Nina Cannon v. US
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 11-2365

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 4, 2016 at 4:22 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2870 - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 1:08-cv-00639-WWD.. [11-2365] (MR)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
    ORDER filed [998755062] granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [8] Copies to all parties... [11-2365] (MR)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
      MOTION by Appellant US to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [8]. Date and method of service: 12/30/2011 ecf [998755035] [11-2365] Regina Moriarty
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
        Initial mediation conference scheduled. [11-2365] (SLW)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Nina Cannon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998752921] [11-2365] William McPherson
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by William V. McPherson, Jr for Nina Cannon.[998752917] [11-2365] William McPherson
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
              TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Lori Russell. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: telephone conference on 8/4/2011. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: United States.. Originating case number: 1:08-cv-00639-WWD. [11-2365] (JSN)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant US. [11-2365] Regina Moriarty
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                  DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:08-cv-00639-WWD. Mailed to: William V. McPherson 3211 Shannon Road, Suite 620 Durham,NC 27707; Jonathan Carroll. [11-2365] (JSN)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 30 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?