Estate of Manuel Diaz et al v. City of Anaheim et al
Federal Court Proceeding California Central District Court, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 6, 2018 at 8:29 PM ST (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Estate of Manuel Diaz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angel Castillo, Jr. +1 305 662 1212 +1 305 666 0010 acastillojr@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dale Galipo Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melanie T Partow +1 818 347 3333 +1 818 347 4118 mpartow@galipolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Douglas, Lopez & Rumm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dana L. Douglas +1 714 634 3800 +1 866 927 0571 ddouglas@douglaslopezrumm.com
Space Diana Lopez +1 714 634 3800 +1 866 927 0571 dlopez@douglaslopezrumm.com
Space James F Rumm +1 714 634 3800

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Humberto Guizar +1 323 725 1151 +1 323 725 0350 herito@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ultimo Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dale Kristopher Galipo +1 818 347 3333 +1 818 347 4118 dkg.courtmail@yahoo.com
No Logo Genevieve Huizar, Plaintiff
No Logo John Huizar, Plaintiff
No Logo Lupe Diaz, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Anaheim Police Department, Defendant
No Logo City of Anaheim, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anaheim City Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Moses Wilbur Johnson, IV +1 714 765 5169 +1 714 765 5123 mjohnson@anaheim.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Carpenter Rothans & Dumont

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J Rothans +1 213 228 0400 +1 213 228 0401 srothans@crdlaw.com
Space Jill Williams +1 213 228 0400 +1 213 228 0401 jwilliams@crdlaw.com
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo John Welter, Defendant
No Logo Officer Doe 2, Defendant
No Logo Officer Nick Bennallack, Defendant
  Entries (219) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Receipt for Release of Exhibits to Counsel upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial (G-38)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unredacted Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unredacted Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unredacted Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unredacted Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unredacted Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unredacted Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unredacted Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unredacted Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unredacted Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unredacted Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unredacted Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unredacted Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unredacted Document
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Jury Trial - Completed
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Response
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Response
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held and Continued
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held and Continued
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held and Continued
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held and Continued
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held and Continued
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Response
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Response
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Response
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Objection
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held and Continued
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held and Continued
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Response
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None In Limine - Exclude
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/22/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None In Limine - Exclude
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Pretrial Conference Order - Final
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None For Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AMENDED - BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 84,808.15 in favor of City of Anaheim, et al and against Estate of Manuel Diaz, et al.. RE: 155 (mb) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CIRCUIT filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. Amending Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 157 Filed On: March 20, 2014; Entered On: March 20, 2014; (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Appeal)(Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: denying plaintiffs' 156 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ; denying 156 Motion for New Trial. (twdb) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REPLY in Support of Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial 156 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration [Reply] of Melanie T. Partow, # 2 Exhibit F to Partow Decl., # 3 Exhibit G to Partow Decl., # 4 Exhibit H to Partow Decl., # 5 Exhibit I to Partow Decl., # 6 Exhibit J to Partow Decl., # 7 Exhibit K to Partow Decl.)(Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 157 filed by Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar CCA # 14-55644. The court's records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4). The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, appellate proceedings other than mediation shall be held in abeyance. pending the district courts resolution of the pending motion. See Leader Nat'l Ins.Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994).Within 5 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion,appellant shall notify this court in writing of the ruling and shall advise whetherappellant intends to prosecute this appeal.To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellantmust file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Ruleof Appellate Procedure 4.The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. Order received in this district on 4/25/2014. (dmap) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION TO re: Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial 156 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 157 as to Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar; Receipt Number: SA010099 in the amount of $505. (car) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 157 . (dmap) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 14-55644 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 157 as to Plaintiff Genevieve Huizar. (dmap) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 157 . (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 157 . (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. Appeal of Order on Motion in Limine to Exclude,,,,, Order on Motion in Limine to Bifurcate,,,,, Pretrial Conference - Final, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 110 , Judgment 152 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, MOTION for New Trial filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. Motion set for hearing on 5/19/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Melanie T. Partow in Support of Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for New Trial, # 3 Exhibit A to Partow Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Partow Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Partow Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Partow Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Partow Declaration)(Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Amended APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against PLAINTIFFS Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar filed by DEFENDANTS Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim. Application set for hearing on 4/14/2014 at 09:00 AM before Clerk of Court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-23, # 2 Exhibit 24-45, # 3 Exhibit 46-65, # 4 Exhibit 66-82, # 5 Exhibit 83-99, # 6 Exhibit 100-120, # 7 Exhibit 121-131)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against PLAINTIFFS Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar filed by DEFENDANTS Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim. Application set for hearing on 4/14/2014 at 09:00 AM before Clerk of Court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-13, # 2 Exhibit 14-30, # 3 Exhibit 31-44, # 4 Exhibit 45-57, # 5 Exhibit 58-69, # 6 Exhibit 70-83, # 7 Exhibit 84-97, # 8 Exhibit 98-110, # 9 Exhibit 111-122, # 10 Exhibit 123-131)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      COURT'S EXHIBIT D as to Status Conference, 151 . (dro) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        JUDGMENT by Judge James V. Selna, in favor of City of Anaheim, Officer Nick Bennallack against Plaintiffs. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Status Conference re Juror Contact held before Judge James V. Selna:Cause called and counsel make their appearances via telephone. The CourtORDERS the transcript of this proceeding sealed. See minute order for further information.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (twdb) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (twdb) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF LODGING OF [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT filed by DEFENDANTS Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim. (Attachments: # 1 proposed judgment)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Court's EXHIBIT C Filed (twdb) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  SPECIAL VERDICT. (twdb) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Jury Notes # 1 filed. (twdb) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      SPECIAL VERDICT. (twdb) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Jury Notes # 1 filed. (twdb) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial; Pursuant to stip of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on Joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (twdb) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Trial Time Log (twdb) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              LIST OF EXHIBITS AND WITNESSES at trial. (twdb) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 7th Day held and completed before Judge James V. Selna: Verdict reached. Jury FINDS: in favor of defendant. Jury polled.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (twdb) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 6th Day held before Judge James V. Selna: Closing arguments made. Jury Trial continued to 3/6/2014 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (twdb) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 5th Day held before Judge James V. Selna: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial set for 3/5/2014 08:15 AM before Judge James V. Selna.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (twdb) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 4th Day held before Judge James V. Selna: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial continued to 3/4/2014 08:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (twdb) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF LODGING PORTIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF WITNESS LUPE DIAZ PLAYED FOR JURY AT TRIAL filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim. (Attachments: # 1 PORTIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF WITNESS LUPE DIAZ PLAYED FOR JURY AT TRIAL)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING PORTIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF WITNESS ANNA VENTURA PLAYED FOR JURY AT TRIAL filed by Defendants City of Anaheim. (Attachments: # 1 PORTIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF WITNESS ANNA VENTURA PLAYED FOR JURY AT TRIAL)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Limiting and Additional [Annotated] set) filed by Plaintiff Genevieve Huizar.. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Court's EXHIBIT A (twdb) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Court's EXHIBIT B(twdb) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED Alternate Special JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 130 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED Special JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED AMENDED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Amended Special Verdict Form)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the basis of: Fed.R.Civ.P., 50(a) filed by defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jill Williams, # 2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jill Williams, # 3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Jill Williams)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 3rd Day held before Judge James V. Selna: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial continued to 2/28/2014 08:45 AM before Judge James V. Selna.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (twdb) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 2nd Day held before Judge James V. Selna: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial continued to 2/27/2014 08:45 AM before Judge James V. Selna.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (twdb) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 1st Day held before Judge James V. Selna: Jury empanelled and sworn. Opening statements made. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial continued to 2/26/2014 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (twdb) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                INITIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS (twdb) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED JOINT Exhibit List filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar.. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF RE COMPARATIVE FAULT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE filed by DEFENDANTS Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim.. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF Re Contributory Negligence or Comparative Fault as an Affirmative Defense filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar.. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED JOINT Exhibit List filed by DEFENDANTS Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim.. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness List filed by DEFENDANTS Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim.. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANTS' INDEX OF PORTIONS OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF ANNA VENTURA TO BE READ TO JURY filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim.. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Witness List filed by Defendant Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim.. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: Jury Trial continued to 2/25/2014 08:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (twdb) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: The Court continues the Trial. Jury Trial continued to 2/25/2014 08:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (twdb) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiff Genevieve Huizar.. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF filed by DEFENDANTS Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim. RE PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS FOR UNREASONABLE DETENTION AND FALSE ARREST (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL BRIEF filed by DEFENDANTS Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim. RE PLAINTIFFS' ENTITLEMENT TO PAIN AND SUFFERING DAMAGES (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference and Motions in Limine held before Judge James V. Selna. Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer regarding evidentiary issues and trial procedures. The Court advises counsel to contact the Courtroom Clerk by Friday, January 17, 2014 to set up a Telephonic Conference if there is a need. The Court will sign and file the pretrial conference order as presented. (see document for details of rulings on motions 59 60 61 62 65 66 67 68 69 70 )Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (dro) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge James V. Selna (twdb) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 108 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated [Joint Agreed Upon, Disputed with Objections, & [Proposed] Alternative) set) filed by Plaintiff Genevieve Huizar.. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Witness List filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim.. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge James V. Selna. Final Pretrial Conference and all motions in limine previously scheduled for 1/13/14 at 11:00 AM has been advanced to 1/13/2014 at 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dv) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Genevieve Huizar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order)(Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness List filed by Plaintiff Genevieve Huizar.. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Genevieve Huizar. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF CASE (JOINT) (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT Exhibit List Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim.. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness List filed by DEFENDANTS' Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim.. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFENANTS' MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Defense Expert Daniel Gonzalez Pursuant to FRE 702 70 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Defense Expert Stephen Cooley Pursuant to FRE 702 69 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Defense Expert Richard F. Clark, MD, Pursuant to FRE 702 68 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Bifurcate Liability and Damages at Trial 66 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Specific Items of Information Acquired After the Shooting and Not Known to the Shooting Officer at the Time of the Incident 65 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #4 to Exclude INFLAMMATORY EVIDENCE 62 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #3 to Exclude EVIDENCE OF OTHER ALLEGED "WRONGS" BY THE DEFENDANTS AND OTHER POLICE AGENCIES 61 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #2 to Exclude EVIDENCE OF EVENTS THAT OCCURRED AFTER THE SHOOTING, INCLUDING VIDEOS OF THE SCENE 60 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #1 to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT THAT THE DECEDENT WAS UNARAMED OR THAT NO GUN WAS RECOVERED POST-SHOOTING 59 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge James V. Selna, re Exhibit J to Declaration of Melanie T. Partow in Support of Plaintiff's Motions in Limine Nos. 1-6. Local Rule 5-4.1 Documents must be filed electronically. The Court does not see any reason why this document cannot be e-filed. Counsel are directed to provide a copy to the Court with pictures that are viewable. (ago) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE #4 to Exclude INFLAMMATORY EVIDENCE 62 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE #3 to Exclude EVIDENCE OF OTHER ALLEGED "WRONGS" BY THE DEFENDANTS AND OTHER POLICE AGENCIES 61 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE #2 to Exclude EVIDENCE OF EVENTS THAT OCCURRED AFTER THE SHOOTING, INCLUDING VIDEOS OF THE SCENE 60 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE #1 to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT THAT THE DECEDENT WAS UNARAMED OR THAT NO GUN WAS RECOVERED POST-SHOOTING 59 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION TO re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Defense Expert Daniel Gonzalez Pursuant to FRE 702 70 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C, # 2 Exhibit D - G)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION TO re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Defense Expert Stephen Cooley Pursuant to FRE 702 69 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION TO re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Defense Expert Richard F. Clark, MD, Pursuant to FRE 702 68 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of the Orange County District Attorney and City of Anaheim's Investigation, Review and Conclusions that Officer Bennallack's Use of Force was not Criminal, was Reasonable, and/or was Within Po 67 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION TO re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Bifurcate Liability and Damages at Trial 66 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Specific Items of Information Acquired After the Shooting and Not Known to the Shooting Officer at the Time of the Incident 65 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D, # 2 Exhibit E - G, # 3 Exhibit H - M)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Excluding Evidence by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, following stipulation 74 of counsel, the plaintiffs are precluded from referencing or introducing any evidence, testimony or argument concerning the following issues at the trial of this matter: (see document for details). (dro) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion for Summary Judgment. (twdb) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge James V. Selna: taking under advisement 49 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court resets the trial. (The matter shall trail if necessary). Trial continued to 1/21/2014 08:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (twdb) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION to Exclude EVIDENCE filed by DEFENDANTS Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar of Exhibit J to Declaration of Melanie T. Partow in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine 1-6. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed of [Proposed] Order re MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Defense Expert Richard F. Clark, MD, Pursuant to FRE 702 68 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 4)(Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Melanie T. Partow in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Specific Items of Information Acquired After the Shooting and Not Known to the Shooting Officer at the Time of the Incident 65 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Bifurcate Liability and Damages at Trial 66 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Defense Expert Richard F. Clark, MD, Pursuant to FRE 702 68 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Defense Expert Daniel Gonzalez Pursuant to FRE 702 70 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Defense Expert Stephen Cooley Pursuant to FRE 702 69 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of the Orange County District Attorney and City of Anaheim's Investigation, Review and Conclusions that Officer Bennallack's Use of Force was not Criminal, was Reasonable, and/or was Within Po 67 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Defense Expert Daniel Gonzalez Pursuant to FRE 702 filed by Plaintiff Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Defense Expert Stephen Cooley Pursuant to FRE 702 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Defense Expert Stephen Cooley Pursuant to FRE 702)(Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Defense Expert Richard F. Clark, MD, Pursuant to FRE 702 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of the Orange County District Attorney and City of Anaheim's Investigation, Review and Conclusions that Officer Bennallack's Use of Force was not Criminal, was Reasonable, and/or was Within Policy filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3)(Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Bifurcate Liability and Damages at Trial filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 2)(Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Specific Items of Information Acquired After the Shooting and Not Known to the Shooting Officer at the Time of the Incident filed by Plaintiff Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1)(Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed Exhibit A IN SUPPORT OF re MOTION IN LIMINE #2 to Exclude EVIDENCE OF EVENTS THAT OCCURRED AFTER THE SHOOTING, INCLUDING VIDEOS OF THE SCENE 60 (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE #4 to Exclude INFLAMMATORY EVIDENCE Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F, # 2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE #3 to Exclude EVIDENCE OF OTHER ALLEGED "WRONGS" BY THE DEFENDANTS AND OTHER POLICE AGENCIES filed by DEFENDANTS Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE #2 to Exclude EVIDENCE OF EVENTS THAT OCCURRED AFTER THE SHOOTING, INCLUDING VIDEOS OF THE SCENE Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I, # 2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE #1 to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT THAT THE DECEDENT WAS UNARAMED OR THAT NO GUN WAS RECOVERED POST-SHOOTING Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    INDEX OF PLEADINGS FILED IN CONNECTION WITH DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re: Reply (Motion related) 55 (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Summary Judgment OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 49 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFFS IN OPPOSITION TO re: MOTION for Summary Judgment OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 49 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO OPPOSITION MOTION for Summary Judgment OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 49 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 49 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Controverted Facts and Additional Material Facts in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration of Melanie T. Partow in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit A to Partow Decl. in Opposition, # 4 Exhibit B to Partow Decl. in Opposition, # 5 Exhibit C to Partow Decl. in Opposition, # 6 Exhibit D to Partow Decl. in Opposition, # 7 Exhibit E to Partow Decl. in Opposition, # 8 Exhibit F to Partow Decl. in Opposition, # 9 Exhibit G to Partow Decl. in Opposition, # 10 Exhibit H to Partow Decl. in Opposition)(Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, granting Joint Stipulation to Set Briefing Schedule and Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 51 . Having reviewed the parties' Joint Stipulation to Set Briefing Schedule and Continue the Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and GOOD CAUSE appearing therefore, the parties' Stipulation is hereby GRANTED. The December 9, 2013 hearing on Defendants' motion for summary judgment is hereby continued to December 16, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiffs' Opposition papers are due no later than November 22, 2013. Defendants' Reply papers are due no later than December 4, 2013. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Dismissing Claims by Judge James V. Selna, re Stipulation 48 . (twdb) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from December 9, 2013 to December 16, 2013 Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 49 , Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to MSJ (from November 18, 2013 to November 22, 2013) and Defendants' Reply to MSJ (from November 25, 2013 to December 4, 2013) filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Attorney Melanie T Partow added to party Estate of Manuel Diaz(pty:pla), Attorney Melanie T Partow added to party Genevieve Huizar(pty:pla))(Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Summary Judgment OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 49 filed by DEFENDANTS Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by DEFENDANTS Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONLCUSIONS OF LAW, # 2 INDEX OF EVIDENCE, # 3 Exhibit A - G, # 4 Exhibit H - O, # 5 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Order DISMISSING CLAIMS filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, granting Stipulation to Continue deadline to commence deposition of witness Lupe Diaz 46 . (twdb) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Continue DEADLINE TO COMMENCE DEPOSITION OF WITNESS LUPE DIAZ from October 25, 2013 to November 1, 2013 Re: Order 20 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block: On October 4, 2013, the parties appeared before Magistrate Judge Block for a settlement conference. After approximately 2-1/2 hours of discussions, the settlement conference was adjourned without a settlement being reached. Court Recorder: CourtSmart. (ts) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block governing Orange County District Attorney's Office Investigation Report re: 42 43 . It is So Ordered. See document for additional information. (ts) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. Amendment to Stipulation for Protective Order 42 (Proposed) PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING ORANGE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE INVESTIGATION REPORT (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter.(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block: re: Proposed Protective Order 38 . The parties are advised that, while the terms of their proposed stipulated Protective order are generally acceptable to the Court, they still need to make certain modifications before the Court will sign off on it. See document for more information. (ts) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block for settlement proceedings. The Settlement Conference is placed on calendar for October 4, 2013, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6D of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse in Santa Ana, California. See document for information regarding pre-conference requirements. (ts) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST for Hearing Settlement Conference filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. Request set for hearing on 10/4/2013 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST for Order for Protective Order Governing Orange County District Attorney's Office investigation report filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Compliance Agreement)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, granting Stipulation for Order Continuing Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference 35 . Deadline for parties to complete the settlement conference is continued from August 30, 2013 to October 11, 2013. (ago) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Order CONTINUE DEADLINE TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Defenants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Genevieve Huizar as Successor In Interest to Manuel Angel Diaz (C.C.P. Section 377.32) filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Partow, Melanie) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Lien 31 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): Certification of Interested Parties needed for plaintiffs. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (dro) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Estate of Manuel Diaz, re Notice of Lien 31 served on 07/09/2013. (Douglas, Dana) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LIEN filed by plaintiff Estate of Manuel Diaz. (Douglas, Dana) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge James V. Selna granting 27 Request to Substitute Attorney Dale K. Galipo as attorney of record for plaintiff Estate of Manuel Diaz, instead of Douglas, Lopez & Rumm, LLP. Attorney James F Rumm; Dana L Douglas and Diana Lopez terminated (dro) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge James V. Selna granting 25 Request to Substitute Attorney Dale K. Galipo as attorney of record for plaintiff Genevieve Huizar instead of Douglas, Lopez, & Rumm, LLP. (dro) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Humberto Guizar and Angel Carraczo on behalf of Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. Filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar (Galipo, Dale) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST to Substitute attorney Dale K. Galipo in place of attorney Dana Douglas filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Galipo, Dale) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST to Substitute attorney Dale K. Galipo in place of attorney Angel Carraczo, Jr. filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Manuel Diaz, Genevieve Huizar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Galipo, Dale) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST to Substitute attorney Dale K. Galipo in place of attorney DOUGLAS, LOPEZ & RUMM, LLP filed by Plaintiff Estate of Manuel Diaz. (Douglas, Dana) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge James V. Selna: Granting 21 Request to Substitute Attorney. Court grants request of Genevieve Huizar to substitute Angel Carrazco, Jr in place of Douglas, Lopez & Rumm LLP. Attorney James F Rumm; Dana L Douglas and Diana Lopez terminated (rla) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Humberto Guizar counsel for Plaintiff Estate of Manuel Diaz. Adding Humberto Guizar, Esq. as attorney as counsel of record for Estate of Manuel Diaz and Genevieve Huizar for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Estate of Manuel Diaz and Genevieve Huizar (Guizar, Humberto) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Humberto Guizar, Esq. and Dale Galipo, Esq. on behalf of Plaintiff Estate of Manuel Diaz. Filed by Plaintiff Estate of Manuel Diaz (Guizar, Humberto) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST to Substitute attorney Angel Carrazco, Jr. Esq. in place of attorney Douglas, Lopez & Rumm, LLP filed by Plaintiff Estate of Manuel Diaz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Guizar, Humberto) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge James V. Selna for Jury Trial. Order for Preparation for Jury Trial. Order Governing Attorney & Party Conduct at Trial. (nbo) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna. The Court sets the case management dates with the agreement of counsel as follows: Discovery cut-off 11/1/2013. Law and Motion cut-off 12/9/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2014 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Jury Trial set for 1/28/2014 08:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (See document for additional dates.) Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (nbo) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: granting 13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed 2/21/13. (twdb) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference, previously set for 3/11/13 at 10:30 AM, to Monday, 3/25/2013 at 1:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge James V. Selna. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block for Settlement Conference. (rla) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-8 days, filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 1 filed. Parties request to Appear Before Magistrate Judge for settlement proceedings. Filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. Motion set for hearing on 3/25/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Defendant's Motions to Stay Pending Criminal Investigation 8 , held before Judge James V. Selna. Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court's tentative ruling is issued. Counsel make their arguments. The Court DENIES, except as to detailed below, the motion and rules in accordance with the tentative ruling as follows: (see document for details). Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (dro) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF BRYAN WHITMER-CABRERA FILED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY in support re: MOTION to Stay pending DISCOVERY PENDING CONCLUSION OF ORANGE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE CRIMINAL INVESTIGATION 8 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in support MOTION to Stay pending DISCOVERY PENDING CONCLUSION OF ORANGE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE CRIMINAL INVESTIGATION 8 filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION to MOTION to Stay pending DISCOVERY PENDING CONCLUSION OF ORANGE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE CRIMINAL INVESTIGATION 8 filed by Plaintiff Estate of Manuel Diaz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Douglas, Dana) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending DISCOVERY PENDING CONCLUSION OF ORANGE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE CRIMINAL INVESTIGATION filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter. Motion set for hearing on 1/7/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B, # 2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/4/2013. Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2013 10:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (jlen) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter, (Williams, Jill) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendants Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim, John Welter.(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(lwag) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Anaheim Police Department, Officer Nick Bennallack, City of Anaheim and John Welter. (lwag) (lwag). (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2012-00585728 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and first amended complaint. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block. (Filing fee $350 Paid). Filed by Defendants City of Anaheim, Officer Nick Bennallack, Anaheim Police Department and John Welter.(lwag) (lwag). (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 288 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?