chester Shiu by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE by ADTRAN, Inc., Denon Electronics (USA), LLC, TP-Link USA Corporation of Compliance Regarding Claim Construction Conference (Jackson, John) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 182 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiff and Defendant Denon Electronics (USA), LLC to complete their first mediation is extended to 7-23-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/18/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 128 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, Deadline between Plaintiff and Defendant Denon Elec. (USA) to complete first mediation by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: unsuccessful (ADTRAN, Inc.)(Folsom, David) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 177 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Crestron Electronics Inc are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/04/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 176 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC against Defendant DISH Network L.L.C. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/30/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE by ZyXEL Communications, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Defendant Crestron Electronics, Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Defendant DISH Network L.L.C by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Norman's ANSWER to 166 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Denon Electronics (USA), LLC by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Norman's ANSWER to 158 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Crestron by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Compliance Regarding Service of PR 4-1 Identification of Claim Terms for Construction (Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by ADTRAN, Inc., Crestron Electronics, Inc., Denon Electronics (USA), LLC, TP-Link USA Corporation of Compliance Regarding Service of P.R. 4-1 Identification of Claim Terms for Construction (Jackson, John) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 169 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant ZyXEL Communications, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 165 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Norman and Defendant Dish Network LLC are stayed until 5-21-2014. Closing documents shall be submitted by 5-21-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/12/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Defendant ZyXEL Communications, Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Norman's ANSWER to 156 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant ADTRAN, Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by ADTRAN, Inc., Crestron Electronics, Inc., Denon Electronics (USA), LLC, TP-Link USA Corporation of Compliance Regarding Service of P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and P.R. 3-4 productions (Jackson, John) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Original Complaint Against Denon Electronics (USA),LLC , COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Denon Electronics (USA), LLC. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Stay by Dish Network L.L.C., Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 163 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant Buffalo Americas, Inc. (f/k/a Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc.) and all counterclaims by Buffalo against Norman are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Defendant Buffalo Americas, Inc. (formerly known as Buffalo Technology (USA) Inc.) by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by TP-Link USA Corporation of Compliance with Paragraph 2 Disclosures (Auyang, Heather) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ADTRAN, Inc. (Sykes, Paul) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Denon Electronics (USA), LLC (Jackson, John) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Crestron Electronics, Inc. of Compliance with Paragraph 2 Disclosures (Bergmann, William) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Crestron's ANSWER to 137 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Crestron Electronics, Inc..(Bergmann, William) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Angela Holt on behalf of ADTRAN, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4615914. (Holt, Angela) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by ADTRAN, Inc..(Sykes, Paul) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by ADTRAN, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Service of Initial Disclosures (Sykes, Paul) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 151 Motion to Continue. Plaintiff and Defendant Buffalo Americas, Inc., are excused from filing a proposed Docket Control Order, Discovery Order and Protective Order by 4-07-2014. The deadline to file closing documents is continued until no later than 4-23-2014 as to Plaintiff and Buffalo Americas, Inc. If closing documents are not filed by 4-23-2014, the Court ORDERS that the parties file a Notice of Compliance with this Order by 4-23-2014, including as attached exhibits all the documents necessary to comply with the Scheduling Order. No further extensions will be granted. The Scheduling/Status Conference as to issues between Norman and Buffalo only is set for 4-24-2014 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/08/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 149 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiff and Defendant Dish Network LLC are stayed until 5-01-2014. Closing documents shall be submitted by 5-01-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/08/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 140 Motion for Extension of Time. ADTRAN's Initial Disclosures to Plaintiff, are due 4-11-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/07/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Continue Date For Filing Closing Documents by Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 145 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Crestron Electronics shall have to 4-21-2014 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to pltf's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/01/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Stay by Dish Network L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER adopting 135 Report & Recommendations of the US Magistrate Judge; denying 58 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/31/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER adopting 134 Report and Recommendations of the US Magistrate Judge; granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/31/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ZyXEL Communications, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Crestron Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Compliance Regarding Service of Initial Disclosures (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by TP-Link USA Corporation of Service of Initial Disclosures (Auyang, Heather) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Crestron Electronics, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Service of Initial Disclosures (Bergmann, William) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Denon Electronics (USA), LLC (Jackson, John) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by ADTRAN, Inc.. (Sykes, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2014: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER adopting 121 Report & Recommendations, and denying 17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to 134 Report and Recommendations by Crestron Electronics, Inc.. (Bergmann, William) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against Crestron Electronics, Inc., filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 58 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ADTRAN, Inc., recommending the motion be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/5/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 54 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Crestron Electronics, Inc. The Court recommends that Crestron's Motion be granted-in-part and denied-in-part. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/5/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Scheduling Conference held on 3/5/2014. (Court Reporter Mechele Morris.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, ) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER FOCUSING PATENT CLAIMS AND PRIOR ART TO REDUCE COSTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying as moot 22 Motion to Dismiss. Because all allegations against TP-LINK Technologies Co have been dropped by Norman, TP-LINK Tech is ORDERED dismissed from the above captioned case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. James Knowles added as Mediator as to Defendants Dish Network LLC, TP Link USA Corporation, and ZyXel Communications Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. David Folsom added as Mediator as to Defendants Adtran Inc, Crestron Electronics Inc, and Denon Electronics (USA) LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. First Mediation to be completed by 6-23-2014; Second Mediation Completion due by 1/19/2016. Jury Selection set for 4/4/2016 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 10/16/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/25/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/25/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/25/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/25/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of TP-Link USA Corporation (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of TP-Link USA Corporation (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 filed by Dish Network L.L.C. The Court recommends the motion be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/25/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part 114 Motion to Continue Scheduling / Status Conference As It Relates to Buffalo Americas, Inc. The Scheduling/Status Conference as to issues between Norman and Buffalo only is continued until 4/10/2014. Parties are ordered to submit closing documents by 4/4/2014, or file a Notice of Compliance with this Order by 4/7/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/25/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC Joint Statement on Proposed Mediators (Price, Adam) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Protective Order , Docket Control Order, ESI Order, and Discovery Order by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 113 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/19/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling/Status Conference as it relates to Buffalo by Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File PR 3-1 and 3-2 by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 111 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Honeywell International Inc are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/10/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ADTRAN, Inc. (Sykes, Paul) (Entered: 02/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Crestron Electronics, Inc. (Bergmann, William) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Crestron Electronics, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Bergmann, William) Modified on 1/31/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Financially Interested Parties (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by ZyXEL Communications, Inc. Certificate of Financially Interested Persons (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Buffalo, Inc. for Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc.. (Meyerhoff, Lisa) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Denon Electronics (USA), LLC Certificate of Financially Interested Persons (Jackson, John) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 101 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Emerson Electric Co. are hereby, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew C Acosta on behalf of Denon Electronics (USA), LLC (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Defendant Emerson Electric Co. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Scheduling/Status Conference for 2/26/2014 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/15/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 96 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paul Peter Bolus terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/12/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Matthew Sykes on behalf of ADTRAN, Inc. (Sykes, Paul) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phillip S Sykes on behalf of ADTRAN, Inc. (Sykes, Phillip) Modified on 12/9/2013 (mjc, ). (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by ADTRAN, Inc.. (Bolus, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Honeywell International Inc.(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's ANSWER to 89 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 54 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Honeywell International Inc.( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TP-Link USA Corporation identifying Corporate Parent TP-Link Technologies Co., Ltd. for TP-Link USA Corporation. (Wang, Henry) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Errata (Corrected Certificate of Service) by TP-Link USA Corporation re 87 Notice of Attorney Appearance, 88 Notice of Attorney Appearance, 89 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Notice of Errata re: Docket 87 88 & 89 (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appearance of Counsel - Henry C. Wang, # 2 Notice of Appearance of Counsel - Heather F. Auyang, # 3 TP-LINK USA Corporation's Answer to First Amended Complaint, # 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Wang, Henry) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 50 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by TP-Link USA Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Wang, Henry) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather Fai Auyang on behalf of TP-Link USA Corporation (Auyang, Heather) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry C Wang on behalf of TP-Link USA Corporation (Wang, Henry) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants' Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/11/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 54 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Crestron Electronics, Inc.. (Bergmann, William) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Bose Corporation - Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Harris, Nathan) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 58 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Adtran Inc. filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 81 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 54 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Replies due by 9/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/28/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 54 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Crestron Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bergmann, William) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 75 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Bose Corporation are hereby, DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/26/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 58 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ADTRAN, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Tex Sec of State Business Entity Records)(Bolus, Paul) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to TP-Link USA Corporation on 8/5/2013, by personal service; answer due: 8/26/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 74 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant Archos Inc are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/21/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT BOSE CORPORATION by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Archos, Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 70 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 54 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Responses due by 8/22/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 58 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 54 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Honeywell International Inc on 7/31/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Norman's ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Buffalo by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Honeywell International Inc.( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 filed by Dish Network L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J)(Cooper, Monte) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE in Support re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 filed by Dish Network L.L.C.. (Cooper, Monte) Modified on 8/5/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ZyXEL Communications, Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ZyXEL Communications, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ZyXEL Communications Corporation for ZyXEL Communications, Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint by ZyXEL Communications, Inc..(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of ZyXEL Communications, Inc. (Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 59 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant Zebra Technology Corporation are hereby, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT ZEBRA TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by ADTRAN, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schneider Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bolus, Paul) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that Bose has until August 12, 2013, to answer or otherwise plead in response to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/29/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bose Corporation (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Bose Corporation.(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Crestron Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Bergmann, William) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS REISSUED as to TP-Link USA Corporation and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against TP-Link USA Corporation, filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to the Complaint by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Nathan) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan T Harris on behalf of Bose Corporation (Harris, Nathan) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven M Bauer on behalf of Bose Corporation (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 22 MOTION to Dismiss; Responses due by 7/26/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/22/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to ZyXEL Communications, Inc. on 5/30/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Emerson Electric Co. on 5/24/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Zebra Technologies Corporation on 5/24/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Denon Electronics (USA), LLC on 5/24/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Archos Inc. on 5/29/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to ADTRAN, Inc. on 5/24/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Bose Corporation on 5/24/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ZyXEL Communications, Inc. (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William C Bergmann on behalf of Crestron Electronics, Inc. (Bergmann, William) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monte M F Cooper on behalf of Dish Network L.L.C. (Cooper, Monte) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Indra Neel Chatterjee on behalf of Dish Network L.L.C. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alyssa Margaret Caridis on behalf of Dish Network L.L.C. (Caridis, Alyssa) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 ; Responses due by 7/25/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint filed in Consolidated C.A. No. 6:13cv387, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc..(Meyerhoff, Lisa) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Emerson Electric Co. (Shaw, Ethan) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emerson Electric Co.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Emerson Electric Co..(Shaw, Ethan) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Myall S Hawkins on behalf of Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc. (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Ryan Hales on behalf of Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc. (Hales, William) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tan Hoang Pham on behalf of Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc. (Pham, Tan) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Crestron Electronics, Inc.(Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ADTRAN, Inc..( Bolus, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by TP-LINK Technologies, Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Qianliang Tu, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Richard Xu, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Wang, Henry) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather Fai Auyang on behalf of TP-LINK Technologies, Co. (Auyang, Heather) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry C Wang on behalf of TP-LINK Technologies, Co. (Wang, Henry) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Victoria Hao on behalf of ZyXEL Communications, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4199778. (Hao, Victoria) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dish Network L.L.C. (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(7) For Failure To Join A Party Under Rule 19 by Dish Network L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Khemka Decl, # 2 Cooper Decl, # 3 Exhibit A, AARM Tx Plano Office, # 4 Exhibit B ITech Press Release, # 5 Exhibit C ITec Austin, # 6 Exhibit D Norman PICs, # 7 Exhibit E D1 v Cortex M3, # 8 Exhibit F D2 v MIPS4K, # 9 Exhibit G D3 v Cortex M3, # 10 Exhibit H D4 v Atheros Wifi, # 11 Exhibit I D5 v Broadcom, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christine Yang on behalf of ZyXEL Communications, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4190911. (Yang, Christine) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ZyXEL Communications, Inc. (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc. on 5/23/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Dish Network L.L.C. on 5/22/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Crestron Electronics, Inc. on 5/22/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Norman IP Holdings, LLC.( DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv384 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/13/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to TP-LINK Technologies, Co. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chester Jianbon Shiu on behalf of Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Gerald DiNovo on behalf of Norman IP Holdings, LLC (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against TP-LINK Technologies, CO ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4134331.), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Price, Adam) Modified on 5/13/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 205 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?