O'Brien v. Springfield, City of, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-30041
District Judge Michael A Ponsor, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 30, 2016 at 3:35 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gerard C. O'Brien, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory A. Hession

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A. Hession +1 413 746 3333 +1 413 746 6161 hession@crocker.com
v.
No Logo Massachusetts Teachers Association, Defendant
No Logo National Education Association, Defendant
No Logo Springfield Education Association, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandulli & Grace, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Laura Davidson +1 617 523 2500
No Logo Springfield, City of, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter M. Murphy +1 413 733 1222 +1 413 733 1245 liamclare@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by J.E. Losavio, Jr., Law Office of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward M. Pikula +1 413 531 5004 +1 413 294 1079 attyemp@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter P. Fenton +1 413 787 6085 +1 413 732 6818 pfenton@royalllp.com
No Logo Massachusetts Teachers Association, Cross-Defendant
No Logo National Education Association, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Springfield Education Association, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Springfield, City of, Cross-Claimant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2003
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Massachusetts Teachers Association, National Education Association, Gerard C. O'Brien, Springfield Education Association, Springfield, City of. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 08/19/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL by the parties' Gerard C. O'Brien, and City of Springfield. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 07/01/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: None
      Assented to MOTION to Continue Status Conference to 6/30/04 at 3:00 PM by Gerard C. O'Brien, Springfield, City of.(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 04/16/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Murphy on behalf of the City of Springfield. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 04/02/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference REset for 4/29/2004 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Honorable Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/01/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: None
            Notice Resetting or Cancelling Hearing. Hearing rescheduled : status conference reset to: 4/1/04 at 2:30 p.m. (French, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/15/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: None
              Parties Assented to motion to cont. the status conf. set for 2/19/2004 at 3:30 P.M. filed by fax. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/19/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Change of Address by Gregory A. Hession (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 12/23/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None
                  Defts. assented to motion to cont. the 12/18/2003 status conf. to January 2004 filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/18/2003 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Honorable Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/10/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None
                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 31 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Massachusetts Teachers Association, National Education Association, Springfield Education Association. (Stuckenbruck, John) (Entered: 09/26/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: None
                        Ptf's OPPOSITION to Dft's 35 MOTION to Amend 34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, MOTION to Stay re 34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, MOTION to Stay re 34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, filed by Gerard C. O'Brien. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 09/25/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None
                          P's Stipulated to MOTION to ext. time to 9/25/2003 to resp. the Defts' motion to amend interlocutory order to include a statement prescribed by 28 U.S.C. 1292 filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 35 MOTION to Amend 34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment and to stay, filed by Massachusetts Teachers Association, National Education Association, Springfield Education Association, c/s. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 08/22/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Amend 34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment to Include a Statement Prescribed by 28 U.S.C.A. 1292 and to Stay Pending Appeal from the Amended Order filed by Massachusetts Teachers Association, National Education Association, Springfield Education Association, c/s, cert/consl.(Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 08/22/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Judge Frank H. Freedman : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. The Court GRANTS IN PART and DNEIES IN PART the Defts' motions for S/J - [16-1], [31-1]. As such, the claims arising from O'Briens 1995 suspension, as well as the claims arising from the Unions' refusal to accomodate his reasonably during the 1993-94 school years and the school years thereafter, will proceed to trial unless the parties agre to settle their disputes beforehand; cc/cl.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None
                                  Notice of change of address filed by Amy Laura Davidson by Spfld. Ed. Assoc., Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. . (mgl) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Senior Judge Frank H. Freedman . Clerk's Notes: re: Hearing on D's motion for S/J - [16-1], [31-1] motion for S/J. After hearing the Court takes the motion under advisement. The Deft. City of Springfield orally joins in Co-Defts. motion for S/J - [16-1]. Court Reporter: Nichole Pouliot. (mef) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: None
                                      Motion by Springfield, City of, Spfld. Ed. Assoc., Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 01/10/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: None
                                        Resp. by Gerard C. O'Brien in opposition to [28-1] motion for leave to file a reply brief , filed. (mef) (Entered: 12/18/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None
                                          Certificate of service by Spfld. Ed. Assoc., Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. re: [28-1] motion for leave to file a reply brief, [27-1] motion to postpone hearing on motion for summary judgement , filed. (mgl) (Entered: 12/03/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None
                                            Motion by Spfld. Ed. Assoc., Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. for leave to file a reply brief , filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 12/03/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None
                                              Assented to Motion by Gerard C. O'Brien, Spfld. Ed. Assoc., Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. to postpone hearing on motion for summary judgement , filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 12/03/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Senior Judge Frank H. Freedman . Notice of Hearing : Motion hearing set for 10:00 A.M. on 12/30/2002 for [16-1] motion for SJ'; cc/cl. (mef) (Entered: 11/19/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                  Joint Request (non motion) for hearing on motion for summary judgment, filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 11/19/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                    Certificate of service by Gerard C. O'Brien re: Ptf's [23-1] opposition response to motion for S/J, filed. (mgl) (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                      Resp. by Gerard C. O'Brien in opposition to [16-1] motion for S/J filed. (mef) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                        Joint motion by Gerard C. O'Brien, Springfield, City of, Spfld. Ed. Assoc., Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. for leave to file Briefs in excess of the page limitations , filed. c/s . (mgl) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                          STIPULATION (Motion) by Gerard C. O'Brien, Springfield, City of, Spfld. Ed. Assoc., Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. to ext. time for one week to resp. to the Defts' motion for S/J filed. (mef) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                            Certificate of service by Spfld. Ed. Assoc., Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. re: [19-1] affidavit, [18-1] affidavit, [17-1] brief, [16-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. (mgl) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                              Affidavit of Timothy Collins, re: [16-1] motion for summary judgment, filed. (mgl) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                Affidavit of Ann Clarke, re: [16-1] motion for summary judgment, filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief in support of its motion for summary judgment by Spfld. Ed. Assoc., Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc., filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                    Motion by Spfld. Ed. Assoc., Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                      Rule 16.1 Certification filed by Spfld. Ed. Assoc., Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. . (jcs) (Entered: 07/30/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Senior Judge Frank H. Freedman . Procedural Order entered Pretrial Conf. set for 10:00 A.M. on 6/19/2003; cc/cl. [EOD Date 6/25/02] (mef) (Entered: 06/25/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Senior Judge Frank H. Freedman . Scheduling Order entered setting Discovery cutoff 3/14/2003. Pretrial Conf. set for 10:00 A.M. on 6/19/2003. Deadline for filing of motions for S/J set for 10/14/2002; cc/cl. [EOD Date 6/25/02] (mef) (Entered: 06/25/2002)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Senior Judge Frank H. Freedman . Clerk's Notes: re: Counsel present for scheduling conf. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Alice Moran. (mef) (Entered: 06/25/2002)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                              Joint statement by Gerard C. O'Brien, Springfield, City of, Spfld. Ed. Assoc., Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. re: Rule 16 scheduling conf., filed. (mef) (Entered: 06/25/2002)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                Certificate of service by Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. re: [7-1] answer , filed. (mgl) (Entered: 05/29/2002)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                  Certificate of service by Springfield, City of re: [8-1] answer, filed. (mgl) (Entered: 05/29/2002)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                    Answer by Spfld. Ed. Assoc. to complaint, filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 05/29/2002)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                      Answer by Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. to complaint, filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 05/29/2002)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Senior Judge Frank H. Freedman . Notice of Conference: Set Pretrial Scheduling Conf. for 10:00 A.M. on 6/25/2002; cc/cl. (mef) Modified on 05/28/2002 (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                          Answer by Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. to [2-1] cross claim by the Deft. City of Springfield filed. (mef) Modified on 05/28/2002 (Entered: 05/23/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                            Answer by Spfld. Ed. Assoc. to [2-1] cross claim of the Deft. City of Springfield filed. (mef) Modified on 05/28/2002 (Entered: 05/23/2002)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                              STIPULATION (Motion) by Spfld. Ed. Assoc., Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. , to extend time to 5/23/02 to resp. to the crossclaim of the Deft. City of Springfield , filed. (mef) (Entered: 05/23/2002)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                Crossclaim by Springfield, City of against Spfld. Ed. Assoc., Mass. Teachers Asso., National Ed. Assoc. , filed. (mef) (Entered: 05/23/2002)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: Frank H. Freedman. Receipt #: 304813. Amount: $150.00. Fee Status: Paid. CF, LR 4.1, notice of lawsuit and waiver of service of summons to Counsel. (mef) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 88 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?