McRO Inc v. BANDAI NAMCO Games America Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-10322
District Judge George H Wu, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 13, 2020 at 6:03 PM DT (11.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric P Berger +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Eric.Berger@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Joseph McGuire +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 james.mcguire@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F Petrsoric +1 212 257 6494 +1 212 612 3297 john.petrsoric@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irene Y Lee +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 ilee@raklaw.com
No Logo Activision Publishing, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Capcom U.s.a., Inc., Counter-Claimant
Disney Interactive Studios, Inc. Disney Interactive Studios, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Electronic Arts, Inc. Electronic Arts, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Infinity Ward Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Insomniac Games Inc, Counter-Claimant
No Logo LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Namco Bandai Games America Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Naughty Dog, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Obsidian Entertainment, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Sega Of America, Inc. Sega Of America, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Sucker Punch Productions, L.l.c., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Treyarch Corporation, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Activision Blizzard, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Capcom U.s.a., Inc., Defendant
Disney Interactive Studios, Inc. Disney Interactive Studios, Inc., Defendant
Electronic Arts, Inc. Electronic Arts, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Index Digital Media, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Insomniac Games Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Colt Singer Bea LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin L Singer +1 213 223 2171 +1 213 223 2304 bsinger@coltsinger.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen Rubin Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Rubin +1 310 393 0900 +1 310 496 0810 sr@stephenrubin.com
No Logo Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Jonathan Fox +1 213 892 5200 +1 213 892 5454 bfox@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Jonathan Fox +1 213 892 5200 +1 213 892 5454 bfox@mofo.com
Space Ashleigh K Landis +1 213 802 5200 +1 213 892 5454 alandis@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason J. Lee +1 213 892 5363 jlee@mofo.com
Space Jason J. Lee +1 213 892 5363 jlee@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy J Ray +1 213 892 5446 +1 213 892 5454 wray@mofo.com
No Logo Namco Bandai Games America Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan N. Budaj +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 evan.budaj@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Morteza Lee +1 650 802 3211 +1 650 802 3100 justin.m.lee@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonal N. Mehta sonal.mehta@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
No Logo Naughty Dog, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tony Maurice Diab +1 949 475 1500 +1 949 475 0016 tdiab@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert F Harris, III +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 afharris@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn C. Herndon lherndon@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth A Larigan +1 816 559 2459 blarigan@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B. Trent Webb +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 BWEBB@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan N. Zerger +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 IPlitigation@shb.com
No Logo Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Ellis Mayer +1 310 312 2000 +1 310 312 3100 mem@msk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin G. Pagnanelli +1 310 312 2000 +1 310 312 3786 kgp@msk.com
No Logo Obsidian Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Madison S Spach, Jr. +1 949 852 0710 +1 949 852 0714 mspach@scwlaw.us
No Logo SCE Santa Monica Studio Inc., Defendant
Sega Of America, Inc. Sega Of America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Morteza Lee +1 650 802 3211 +1 650 802 3100 justin.m.lee@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonal N. Mehta sonal.mehta@weil.com
No Logo Shiny Entertainment, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sonic Team, Defendant
No Logo Square Enix, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Jonathan Fox +1 213 892 5200 +1 213 892 5454 bfox@mofo.com
Space Ashleigh K Landis +1 213 802 5200 +1 213 892 5454 alandis@mofo.com
Space Jason J. Lee +1 213 892 5363 jlee@mofo.com
No Logo T-hq, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Treyarch Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Visceral Games, Defendant
No Logo Mcro, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (625) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Objection
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Objection
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Objection
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Status Conference - optional html form
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Withdraw
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Status Conference - optional html form
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Report
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Reply
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Discovery Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Contempt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Contempt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Review
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Review
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Review
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None For Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Amendment (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Amendment (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 6/17/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 6/17/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 616.21 in favor of Bandau Namco Games America, Inc and against McRo,Inc., dba Planet Blue. RE: 374 (mb) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, Accordingly, it is ADJUDGED that Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue ("Plaintiff') takes nothing from Defendants andCounterclaim-Plaintiffs (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) All remaining pending motions are DENIED as moot. As Defendants are the prevailing parties in this action, Defendants' costs ofcourt shall be taxed against Plaintiff. (pj) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTIFICATION by Federal Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-1080, regarding Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals 368 as to plaintiff McRO Inc. (car) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment/Renewal of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Appeal of Judgment, 365 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14662368 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/18/14 9?31 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/30/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2015. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BASED ON UNPATENTABILITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. SECTION 101by Judge George H. Wu. For the foregoing reasons, the Court would GRANT the Motion, and hold 576 Patent claims 1, 7-9, and 13, and 278 Patent claims 1-4, 6, 9, 13, and 15-17 invalid under 35 U.S.C. Section 101. 363 , 338 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pj) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION to Continue Post-Mediation Status Conference from September 25, 2014 to December 18, 2014 Re: Scheduling Conference,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 118 filed by Defendants Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Infinity Ward Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc, LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Naughty Dog Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Obsidian Entertainment Inc, Sega of America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc, Sucker Punch Productions LLC, Treyarch Corporation, Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGSBASED ON UNPATENTABILITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. Section 101 338 held before Judge George H. Wu: The Court's Tentative Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, Defendants' motion is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue its ruling. Court Reporter: Katie Thibideaux. (pj) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Index Digital Media, Inc., Infinity Ward Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Sega of America Inc, Treyarch Corporation, Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc Court Reporter. Court will contact Evan N. Budaj at evan.budaj@weil.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 9/18/2014 Rule 101 Motion Hearing. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Naughty Dog Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sucker Punch Productions LLC Court Reporter. Court will contact Liz Gonsalves at Egonsalves@shb.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 09/18/2014 / Katie Thibodeaux. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Kitano, Jamie) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff McRO Inc Court Reporter. Court will contact Dominick Vitaliano at dominick.vitaliano@mishcon.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: September 18, 2014 Rule 101 motion hearing. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of telephonic appearance Eric Berger for the September 18, 2014 hearing regarding Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Counterclaim, of Activision Publishing Inc. and Blizzard Entertainment Inc. [DI 347] filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Reply (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; Pursuant to the request of defense counsel, Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Unpatentability Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 338 previously scheduled for 09/04/2014 is CONTINUED to 9/18/2014 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            **AMENDED** TEXT ONLY ENTRY 352 (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES Defendants' MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Unpatentability Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 338 , previously scheduled for 8/14/2014 to 9/4/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES Defendants' MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Unpatentability Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 338 , previously scheduled for 8/14/2014 to 8/21/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., identifying Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Entertainment Holdings, Inc., ASAC II LP. (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 336 and Counterclaims filed by Defendants Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of John F. Petrsoric in opposition MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Unpatentability Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 338 filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Michael Gleicher, Ph.D. in opposition MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Unpatentability Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 338 filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - CV)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Unpatentability Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 338 filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/30/14 9:28 am re Transcript 342 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/30/14 9:28 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2014. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS AND COUNTERCLAIMS BETWEEN MCRO, INC., DBA PLANET BLUE AND INSOMNIAC GAMES, INC. PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) 340 by Judge George H. Wu. The Court hereby confirms that: Pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, all claims, counterclaims and defenses in this action between Plaintiff, McRO, Inc., dba Planet Blue ("Planet Blue") and Defendant and Counterclaimant Insomniac Games, Inc. ("Insomniac") are hereby dismissed with prejudice; and The parties shall bear their own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant and Counterclaimant Insomniac Games Inc filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Unpatentability Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 338 filed by Defendants Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Index Digital Media, Inc., Infinity Ward Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc, LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Naughty Dog Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Obsidian Entertainment Inc, Sega of America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc, Sucker Punch Productions LLC, Treyarch Corporation, Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Unpatentability Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 filed by Defendants Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Index Digital Media, Inc., Infinity Ward Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment Inc, LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Naughty Dog Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Obsidian Entertainment Inc, Sega of America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc, Sucker Punch Productions LLC, Treyarch Corporation, Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Sonal Naresh Mehta added to party Activision Publishing, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sonal Naresh Mehta added to party Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Status Conference, 331 , as to defendants Naughty Dog Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sucker Punch Productions LLC Court Reporter. Court will contact Kim Brunton at kbrunton@shb.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 6-30-14 - Status Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. amending Amended Complaint, 305 , filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A '576 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B '278 Patent, # 3 Exhibit C)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff McRO Inc Court Reporter. Court will contact Mark S Raskin at mark.raskin@mishcon.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: June 30, 2014 Status Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim 318 of Infinity Ward filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim 322 of LucasArts filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim 319 of Warner Brothers filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court, as indicated on the record, will allow Plaintiff to propound discovery, but will require no response until its decision on Defendant's § 101 motion. Any objections will be responded within one week after the Court's decision on the § 101 motion. Actual responses will be due three weeks after the Courts decision on the § 101 motion. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Index Digital Media, Inc., Infinity Ward Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Sega of America Inc, Treyarch Corporation, Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc Court Reporter. Court will contact Evan N. Budaj at evan.budaj@weil.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Status Conference June 30, 2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Telephonic Appearance of Mark S. Raskin at the June 30, 2014 Status Conference filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: 316 Plaintiff McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blues Motion for leave to file its Third Amended Complaint against Defendants Activision Publishing, Inc. and BlizzardEntertainment, Inc. is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs Proposed Third Amended Complaint may be filed and any responsive pleadings to this Third AmendedComplaint are due twenty one (21) days thereafter. (pj) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WARNER BROS. INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT INC.'S DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.PROC.7.1 filed by Defendant Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc, Counter Claimant Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc (bp) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant/Counter-claimant Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc, identifying Other Affiliate Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Other Affiliate Warner Communications LLC, Other Affiliate Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. for Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc, Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc. (bp) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LUCASARTS, A DIVISION OF LUCASFILM ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY LTD. LLC'S DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.PROC.7.1 filed by Defendant LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Counter Claimant LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC (bp) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant/Counter-claimant LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, identifying Other Affiliate Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd., LLC, Other Affiliate Lucasfilm Ltc. LLC for LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (bp) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 307 , COUNTERCLAIM against McRO Inc filed by Defendant LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC.(bp) (pj). (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INFINITY WARD, INC.'S DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.PROC.7.1 filed by Counter Claimant Infinity Ward Inc., Defendant Infinity Ward Inc. (bp) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant/Counter-claimant Infinity Ward Inc., (bp) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 308 , COUNTERCLAIM against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc.(bp) (pj). (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 306 , COUNTERCLAIM against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Infinity Ward Inc..(bp) (pj). (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAINST ACTIVISION PUBLISHING, INC. AND BLIZZARD ENTERTAINMENT, INC., granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File 315 , Defendants' Activision Publishing, Inc. answer due 6/19/2014; Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. answer due 6/19/2014 by Judge George H. Wu (bp) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Third Amended Complaint against Activision Publishing and Blizzard filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Third Amended Complaint Activision Publishing/Blizzard, # 2 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc, served on June 9, 2014. (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, served on June 9, 2014. (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Infinity Ward Inc., served on June 9, 2014. (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF DENIAL OF PETITIONS FOR INTER PARTES REVIEW filed by PLAINTIFF McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC COUNTERCLAIM 284 filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Sucker Punch COUNTERCLAIM 283 filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment, a division of Warner Bros. Home Entertainment, Inc. Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc amending Amended Complaint, 275 , filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A '576 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B '278 Patent, # 3 Exhibit C)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against LucasArts, a division of Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd., LLC LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC amending Amended Complaint, 274 , filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A '576 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B '278 Patent, # 3 Exhibit C)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Infinity Ward, Inc. Infinity Ward Inc. amending Amended Complaint, 273 , filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A '576 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B '278 Patent, # 3 Exhibit C)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Activision Publishing, Inc. and Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. amending Amended Complaint, 271 , filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A '576 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B '278 Patent, # 3 Exhibit C)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendants Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sucker Punch Productions LLC Court Reporter. Court will contact Kim Brunton at kbrunton@shb.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: April 28, 2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge George H. Wu re: Markman Hearing, 292 .The Courts Tentative Rulings on Markman Hearing is circulated. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, the Markman Hearing is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue its final ruling. A Status Conference is set for June 30, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will file proposed dates by June 26, 2014. (pj) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by counterclaimant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, upon Counter-Defendant McRO Inc served on 5/6/2014, answer due 5/27/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Russ, August and Kabat, Attorneys for McRo, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by counterclaimant Sucker Punch Productions LLC, upon counter-defendant McRO Inc served on 5/6/2014, answer due 5/27/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Russ, August and Kabat, Attorneys for McRo, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            21 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim 284 as to Counter defendant McRO Inc by Counter-Claimant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (pj) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              21 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim 283 as to Counter defendant McRO Inc by Counter-Claimant Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (pj) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: Attached hereto is the Court's Final Ruling on Claim Construction 292 . (Attachments: # 1 Final Ruling Claim Construction) (jag) (Main Document 298 replaced on 5/1/2014) (jag). (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE filed by Defendants Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Index Digital Media, Inc., Infinity Ward Inc., Insomniac Games Inc, Konami Digital Entertainment Inc, LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Naughty Dog Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Obsidian Entertainment Inc, Sega of America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc, Sucker Punch Productions LLC, Treyarch Corporation, Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc. of Filing Presentation Slides Used at Markman Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Counterclaim 284 filed by counterclaimant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Counterclaim 283 filed by counterclaimant Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Index Digital Media, Inc., Infinity Ward Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Sega of America Inc, Treyarch Corporation, Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc Court Reporter. Court will contact Evan N. Budaj at evan.budaj@weil.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: April 28, 2014 Markman Hearing. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff McRO Inc Court Reporter. Court will contact Dominick Vitaliano at dominick.vitaliano@mishcon.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Markman Hearing. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Markman Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: The Court's Tentative Rulings on Markman Hearing is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oralargument. For reasons stated on the record, the Markman Hearing is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue its final ruling. A Status Conference is set for June 30, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will file proposed dates by June 26, 2014.Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Order 281 . The Court, having considered the Stipulation to Amend Caption of Case filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue and Defendant BANDAI NAMCO Games America Inc. on April 23, 2014, hereby ORDERS as follow: The caption of this case shall be amended as follows: McRo, Inc., d.b.a. PlanetBlue v. BANDAI NAMCO Games America Inc. (pj) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 285 , Summons Request 286 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Missing the Counter-Claims Caption. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (pj) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 282 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Rogert Whitman on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Irene Y. Lee as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint 258 filed by Defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.(Diab, Tony) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 259 filed by Defendant Sucker Punch Productions LLC.(Diab, Tony) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Counterclaim 284 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Counterclaim 283 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiff and Counter Defendant McRO Inc; Jury Demand, filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.(Diab, Tony) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiff and Counter Defendant McRO Inc; Jury Demand, filed by defendant and counterclaimant Sucker Punch Productions LLC.(Diab, Tony) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney Robert Whitman to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13711056 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Order to Amend Caption of Case filed by Defendant Namco Bandai Games America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 280 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - Plaintiff MCRO, Inc., dba Planet Blue's File Histories on DVD and in Paper Format.(cbr) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 279 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT - Plaintiff MCRO, Inc., dba Planet Blue's Claim Construction Technology Tutorial.(cbr) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. of Compliance with Judge Wu's 4/10/14 Order, Docket No. 262 (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING filed re US Patents '576 and '278 File Histories re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 276 (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc of DVD re US Patents '576 and '278 File Histories. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc amending Complaint - (Discovery), 1 , filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (COPY OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED WHICH WAS CONSOLIDATED ON 2/13/2014 DOCUMENT NUMBER 234 RE THE HIGHER CASE 14-417-GW document number 14 which was a transferred from District of Delaware with the case number of 12-1518)(pj) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC amending Complaint - (Discovery), 1 , filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (COPY OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED WHICH WAS CONSOLIDATED ON 2/13/2014 DOCUMENT NUMBER 234 RE THE HIGHER CASE 14-358-GW document number 14 which was a transferred from District of Delaware with the case number of 12-1512) (pj) (Entered: 04/17/2014) (pj) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Infinity Ward Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery), 1 , filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (COPY OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED WHICH WAS CONSOLIDATED ON 2/13/2014 DOCUMENT NUMBER 234 RE THE HIGHER CASE 14-352-GW document number 14 which was a transferred from District of Delaware with the case number of 12-1511) (pj) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party 265 , Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ActivisionBlizzard, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice, and Activision Publishing, Inc. and Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. are substituted in its place. Plaintiffs Proposed Second Amended Complaints may be filed and any responsive pleadings to these SecondAmended Complaints are due twenty one (21) days thereafter. (Activision Publishing, Inc. and Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. added. Activision Blizzard Inc terminated). (pj) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Activision Blizzard Inc amending Complaint - (Discovery), 1 , filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (COPY OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED WHICH WAS CONSOLIDATED ON 2/13/2014 DOCUMENT NUMBER 234 IN THE HIGHER CASE 14-336-GW document number 14 which was a transferred from District of Delaware with the case number of 12-1508) (pj) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed re TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL re Brief (non-motion non-appeal),, 246 (Fox, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, 264 (Fox, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Planet Blue's Claim Construction Technology Tutorial DVD re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 267 (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc of DVD re Claim Construction Technology Tutorial. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Compliance filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. with 6/17/13 Scheduling Order re Claim Construction Tutorial Submission (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Activision Blizzard Inc filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO SUBMIT TECHNOLOGY TUTORIALS TO THE COURT by Judge George H. Wu: ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TOSUBMIT TECHNOLOGY TUTORIALS TO THE COURT The Court, having considered the Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Submit Technology Tutorials to the Court, hereby ORDERS as follows: The parties may have until April 16, 2014 to submit their Technology Tutorials to the Court. 261 (pj) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINTS by Judge George H. Wu: Plaintiff McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blues Motion for leave to file its Second Amended Complaints against Defendants Infinity Ward, Inc., LucasArts, a divisionof Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd. LLC and Warner Bros. InteractiveEntertainment, a division of Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc. is herebyGRANTED. Plaintiffs Proposed Second Amended Complaints may be filed andany responsive pleadings to these Second Amended Complaints are due twenty one(21) days thereafter. 260 (pj) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: No later than April 18, 2014, Plaintiff shall lodge a copy of the certified file history for each asserted patent. Each file history shall be printed double-sided, indexed, tabbed, and compiled in a 3-ring binder. Each office action, response, filing, or other communication shall be given a separate tab, with the date of each clearlydesignated. Portions of the file history relied upon by the patentee for claim construction shall be highlighted in yellow. Portions of the file history relied upon by the accused infringers shall be highlighted in blue. Portions of the file history relied upon by both sides shall be highlighted in green. Plaintiff shall also lodge an electronic copy of each file history on a CD-ROM, DVD, or USB thumb drive. Each file history shall be a single PDF file with bookmarks corresponding to the tabs on the paper copy, and containing the highlighting present on the paper copy. (pj) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Submission of Technology Tutorials filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaints against Infinity Ward, LucasArts and Warner Bros. filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Infinity Ward Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 - LucasArts Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Warner Bros. Second Amended Complaint, # 4 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Sucker Punch Production, LLC Sucker Punch Productions LLC amending Amended Complaint, 257 , filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Amended Complaint, 256 , against defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Sucker Punch Productions LLC amending Amended Complaint 44 , filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc LED IN CASE NUMBER 14-332-GW attached document number 13 filed in Delaware in Case No. 12-1514 on 2/28/13 PURSUANT TO CONSOLIDATION OF CASE FILED ON 2/13/2014) (pj) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants SCE Santa Monica Studio Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC amending Amended Complaint 44 , filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (FILED IN CASE NUMBER 14-383-GW attached document number 13 filed in Delaware in Case No. 12-1514 on 2/28/13 PURSUANT TO CONSOLIDATION OF CASE FILED ON 2/13/2014)) (pj) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINTS by Judge George H. Wu: Plaintiff McRO, Inc., dba Planet Blues Motion for leave to file its SecondAmended Complaints against Defendants Sucker Punch and Sony is herebyGRANTED. Plaintiffs Proposed Second Amended Complaints will be manuallyfiled and any responsive pleadings to these Second Amended Complaints are duetwenty one (21) days thereafter. 253 (pj) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding Brief (non-motion non-appeal) 230 . (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaints against Sony Computer Entertainment LLC and Sucker Punch Productions LLC filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Sucker Punch Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Sony Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 248 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John D. Garretson on behalf of Defendants Naughty Dog Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC and for Sucker Punch Productions LLC, designating Tony Diab as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/6/14 9:50 am re Transcript 250 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/6/14 9:50 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2014. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney John D. Garretson to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13522293 paid.) 248 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Form is out-of-date. Forms and Local Rules were updated and amended as of June 1, 2013. See Notices from the Clerk, 5/2/13; Applicant did not supply Good Standing Certificates for each of the state bar for each of the states that the attorney is admitted of that particular state bar. See LR 83-2.1.3.3 (NY). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney John D. Garretson to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13522293 paid.) filed by defendants Naughty Dog Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Diab, Tony) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Sonal N. Mehta re Brief (non-motion non-appeal),, 246 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Defendants Activision Blizzard Inc, Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Index Digital Media, Inc., Infinity Ward Inc., Insomniac Games Inc, Konami Digital Entertainment Inc, LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Naughty Dog Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Obsidian Entertainment Inc, Sega of America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc, Sucker Punch Productions LLC, Treyarch Corporation, Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF filed by Defendants Activision Blizzard Inc, Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Index Digital Media, Inc., Infinity Ward Inc., Insomniac Games Inc, Konami Digital Entertainment Inc, LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Naughty Dog Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Obsidian Entertainment Inc, Sega of America Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Square Enix Inc, Sucker Punch Productions LLC, Treyarch Corporation, Warner Bros Interactive Entertainment Inc. DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF regarding Brief (non-motion non-appeal) 230 . (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff McRO Inc Court Reporter. Court will contact Mark Raskin at mark.raskin@mishcon.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Discovery Dispute Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Naughty Dog Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sucker Punch Productions LLC, re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),, 243 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE served on March 11, 2014. (Kitano, Jamie) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jamie H Kitano counsel for Defendants Naughty Dog Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sucker Punch Productions LLC, Counter Claimant Naughty Dog Inc. Filed by Defendants Naughty Dog Inc., Sucker Punch Productions LLC and Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attorney Jamie H Kitano added to party Naughty Dog Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jamie H Kitano added to party Naughty Dog Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Jamie H Kitano added to party Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jamie H Kitano added to party Sucker Punch Productions LLC(pty:dft))(Kitano, Jamie) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: Case called. Counsel state their appearances. Court and counsel confer re Tentative Ruling on CurrentDiscovery Disputes, which was filed on March 5, 2014 237 . The Court adopts the Tentative Ruling as the Courts final Ruling. Court Reporter: Katie Thibideaux. (pj) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tony M Diab counsel for Defendants Naughty Dog Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sucker Punch Productions LLC. Jonathan N. Zerger is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Naughty Dog, inc.; Sucker Punch Productions LLC; Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tony M Diab counsel for Defendants Naughty Dog Inc, Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sucker Punch Productions LLC. Albert F. Harris, III is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Naughty Dog, Inc.; Sucker Punch Productions LLC; Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attorney Tony M Diab added to party Sucker Punch Productions LLC(pty:dft))(Diab, Tony) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST for Leave of Benjamin L. Singer to Appear for March 6, 2014 Hearing By Telephone filed by defendant Insomniac Games Inc. Request set for hearing on 3/6/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Singer, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT THE MARCH 6, 2014 HEARING REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) TENTATIVE RULING CURRENT DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Judge George H. Wu: Status Conference set for 3/6/2014 09:30 AM. **SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS** (jag) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY filed by Defendant Insomniac Games Inc to Report 235 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Unilaterally Submitted Discovery Report (Singer, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCOVERY REPORT filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu:,For reasons stated on the record, the Court consolidates the following with the cases consolidated underCV 12-10322-GW(FFMx):McRO, Inc. v. Atlus U.S.A., et al., SACV 13-1870-GW(FFMx); McRO, Inc. v. Sucker Punch Productions, LLC, CV 14-332-GW(FFMx); McRO Inc. v. Activision Blizzard Inc., CV 14-336-GW(FFMx); McRO Inc. v. Infinity Ward Inc., CV 14-352-GW(FFMx); McRO Inc. v. LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, CV 14-358-GW(FFMx); McRO, Inc. v. Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC, et al., CV 14-383-GW(FFMx); McRO, Inc. v. Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc., CV 14-417-GW(FFMx); The Courts Tentative Position re Scheduling is circulated (see Docket No. 227). The Court adopts its schedule for Track 1 Cases as follows: (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2014 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2014 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Claim Construction Hearing set on 4/28/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 9/25/2014 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendants Konami Digital Entertainment Inc, Square Enix Inc Court Reporter. Court will contact Ashleigh Landis at alandis@mofo.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 02/13/2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Landis, Ashleigh) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120), 231 . The following error(s) was found: THERE WAS NO COURT REPORTER PRESENT; NO TRANSCRIPT IS AVAILABLE.You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Naughty Dog Inc Court Reporter. Court will contact Tony M. Diab at tdiab@shb.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 02-13-2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. PLAINTIFFS OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Sega of America Inc, Treyarch Corporation Court Reporter. Court will contact Evan N. Budaj at evan.budaj@weil.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: February 13, 2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff McRO Inc Court Reporter. Court will contact Mark S. Raskin at mark.raskin@mishcon.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 2/13/2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: (Attachments: # 1 Court's Tentative) (jag) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Douglas Wayne Robinson on behalf of Defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC (Attorney Douglas Wayne Robinson added to party Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC(pty:dft))(Robinson, Douglas) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR MARK S. RASKIN AT THE FEBRUARY 13, 2014 HEARING filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO SUBMIT TO THE COURT THE PARTIES JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTIONSTATEMENT by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, having considered the Joint Unopposed Motion to Extend Timeto Submit the Parties Joint Claim Construction Statement, hereby ORDERS asfollows: The parties may have until February 4, 2014 to submit their Joint ClaimConstruction Statement to the Court. 218 . (pj) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/30/14 8:42 am re Transcript 221 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/30/14 8:42 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2014. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED MINUTES SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu re: 217 For reasons stated on the record, the Court tentatively consolidates the following with the cases consolidated under CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx):.A hearing re further consideration to consolidate these cases is set for February 13, 2014 at 8:30 a.m.Additionally, parties will meet and confer and within 10 days file a joint status report as to consolidation of remaining cases in Categories B and C. A Status Conference is set for February 13, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appear telephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by February 11, 2014. The Motions to Stay in CV 13-1871 and CV 13-1873 will remain on calendar for March 6, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. (pj) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction Statement filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. Wu, Court and counsel confer re newly transferred cases. For reasons stated on the record, the Court tentatively consolidates the following with the cases consolidated under CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx): McRo, Inc. v. Atlus U.S.A., et al., SACV 13-1870-GW(FFMx); McRo Inc. v. Activision Blizzard Inc., CV 14-336-GW(FFMx); McRo Inc. v. Infinity Ward Inc., CV 14-352-GW(FFMx); McRo Inc. v. LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, CV 14-358-GW(FFMx)McRo Inc. v. Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc., CV 14-417-GW(FFMx)A hearing re further consideration to consolidate these cases is set for February 13, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Additionally, parties will meet and confer and within 10 days file a joint status report as to consolidation of remaining cases in Categories B and C. A Status Conference is set for February 13, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appear telephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by February 11, 2014.The Motions to Stay in CV 13-1872 and CV 13-1873 will remain on calendar for March 6, 2014 at 8:30a.m.Court Reporter: Katie Thibideaux. (pj) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Sega of America Inc, Treyarch Corporation Court Reporter. Court will contact Evan N. Budaj at evan.budaj@weil.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Status Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff McRO Inc Court Reporter. Court will contact Mark Raskin at mark.raskin@mishcon.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Status Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Naughty Dog Inc Court Reporter. Court will contact Tony Diab at tdiab@shb.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 1/30-2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT THE JANUARY 30, 2014 HEARING filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark S Raskin counsel for Plaintiff McRO Inc. James J. McGuire is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff McRO, Inc., dba Planet Blue. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re Motion for Extension of Time to File 209 by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, having considered the Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Submit to the Court the Parties Joint Claim Construction Statement, hereby ORDERS as follows: The parties may have until February 3, 2014 to submit their Joint Claim Construction Statement to the Court. (kti) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction Statement filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings December 16, 2013 at 8:48 a.m. re Transcript 207 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Cuneo, Patricia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on December 16, 2013 at 8:48 a.m. Court Reporter: PAT CUNEO, CSR 1600, OFFICIAL REPORTER, website www.patcuneo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/3/2014. (Cuneo, Patricia) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. Wu, Court and counsel confer re newly transferred cases. The Court continues the scheduling conference toJanuary 30, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. The Court will allow discovery to be served, except as to damages. Responses will not be required until 10 days after said hearing.All other matters reassigned to this Court will be set for a status conference on January 30, 2014. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (pj) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Sega of America Inc, Treyarch Corporation Court Reporter. Court will contact Evan N. Budaj at evan.budaj@weil.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 12/16/2013, Further Case Management/Scheduling. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re Request for International Judicial Assistance pursuant to the Hague Convention of March 18, 1970 on the taking of evidence in civil or commercial matters by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: 193 Motion for Discovery : (see attached) (jm) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE re: MOTION for Discovery regarding UNOPPOSED Issuance of a Letter of Request Under the Hague Convention From Third-Party Witness Catherine Pelachaud, a Resident of France ; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities 193 . The Court shall rule on this motion based on the papers submitted. The noticed hearing date of December 17, 2013, is VACATED. (jm) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff McRO Inc Court Reporter. Court will contact Mark S. Raskin at mark.raskin@mishcon.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 12/16/2013 Case Management/Scheduling Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in support of MOTION for Discovery regarding UNOPPOSED Issuance of a Letter of Request Under the Hague Convention From Third-Party Witness Catherine Pelachaud, a Resident of France ; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities 193 filed by Counter Claimant Insomniac Games Inc, Defendant Insomniac Games Inc. (Singer, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT (Joint) filed by Defendants Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Insomniac Games Inc, Konami Digital Entertainment Inc, Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Naughty Dog Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Obsidian Entertainment Inc, Sega of America Inc, Square Enix Inc, Treyarch Corporation, Counter Claimants Capcom USA Inc, Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Insomniac Games Inc, Insomniac Games Inc, Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Naughty Dog Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Obsidian Entertainment Inc, Sega of America Inc, Sega of America Inc, Treyarch Corporation, Treyarch Corporation. (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Telephonic Appearance at 12-16-2013 Further Case Management and Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST for Leave to to Appear by Telephone (Jonathan N. Zerger) filed by defendant Naughty Dog Inc. Request set for hearing on 12/16/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Diab, Tony) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to MOTION for Discovery regarding UNOPPOSED Issuance of a Letter of Request Under the Hague Convention From Third-Party Witness Catherine Pelachaud, a Resident of France ; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities 193 filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: The Court ADVANCES the hearing to December 17, 2013. To the extent plaintiff opposes any part of the request, its opposition is due by December 6, 2013. Defendant may file a reply, to the extent an opposition is filed, by December 13, 2013. The hearing will be held at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom E of the above entitled court located at 312 N. Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See attached Order.) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 192 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Vincent Filardo, Jr. on behalf of McRo, Inc., designating Irene Y. Lee as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ashleigh K Landis counsel for Defendants Konami Digital Entertainment Inc, Square Enix Inc. Adding Ashleigh K. Landis as attorney as counsel of record for Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc. and Squire Enix, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc. and Squire Enix, Inc. (Attorney Ashleigh K Landis added to party Konami Digital Entertainment Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Ashleigh K Landis added to party Square Enix Inc(pty:dft))(Landis, Ashleigh) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Discovery regarding UNOPPOSED Issuance of a Letter of Request Under the Hague Convention From Third-Party Witness Catherine Pelachaud, a Resident of France ; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by defendant Insomniac Games Inc. Motion set for hearing on 12/31/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Benjamin L. Singer in Support of UNOPPOSED Motion for Issuance of a Letter of Request Under the Hague Convention for Discovery from Third-Party Witness Catherine Pelachaud, a Resident of France, # 2 Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Convention)(Singer, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Vincent Filardo, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12997276 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason Jaewook Lee counsel for Defendants Konami Digital Entertainment Inc, Square Enix Inc. Jason J. Lee is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc. and Square Enix, Inc.. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Benjamin L Singer counsel for Counter Claimants Insomniac Games Inc, Insomniac Games Inc, Defendant Insomniac Games Inc. Changing firm name to Colt / Singer / Bea LLP. Changing email to bsinger@coltsinger.com. Filed by defendant Insomniac Games, Inc.. (Singer, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Monday, June 17, 2013; 8:48 A.M. re Transcript 188 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Wilcox, Wil) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Monday, June 17, 2013; 8:48 A.M.. Court Reporter: Wil S. Wilcox, phone number 213-290-2849. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/31/2013. (Wilcox, Wil) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) With Prejudice as to THQ, Inc.. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Counterclaim, 174 as to Counter Defendant McRO Inc by Counter-claimant Naughty Dog Inc (pj) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Sega of America Inc, Treyarch Corporation Court Reporter. Court will contact Evan N. Budaj at evan.budaj@weil.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 6/17/2013 Scheduling Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plant Blue's ANSWER to Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 158 to Defendant Treyarch Corporation Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plant Blue's ANSWER to Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 163 to Defendant Sega of America, Inc. Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plant Blue's ANSWER to Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 162 to Defendant Neversoft Entertainment, Inc. Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim, 174 JURY DEMAND. of Naughty Dog, Inc. filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plant Blue's ANSWER to Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 161 to Defendant Namco Bandai Games America, Inc. Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plant Blue's ANSWER to Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 155 to Defendant Insomniac Games, Inc. Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plant Blue's ANSWER to Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 160 to Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plant Blue's ANSWER to Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 159 to Defendant Disney Interactive Studios, Inc. Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plant Blue's ANSWER to Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 157 to Defendant Capcom USA Inc Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING THE DESIGNATION AND HANDLING OF CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: 171 Motion for Protective Order : Note Changes Made by Court: (see attached) (jm) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendant McRO Inc to the FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Counterclaim 169 ,filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Naughty Dog Inc (pj) Modified on 8/15/2013 (pj). (pj). (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's First to Amended Complaint 149 filed by defendant and counterclaimant Naughty Dog Inc. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Errata re [Proposed] Protective Order Governing the Designation and Handling of Confidential Materials filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Protective Order for Handling of Confidential Information filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                21 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim 169 as to Counter Defendant McRO Inc. (pj) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Counter Defendant McRO Inc DBA Planet Blue, filed by Counter Claimant Defendant Naughty Dog Inc.(pj) (pj). (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY filed by Defendant Naughty Dog Inc to Amended Complaint 92 (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Amended Answer and Counterclaim 164 by Judge George H. Wu. The Counterclaim portion of the document is hereby stricken. Counsel will have 48 hours from the date of receipt of this response to manually file the Counterclaim at the Court's Civil Intake Window. (kti) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Answer and Counterclaim 164 . The following error(s) was found: Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2, Initiating Documents must be *MANUALLY* filed at the Civil Intake Window. A conformed filed stamped PDF image shall be emailed to (CivilIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov) within 24 hours. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (kti) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Obsidian Entertainment Inc, re Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 164 served on July 31, 2013. (Spach, Madison) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [***COUNTERCLAIM PORTION IS STRICKEN PURSUANT TO 167 ***] AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint 149 , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Obsidian Entertainment Inc. (Spach, Madison) Modified on 7/31/2013 (kti). (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to SECOND Amended Complaint 70 , COUNTERCLAIMS against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Sega of America Inc. (pj) (pj). (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to SECOND Amended Complaint 67 , COUNTERCLAIMS against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Neversoft Entertainment Inc.. (pj) (pj). (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to SECOND Amended Complaint 68 , COUNTERCLAIM against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Namco Bandai Games America Inc. (pj) (pj). (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to SECOND Amended Complaint 64 , COUNTERCLAIMS against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Electronic Arts, Inc.. (pj) (pj). (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to SECOND Amended Complaint 66 , COUNTERCLAIM against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Disney Interactive Studios Inc. (pj) (pj). (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to FIRST Amended Complaint, 130 , COUNTERCLAIM against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Treyarch Corporation. (pj) (pj). (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT 65 AND, COUNTERCLAIM against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Capcom USA Inc. (pj) (pj). (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant and counterclaim-plaintiff Insomniac Games Inc, served on July 24, 2013. (Singer, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 121 , 120 AND, COUNTERCLAIMS against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Insomniac Games Inc. (pj) (pj). (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Sega of America Inc, Treyarch Corporation, served on July 24, 2013. (Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF DEFENDANT NAUGHTY DOG, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISSPLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (filed 06/10/13; Dkt.No. 105) 105 Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: Court hears oral argument. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's final ruling. Defendants' motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant Naughty Dog, Inc.'s response to the amended complaint will be due 21 days from the date of this order. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File 147 The Court, having considered the Stipulated Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaims, hereby ORDERS as follow: Plaintiff may have until July 25, 2013, to respond to Defendants Counterclaims, (Counter Defendant McRO Inc answer due 7/25/2013) by Judge George H. Wu (pj) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc, re Amended Complaint 149 , Summons Issued 150 served on 7/10/13. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        21 DAY Summons Issued re FIRST Amended Complaint 149 as to Defendant Obsidian Entertainment Inc. (pj) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Obsidian Entertainment Inc,filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(pj) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. for Telephone Appearance re 7/11/13 Hearing re Naughty Dog's Motion to Dismiss (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST for Leave of Sonal N. Mehta to Appear for hearing by telephone filed by Defendants Capcom USA Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Electronic Arts, Inc., Namco Bandai Games America Inc, Neversoft Entertainment Inc., Sega of America Inc, Treyarch Corporation. Request set for hearing on 7/11/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu: Plaintiff McRO, Inc., dba Planet Blues Motion for leave to file its First Amended Complaint against Defendant Obsidian Entertainment, Inc. is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs Proposed Second Amended Complaints will be manually filed and any responsive pleadings to this First Amended Complaint are due twenty one (21) days thereafter. 144 (pj) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file amended complaint UNOPPOSED filed by plaintiff McRO Inc. Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Obsidian FAC, # 2 Exhibit A - 576 patent re Obsidian FAC, # 3 Exhibit B - 278 patent re Obsidan FAC, # 4 Exhibit C - re Obsidian FAC, # 5 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in support MOTION to Dismiss claims for willful infringement and infringement pursuant to 35 U.S.C. section 271(g) 105 filed by Defendant Naughty Dog Inc. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Capcom USA Inc, identifying Corporate Parent Capcom Co Ltd for Capcom USA Inc, Capcom USA Inc. (pj) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to SECOND Amended Complaint 65 , COUNTERCLAIM against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Capcom USA Inc.(pj) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sega of America Inc, identifying Corporate Parent Sega Sammy Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Sega Corporation for Sega of America Inc. (pj) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to SECOND Amended Complaint 70 , COUNTERCLAIM against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Sega of America Inc.(pj) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Electronic Arts, Inc., (pj) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to SECOND Amended Complaint 64 , COUNTERCLAIM against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Electronic Arts, Inc..(pj) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Namco Bandai Games America Inc, identifying Corporate Parent Namco Bandai Holdings USA Inc, Corporate Parent Namco Bandai Holdings Inc for Namco Bandai Games America Inc. (pj) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to SECOND Amended Complaint 68 , COUNTERCLAIM against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Namco Bandai Games America Inc.(pj) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Neversoft Entertainment Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Activison Blizzard Inc, Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Neversoft Entertainment Inc.. (pj) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to SECOND Amended Complaint 67 , COUNTERCLAIM against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Neversoft Entertainment Inc..(pj) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Treyarch Corporation, identifying Corporate Parent Activison Blizzard Inc, Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Treyarch Corporation. (pj) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to FIRST Amended Complaint, 130 , COUNTERCLAIM against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Treyarch Corporation.(pj) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Treyarch Corporation amending Complaint - (Discovery), 1 ,filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (THIS IS A COPY OF WHICH WAS FILED IN THE CIVIL CASE NUMBER 12-10342 ON 3/18/2013 GW) (pj) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF INTERESTED of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Disney Interactive Studios Inc, identifying Corporate Parent Walt Disney Company for Disney Interactive Studios Inc, Disney Interactive Studios Inc. (pj) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to SECOND Amended Complaint 66 , COUNTERCLAIMS against McRO Inc filed by Defendant Disney Interactive Studios Inc.(pj) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant and Counterclaim-Plaintiff Capcom USA Inc, served on June 21, 2013. (Lee, Justin) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case 116 ,Case number 2:12-cv-10344 shall be dismissed with prejudice. Visceral Games terminated. (see attached for further details) (pj) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,014 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?