Unknown
Bankruptcy Case California Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 13, 2016 at 6:09 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: 11/20/1996 Order Approving Trustees Report of No Distribution and Closing Case
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: 1/23/1996 Court Certificate of Mailing re Discharge of Debtor, Chapter 7 - BNC
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/16/1995 Chapter 7 Trustees Report of No Distribution
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/1/1995, Entered: 11/3/1995 Certificate Of Service.
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/21/1995, Entered: 9/26/1995
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 3 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?