The Power of Few, LLC v. Does 1-26
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-02380

Tags
Last Updated October 10, 2016 at 4:38 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (jhawk, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: 12/26/2013 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal without prejudice in this case on 12/24/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: 12/24/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The (Kannady, Scott)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Status Report
        Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Kannady, Scott)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: 11/12/2013 Terminated Party
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: 11/11/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: 11/11/2013 Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Status Report
                Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Kannady, Scott)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Status Report
                  STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Kannady, Scott)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                    MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a status report within five (5) days of the date of this order, then on the tenth day of each month thereafter, informing the Court of the status of service in this case. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/11/2013. (mehcd)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Status Report
                      STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Kannady, Scott)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part [3] Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/05/13.(jjhsl, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                          MEMORANDUM regarding [3] MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Power of Few, LLC, The. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/5/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (5) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/5/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Summons IssuedCourt Filing
                              SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: # (1) Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
                                REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (dbera, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Case Assigned to JudgeCourt Filing
                                  Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Motion to Expedite
                                    MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff The Power of Few, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B, # (2) Exhibit A)(Kannady, Scott)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Kannady, Scott)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT against Does 1-26 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3517445), filed by The Power of Few, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Summons, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 125 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?