Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Vizio, Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00522
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 7:02 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
No Logo Vizio, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Vizio, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas Whitelaw & Tyler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Joseph Kolegraff +1 949 679 6400 +1 949 679 6405 wkolegraff@twtlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Edward Thomas +1 949 679 6400 +1 949 679 6405 jthomas@twtlaw.com
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant VIZIO are hereby, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All counterclaims and defenses of Defendant Vizio against Norman are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
      ANSWER to 3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaims by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vizio, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
          ANSWER to 2 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Vizio, Inc..(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
            COMPLAINT against Vizio, Inc., filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendant Vizio, Inc. from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 93 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?