Hamdy Abou-Hussein v. Raymond Mabus, Jr., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 13-5251

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 3, 2016 at 11:06 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 1470 - Civil (RICO)
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207536727 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
RECORD MATERIAL [1460730] filed by Hamdy Alex Abou-Hussein [Service Date: 10/11/2013 ] [13-5251]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207536724 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE FILED [1460729] by Hamdy Alex Abou-Hussein of address change. [Service Date: 10/11/2013 ] [13-5251]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207531198 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
      CLERK'S ORDER filed [1457569] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/21/2013. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 10/21/2013. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/21/2013. APPELLANT underlying decision due 10/21/2013. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 10/21/2013. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 10/21/2013. APPELLANT transcript status report due 10/21/2013. APPELLANT procedural motions due 10/21/2013. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 11/04/2013; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 10/21/2013. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 10/21/2013. APPELLEE procedural motions due 10/21/2013. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 11/04/2013. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [13-5251]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207530537 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE [1457189] filed from Clerk, District Court for payment of docketing fee [Case Number 13-5251: Fee Paid] [13-5251]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207522926 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
          CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1452872] RECEIVED from Abou Hussein [signed for on 08/17/2013] for order [1451069-2] sent to Appellant Hamdy Alex Abou-Hussein [13-5251]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207519797 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1451066] directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of $455 docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed IFP in district court due 09/11/2013, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [13-5251]
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 65 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?