Terri White, et al v. Experian Information Solutions, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 11-56482

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 6:02 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
MANDATE ISSUED.(KMW, RMG and SEH) [8673366] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RL)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
    Filed order (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON) The full court has been advised of the Petition for Rehearing En Banc and no judge of the court has requested a vote on the Petition for Rehearing En Banc. Fed. R. App. P. 35. Defendant-Appellee TransUnion LLC’s Petition for Rehearing En Banc is DENIED. [8660951] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
      Filed (ECF) Appellee Transunion, LLC in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482 petition for rehearing en banc (from 05/02/2013 opinion). Date of service: 05/15/2013. [8630356] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SJN)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
        Filed order and amended opinion (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON). The opinion filed on April 22, 2013, and published at __ F.3d __, 2013 WL 1715422, is amended as follows: At slip opinion page 23, lines 17–19, replace with the following: Conflicted representation provides an independent ground for reversing the settlement. Cf. id. (citing Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(a)(4), (g)(4)). Because we reverse the settlement, we must also reverse the awards of attorneys’ fees and costs. See In re Bluetooth, 654 F.3d at 940. Additionally, we reverse the awards because the district court abused its discretion by not considering “whether class counsel has properly discharged its duty of loyalty to absent class members” in its award of attorneys’ fees and costs.5 Cf. Rodriguez II, 688 F.3d at 655. The text of footnote 5 is unchanged. At slip opinion page 23, line 24 to page 24, line 2, replace with the following: On remand, the district court should determine when the conflict arose and if the conflict continues under any future settlement agreement. Should the district court approve such an agreement, it may then exercise its discretion in deciding whether, and to what extent, class counsel are entitled to fees under the common-fund doctrine.6 See Rodriguez II, 688 F.3d at 657; Rodriguez I, 563 F.3d at 967–68. The call number for footnote 6 should be moved to follow , as shown above. At slip opinion page 24, footnote 6, replace the text of the footnote with the following: Because we reverse the settlement and the awards of fees and costs based on the conditional incentive awards, we do not reach the issue of whether the subset of class counsel who brought the Acosta and Pike suits, which were consolidated with this case, faced an independent conflict of interest because of the fee-sharing agreement they executed with the rest of class counsel. The district court should revisit that issue in light of our holding. An amended opinion is filed concurrently with this order. In light of these amendments, any petition for panel rehearing or rehearing en banc shall be filed within fourteen days from the date of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. REVERSED AND REMANDED. [8612814] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (PH)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          FILED OPINION (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON) REVERSED AND REMANDED. Judge: RMG Authoring, Judge: SEH Concurring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8597457] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RP)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
            Filed order (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON) Plaintiffs-Appellees’ Motion for Leave to File Post-Submission Brief is DENIED. The court will not entertain further briefing in this submitted case. [8551667] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
              COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [8549720-2]. Submitted (ECF) Supplemental brief for review and filed Motion to file supplemental brief. Submitted by - Mr. Jose E. Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56376. Date of service: 03/13/2013. [8549999] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RY)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376, Appellant Maria L. Borbon in 11-56387, Appellants Thomas A. Carder and Glenda W. Schilleci in 11-56389, Appellant Steven C. Signer in 11-56400, Appellant Walter Ellingwood in 11-56440, Appellants Jimmy Green and Marcia Green in 11-56482 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/19/2013. [8518468] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF with searchable version, resent notice. 02/20/2013 by ASW] (GFC)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Charles M. Thompson, Esquire for - Thomas A. Carder in 11-56376. [8484326] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (CMT)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Robert Stephen Griffis for - Glenda W. Schilleci in 11-56376. [8483393] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RSG)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Mr. James Garrett Kendrick for Appellants Marcia Green and Jimmy Green and Charles Benjamin Nutley, Esquire for Appellants Marcia Green and Jimmy Green in 11-56482. [8483113] [11-56482, 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440] (JGK)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Steve A. Miller for - Steven C. Singer. [8482585]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 11−56387, 11−56389, 11−56397, 11−56400, 11−56440, 11−56482. Resent NDA. 01/22/2013 by RY] (SAM)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Ms. Cindy D. Hanson for Appellee Equifax Information Services LLC in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482. [8476487] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (CDH)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by John W. Davis for Appellant Walter Ellingwood and Mr. Steven Franklyn Helfand for Appellant Walter Ellingwood in 11-56440. [8471328] [11-56440, 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56482] (JWD)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Gregory Morgan, Esquire for Appellee Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56376. [8471103] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (MGM)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph Darrell Palmer for Appellant Maria L. Borbon in 11-56387. [8469748] [11-56387, 11-56376, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (JDP)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Stephen J. Newman, Esquire for Appellee Transunion, LLC in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482. [8469642] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SJN)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Allen Caddell for - Jose Hernandez, Robert Randall, Bertram Robison and Kathryn Pike in 11-56376, Attorney Mr. Michael Allen Caddell for Appellees Jose Hernandez, Robert Randall, Bertram Robison and Kathryn Pike in 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, Attorney Mr. Michael Allen Caddell for Appellees Robert Randall, Bertram Robison, Kathryn Pike and Jose Hernandez in 11-56440, 11-56482. [8467536] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (MAC)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael Allen Caddell for - Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56376, Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482. Date of service: 01/09/2013. [8467514] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (MAC)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Mr. George F. Carpinello for Appellants Christy Driver, Ivonne Martinez, Kelly J. Porter, Lisa Brisbane, Brenda Melendez, Ralph Michael Porter, Chester Carter, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Clifton C. Seale, III, Maria Falcon and Robert Radcliffe and Mr. Adam R. Shaw for Appellants Christy Driver, Ivonne Martinez, Kelly J. Porter, Lisa Brisbane, Brenda Melendez, Ralph Michael Porter, Chester Carter, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Clifton C. Seale, III, Maria Falcon and Robert Radcliffe in 11-56376. [8465929] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (GFC)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                          Notice of Oral Argument on MARCH Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8465159] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (LN)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                            Filed clerk order: The reply brief [81] submitted by Appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8333356] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                              Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The opposed motion of appellants Robert Radcliffe, Chester Carter, Maria Falcon, Clifton C. Seale, III, Arnold Lovell, Jr. (“White Plaintiffs”) to file an oversized reply brief is granted. The Clerk shall file the reply brief submitted by electronic filing on August 27, 2012 (entry #87). (Pro Mo) [8333309] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc. in 11-56440, 11-56482 Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Date of service: 09/06/2012 [8312001] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (KAR)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Filed (ECF) Errata to reply brief ([81]). Filed by Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376. Date of service: 09/06/2012 [8311756] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected entry to reflect content of filing, resent notice. 09/07/2012 by ASW] (GFC)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Filed (ECF) - Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56376, Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56387, 11-56389 response opposing motion (,motion to file oversized brief). Date of service: 09/05/2012. [8310752] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text 11-56482. Resent NDA. 09/05/2012 by RY] (MAC)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376. Date of service: 08/27/2012. [8301626] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: Removed parties from text, brief submitted by appellants only. Resent notice. 08/29/2012 by ASW] (GFC)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Filed clerk order: The reply brief [78] submitted by Charles W. Juntikka, Esquire is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8278267] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Charles W. Juntikka, Esquire. Date of service: 08/06/2012. [8277341]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 11-56376, 11-56440, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56400, 11-56482. Resent NDA. 08/07/2012 by RY] (GAB)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): The motion of appellants Robert Radcliffe, Chester Carter, Maria Falcon, Clifton C. Seale, III, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Christy Driver, Ivonne Martinez, Kelly J. Porter, Lisa Brisbane, Brenda Melendez and Ralph Michael Porter for an extension of time to file the consolidated reply brief is granted. The consolidated reply brief is due August 27, 2012. This order was issued prior to the expiration of time within which a response may be filed. See Fed. R. App. P. 27(b). [8265628] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56482 response to motion (,motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 07/26/2012. [8265535] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (MS)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376 Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 08/27/2012. Date of service: 07/25/2012. [8263276] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (GFC)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  Filed clerk order: The reply brief [62] submitted by Maria L. Borbon is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8260722] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    Filed clerk order: The answering brief [55] submitted by Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8260709] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Filed clerk order: The answering brief in 11-56387 [66] submitted by Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8260689] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        Filed clerk order: The answering brief in 11-56397 [65] submitted by Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8260672] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56387. Date of service: 06/21/2012. [8224238] [11-56387, 11-56376, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 11-56482. Resent NDA. 07/24/2012 by RY] (MS)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56397. Date of service: 06/21/2012. [8224228] [11-56397, 11-56376]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF with correct version (submitted separately by csl, resent notice. 06/25/2012 by ASW Edited: spread docket text to consolidated cases: 11-56440, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56400, 11-56482. Resent NDA. 07/24/2012 by RY] (MS)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) The opposed motion of appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall, and Bertram Robinson (hereinafter “Settling Plaintiffs”) to file an enlarged answering brief of 19,174 words is granted. The Clerk shall file the answering brief for Settling Plaintiffs submitted by electronic filing on June 21, 2012 (docket #63). The Clerk shall also file the answering briefs submitted by electronic filing on June 21, 2012 (docket #60 and #61). The opposed motion of appellants Robert Radcliffe, Chester Carter, Maria Falcon, Clifton C. Seale, III, and Arnold E. Lovell (hereinafter “White Objectors”) to strike Settling Plaintiffs’ extra answering briefs is denied. White Objectors’ unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the reply briefs is granted. The consolidated reply brief for White Objectors is due within 28 days after the date of this order. The rely brief for appellant Maria L. Borbon already received is ordered filed. (docket #70) The reply briefs for appellant Steven C. Signer and appellant Charles W. Juntikka are due within 14 days after the date of this order. (Pro Mo) [8258602] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                Filed (ECF) - Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56376, Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482 response supporting motion (,motion to strike portion or whole of document,motion to extend time to file reply, ,motion to file oversized brief). Date of service: 07/09/2012. [8242915] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (MS)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Maria L. Borbon in 11-56387. Date of service: 07/05/2012. [8239267] [11-56387, 11-56376, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (JDP)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376 Motion to strike whole of Appellees' Extra Answering Briefs, Motion to extend time to file a reply brief until 07/19/2012 and Response opposing motion (,motion to file oversized brief, , ). Date of service: 07/03/2012. [8237353] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: Changed text to reflect content of filing, resent notice. 07/06/2012 by ASW] (GFC)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The answering brief [53] submitted by Equifax Information Services LLC and Experian Information Solutions is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8227915] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (GV)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56397. Date of service: 06/21/2012. [8224252] [11-56397, 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (MS)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc. in 11-56440, 11-56482. Date of service: 06/21/2012. [8223388] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: replaced PDF with correctly signed version, resent notice. 06/25/2012 by ASW] (KAR)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) The motions of Objector-Appellant Walter Ellingwood in No. 11-56440, Objectors-Appellants Marcia Green and Jimmy Green in No. 11-56482, Objectors- Appellants Glenda W. Schilleci and Thomas A. Carder in No. 11-56389 (collectively, “Parties”) to reinstate appeals are granted. The Parties’ motions to reinstate are also construed as notices of joinder in the corrected opening brief filed March 2, 2012. The Parties are reminded, however, of the signature provisions of Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 32(d). The consolidated answering briefs remain due June 21, 2012. (Pro Mo) [8162534] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellants Thomas A. Carder and Glenda W. Schilleci in 11-56389 Motion to reinstate case after FRAP 42-1 dismissal. Date of service: 04/30/2012. [8157735] [11-56389, 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (CMT)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Walter Ellingwood in 11-56440, Appellants Jimmy Green and Marcia Green in 11-56482 Motion to reinstate case after FRAP 42-1 dismissal. Date of service: 04/25/2012. [8153896] [11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (JWD)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Filed amended clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): This order amends the April 25, 2012 order. The Court notes the following opening briefs for Objector-Appellant Walter Ellingwood in No. 11-56440, for Objector-Appellants Marcia Green and Jimmy Green in No. 11-56482, for Objectors-Appellants Glenda W. Schilleci and Thomas A. Carder in No. 11-56389 were due February 22, 2012. To date, no opening briefs or motions for extension of time to file the brief for appeal numbers 11- 56440, 11-56482, and 11-56389 have been filed. Nos. 11-56440, 11-56482, and 11-56389 only are therefore dismissed for lack of prosecution. A copy of this order served today on the district court shall become the mandate of this court. The joint motion of Defendants-Appellees Trans Union LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax Information Services LLC (collectively, “Defendants-Appellees”) and Plaintiffs-Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Bertram Robison and Robert Randall (collectively, “Plaintiffs-Appellees”) for a 45-day extension of time to file the answering briefs is granted. The consolidated answering briefs are due June 21, 2012. The consolidated optional reply briefs for the Radcliffe plaintiffs and all objectors are due within 14 days after service of the last-served consolidated answering brief. The motion of Defendants-Appellees and Plaintiffs-Appellees for an enlargement of words is denied. The denial is without prejudice to a renewed motion to submit an over-length answering brief accompanied by a single copy of the brief. See 9th Cir. R. 32-2. Defendants-Appellees and Plaintiffs-Appellees are reminded of the provisions of Circuit Rule 28-4. [8152697] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Filed order (Deputy Clerk: AMT) The Court notes the following opening briefs for Objector-Appellant Walter Ellingwood in No. 11-56440, for Objector-Appellants Marcia Green and Jimmy Green in No. 11-56482, for Objectors-Appellants Glenda W. Schilleci and Thomas A. Carder in No. 11-56389 were due February 22, 2012. To date, no opening briefs or motions for extension of time to file the brief for appeal numbers 11- 56440, 11-56482, and 11-56389 have been filed. Nos. 11-56440, 11-56482, and 11-56389 only are therefore dismissed for lack of prosecution. A copy of this order served today on the district court shall become the mandate of this court. The joint motion of Defendants-Appellees Trans Union LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax Information Services LLC (collectively, “Defendants-Appellees”) and Plaintiffs-Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Bertram Robison and Robert Randall (collectively, “Plaintiffs-Appellees”) for a 45-day extension of time to file the answering briefs is granted. The consolidated answering briefs are due May 7, 2012. The consolidated optional reply briefs for the Radcliffe plaintiffs and all objectors are due within 14 days after service of the last-served consolidated answering brief. The motion of Defendants-Appellees and Plaintiffs-Appellees for an enlargement of words is denied. The denial is without prejudice to a renewed motion to submit an over-length answering brief accompanied by a single copy of the brief. See 9th Cir. R. 32-2. Defendants-Appellees and Plaintiffs-Appellees are reminded of the provisions of Circuit Rule 28-4. [8152554] (SM)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Transunion, LLC in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482 Joint Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 06/21/2012. Date of service: 04/16/2012. [8141808] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SJN)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The opening brief [39] submitted by appellants in 11-56376 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8131345] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (LA)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) Appellants’ unopposed motion for leave to file an oversized brief of 18,188 words is granted. Appellants’ unopposed motion to file a corrected opening brief is granted. The Clerk shall file the opening brief submitted by electronic filing on March 2, 2012. The answering briefs are due within 30 days after the date of this order. The optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. (Pro Mo) [8131185] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Transunion, LLC in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482 response to motion (,motion to file oversized brief, ,motion to file substitute or corrected brief). Date of service: 03/22/2012. [8113563] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SJN)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LA): The previous order, filed on March 2, 2012, was issued in error and is hereby vacated. Plaintiffs-Appellants' motion to file an enlarged brief, filed on February 22, 2012, and motion to file a corrected brief, filed on February 28, 2012, are still pending and will be addressed in a future order. [8087758] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (LA)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The Corrected opening brief [39] submitted by the Appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8087606] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (GV)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  COURT ENTERED FILING: Submitted (ECF) Opening brief (Corrected) for review. Submitted by Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376. Date of service: 02/28/2012. [8087364] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (TW)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376 Motion to file substitute or corrected brief. Date of service: 02/28/2012. [8082457] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: Removed brief [39]. Resent NDA. 03/01/2012 by TW] (GFC)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The opening brief [32] submitted by Charles W. Juntikka, Esquire in 11-56397 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8081031] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Charles W. Juntikka, Esquire. Date of service: 02/22/2012. [8078244]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Filing spread to case numbers 11-56400, 11-56376, 11-56389, 11-56482, 11-56440, 11-56387. Resent NDA. 02/24/2012 by GD] (GAB)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Received Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III notification of filing Volume 6 of Excerpts of Record UNDER SEAL, with DC protective order attached. [8080895] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The opening brief [28] submitted by Maria L. Borbon in 11-56387 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. [8078585] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Maria L. Borbon in 11-56387. Date of service: 02/22/2012. [8078234] [11-56387, 11-56376, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376. Date of service: 02/22/2012. [8078078] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (GFC)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) The Court notes that the opening brief in No. 11-56400 for appellant Steve C. Signer was filed February 6, 2012. Appellants’ motion for reconsideration of the February 1, 2012 order is granted. The amended briefing schedule is as follows: the opening briefs for the Radcliffe plaintiffs and objectors in No. 11-56376 and for the objectors in Nos. 11- 56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56440, and 11-56482 are due February 22, 2012. The answering briefs are due March 23, 2012. The reply briefs for the Radcliffe plaintiffs and all objectors are due within 14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. In view of the complexity of the briefing schedule, no telephonic extensions of time in which to file briefs pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a) will be granted. (Pro Mo) [8071773] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellee Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc. in 11-56440, 11-56482 Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of Stephanie Mazepa as Counsel. Date of service: 02/14/2012. [8068813] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] --[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect the content of the filing. Resent NDA. 02/14/2012 by DB] (KAR)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The opening brief [20] submitted by Steven C. Signer in 11-56400 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. [8058204] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (LA)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Steven C. Signer in 11-56400. Date of service: 02/05/2012. [8056849] [11-56400, 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SAM)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376 motion for reconsideration of non-dispositive Clerk Order of 02/01/2012. Date of service: 02/02/2012. [8055343] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (GFC)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): Appellants’ unopposed motion to consolidate is granted. Nos. 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, and 11-56482 shall proceed as consolidated appeals. The opening brief for consolidated Nos. 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11- 56397, and 11-56400 remains due February 6, 2012. Appellants are reminded that the motion has to demonstrate extraordinary circumstances before the granting of a written motion for a continuance after a telephonic request. The amended briefing schedule is as follows: the opening brief for consolidated Nos. 56440 and 56482 is due February 22, 2012. The consolidated answering brief is due March 23, 2012. The consolidated optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the consolidated answering brief. [8052473] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TAH): The appellants’ joint motion to consolidate case Nos. 11-56440 and 11-56482 and to amend the briefing schedule is granted. The cases are consolidated. The consolidated opening brief is due February 22, 2012. The answering briefs are due March 23, 2012. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. [8050643] [11-56440, 11-56482] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellants Jimmy Green and Marcia Green Motion to consolidate cases 11-56482 and 11-56440. Date of service: 01/17/2012. [8034562] (JGK)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Terminated Shirin Nassi for Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56376, Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56387, Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56389, Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56397, Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56400, Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56409, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. in 11-56440 and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. in 11-56482 [7958277] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56409, 11-56440, 11-56482] (PH)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Katie Richardson for Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7956560] (KAR)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): Case not selected for mediation program. Counsel interested in obtaining settlement assistance or program information should contact the Mediation Office. [7932657] (KKW)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Filed order MEDIATION (VLS):This case is under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Within 14 days of the date of this order, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform Roxane G. Ashe, Circuit Mediator, in writing, by fax at (415) 355-8566, of their clients’ views on whether: the case is appropriate for settlement discussions or mediation; the court can accommodate ongoing settlement discussions or otherwise facilitate settlement of the dispute; and/or the court should schedule a telephonic conference to discuss settlement. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, from the other parties in the case. This communication shall not be served on the opposing party and shall not be filed with the court. For more detailed information about the Mediation Program and its procedures generally, please see Mediation Program web site: www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect pending the determination whether the case will be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. [7920776] (KKW)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellee Equifax Information Services LLC Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of C.E. Bertschi as Counsel for Equifax Information Services LLC in this appeal. Date of service: 09/20/2011 [7899467] (CEB)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellants Jimmy Green and Marcia Green Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/16/2011. [7897329] (JGK)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Filed order MEDIATION (EPM): The Court of Appeals’ records do not indicate that appellants have filed a Mediation Questionnaire in accordance with Circuit Rule 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing of this order, appellants shall: (a) file a Mediation Questionnaire (available on the court's website, www.ca9.uscourts.gov); (b) dismiss the appeal voluntarily pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b); or (c) show cause in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [7887230] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Shirin Nassi for Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Date of service: 09/08/2011. [7886126] (SN)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Received Appellants' Representation Statement. Served on 08/18/2011. [7877733] (JN)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/07/2011. Transcript ordered by 09/12/2011. Transcript due 12/12/2011. Appellants Jimmy Green, Marcia Green opening brief due 01/23/2012. Appellees Chester Carter, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Maria Falcon, Jose Hernandez, Arnold Lovell Jr., Kathryn Pike, Robert Radcliffe, Robert Randall, Bertram Robison, Clifton C. Seale III, Transunion, LLC answering brief due 02/22/2012. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7877701] (JN)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?