Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Trustees of Boston University et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-11833
District Judge Nancy Gertner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 11, 2016 at 2:22 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa M. D'Alelio +1 617 267 2300 +1 617 267 8288 mmdalelio@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caryn L. Daum +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cdaum@rc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Paul Varga +1 860 275 8230 +1 860 275 8299 gvarga@rc.com
No Logo American Plumbing & Heating Corporation, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Ayer Sales, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE, Counter-Claimant
No Logo CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Hdr Architecture, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Ipex Usa LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Mccarthy Building Companies, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Rectorseal Corporation, Counter-Claimant
No Logo SMITH CARTER, P.C., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Trustees Of Boston University, Counter-Claimant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo American Plumbing & Heating Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch & Lynch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Pursley +1 508 230 2500 +1 508 230 2510 tpursley@lynchlynch.com
No Logo Mccarthy Building Companies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Collora LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Cloherty +1 617 371 1000 +1 617 371 1037 dcloherty@dwyercollora.com
No Logo Trustees Of Boston University, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine C Deneke +1 617 832 3025 +1 617 832 7000 cdeneke@foleyhoag.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Follett +1 617 832 1244 +1 617 832 7000 jfollett@foleyhoag.com
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael C. McLaughlin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael C. McLaughlin +1 617 227 2275 +1 617 722 9999 Michael@michaelcMcLaughlin.com
No Logo Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture, Defendant
No Logo American Plumbing & Heating Corporation, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Ayer Sales, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE, Counter-Defendant
No Logo CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Hdr Architecture, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Ipex Usa LLC, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Mccarthy Building Companies, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo SMITH CARTER, P.C., Counter-Defendant
No Logo TMJV, a Joint Venture, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Paul Varga +1 860 275 8230 +1 860 275 8299 gvarga@rc.com
No Logo Trustees Of Boston University, Counter-Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture, Counter-Defendant
No Logo American Plumbing & Heating Corporation, Cross-Claimant
No Logo Ayer Sales, Inc., Cross-Claimant
No Logo CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE, Cross-Claimant
No Logo CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., Cross-Claimant
No Logo Hdr Architecture, Inc., Cross-Claimant
No Logo Ipex Usa LLC, Cross-Claimant
No Logo Mccarthy Building Companies, Inc., Cross-Claimant
No Logo SMITH CARTER, P.C., Cross-Claimant
No Logo Trustees Of Boston University, Cross-Claimant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Cross-Claimant
No Logo Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture, Cross-Claimant
No Logo American Plumbing & Heating Corporation, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Ayer Sales, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Ipex Usa LLC, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Mccarthy Building Companies, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Rectorseal Corporation, Cross-Defendant
No Logo TMJV, a Joint Venture, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Trustees Of Boston University, Cross-Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture, Cross-Defendant
No Logo American Plumbing & Heating Corporation, Third Party Plaintiff
No Logo Ayer Sales, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff
No Logo CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE, Third Party Plaintiff
No Logo CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., Third Party Plaintiff
No Logo Hdr Architecture, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff
No Logo Mccarthy Building Companies, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff
No Logo Trustees Of Boston University, Third Party Plaintiff
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Third Party Plaintiff
No Logo Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture, Third Party Plaintiff
No Logo Ayer Sales, Inc., Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The McCormack Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric L. Brodie +1 617 951 2929 +1 617 951 2672 EBrodie@mccormackfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David T. Mitrou +1 617 951 2929 +1 617 951 2672 dmitrou@mccormackfirm.com
No Logo CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE, Third Party Defendant
No Logo CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donovan Hatem, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Hatem +1 617 406 4500 dhatem@donovanhatem.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn E. Mayforth +1 617 406 4500 kmayforth@donovanhatem.com
No Logo Hdr Architecture, Inc., Third Party Defendant
No Logo Ipex Usa LLC, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric M. Gold +1 617 310 5226 +1 617 897 0936 eric.gold@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Murphy +1 617 310 6063 +1 617 310 6001 murphyp@gtlaw.com
No Logo Rectorseal Corporation, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Valerie N. Doble +1 617 213 7035 +1 617 213 7001 vdoble@hinshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maynard M. Kirpalani +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 maynard.kirpalani@wilsonelser.com
No Logo SMITH CARTER, P.C., Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bonner Kiernan Trebach & Crociata, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L. Jefford +1 800 840 5087 +1 860 246 3727 cjefford@bonnerkiernan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Kiernan +1 617 426 3900 +1 617 426 0380 jkiernan@bktc.net
No Logo Hemisphere Engineering, Inc., Cross Defendant
No Logo Hemisphere Engineering, U.S., Inc., Cross Defendant
No Logo Hemisphere Engineering, Inc., Fourth Party Defendant
No Logo Hemisphere Engineering, U.S., Inc., Fourth Party Defendant
No Logo Hemisphere Engineering, Inc., ThirdParty Defendant
No Logo Hemisphere Engineering, U.S., Inc., ThirdParty Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
  Entries (126) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Reopen Case for limited purpose of dismissal by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation of Dismissal)(Deneke, Catherine) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to November 23, 2009 to Extend Order of Dismissal by Trustees of Boston University.(Deneke, Catherine) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to November 13, 2009 to Extend Order of Dismissal by Trustees of Boston University.(Deneke, Catherine) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to November 6, 2009 to Extend Order of Dismissal by Trustees of Boston University.(Deneke, Catherine) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to October 30, 2009 to Extend Order of Dismissal by Trustees of Boston University.(Deneke, Catherine) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to October 23, 2009 to Extend Order of Dismissal by Trustees of Boston University.(Deneke, Catherine) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to October 19, 2009 to Extend Order of Dismissal by Trustees of Boston University.(Deneke, Catherine) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to September 4, 2009 to File Initial Disclosures by Trustees of Boston University.(Deneke, Catherine) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                      Response by American Plumbing & Heating Corporation to 96 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, with Counterclaim to Smith Carter, P.C.. (Pursley, Thomas) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to 96 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, by Ayer Sales Inc..(Brodie, Eric) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                          ANSWER to 96 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against SMITH CARTER, P.C. by IPEX USA LLC. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to 88 Crossclaim by TMJV, a Joint Venture, Turner Construction Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc..(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to 96 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, of Smith Carter P.C. by Trustees of Boston University.(Deneke, Catherine) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to 96 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, by McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., TMJV, a Joint Venture, Turner Construction Company.(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                  ANSWER to 88 Answer to Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Ayer Sales Inc..(Brodie, Eric) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                    ANSWER to 88 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC., CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE by IPEX USA LLC.(Murphy, Paul) Modified on 8/5/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
                                      RectorSeal Corporation's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, and Counterclaim to Cross-Claim of CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C.; HDR Architecture, Inc.; and CUH2A Smith Carter, a Joint Venture ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC., CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE by RectorSeal Corporation.(Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
                                        RectorSeal Corporation's Answers, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand to Amended Cross-Claim of IPEX USA LLC ANSWER to 100 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, by RectorSeal Corporation.(Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
                                          RectorSeal Corporation's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, and Counterclaim to Cross-Claim of Smith Carter, P.C. ANSWER to 96 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against SMITH CARTER, P.C. by RectorSeal Corporation.(Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                            ANSWER to 88 Answer to Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, of CUH2A Smith Carter, A Joint Venture by Trustees of Boston University.(Deneke, Catherine) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                              ANSWER to 98 Crossclaim of Turner Construction Company, et al. by Trustees of Boston University.(Deneke, Catherine) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER to 96 Answer to Crossclaim with COUNTERCLAIM against CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC., CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE by American Plumbing & Heating Corporation. (The clerk has re-docketed this answer to use correct event.)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                  DISREGARD, FILED WRONG, PLEASE SEE DOCKET ENTRY 103 Answer Response by American Plumbing & Heating Corporation to the Crossclaims of CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, Inc., HDR Architecture, Inc. and CUH2A Smith Carter, A Joint Venture, with Counterclaim. (Pursley, Thomas) Modified on 7/21/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                    ANSWER to 98 Amended Crossclaim by American Plumbing & Heating Corporation. (This is a corrected/duplicate entry of docket entry 97 .)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                      ANSWER to 99 Amended Third Party Complaint, with AMENDED CROSSCLAIM against RectorSeal Corporation, Ayer Sales Inc., and AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Turner Construction Company, Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc. by IPEX USA LLC.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                        AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ayer Sales Inc., IPEX USA LLC, RectorSeal Corporation, filed by TMJV, a Joint Venture, Turner Construction Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc.. (See docket entry 79 for original filing. The clerk has refiled the document to correct the docket.)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                          AMENDED CROSSCLAIM against Trustees of Boston University, American Plumbing & Heating Corporation, filed by TMJV, a Joint Venture, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture. (Refiled to correct docket.)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                            AMENDED DOCUMENT by American Plumbing & Heating Corporation. Amendment to 79 Amended Document Answer of APH to Turner/McCarthy 's First Amended Crossclaim. (Pursley, Thomas) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                              ANSWER to 28 Answer to Third Party Complaint,, Crossclaim,,,, CROSSCLAIM against Turner Construction Company, TMJV, a Joint Venture, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., American Plumbing & Heating Corporation, IPEX USA LLC, RectorSeal Corporation, COUNTERCLAIM against Trustees of Boston University, Ayer Sales Inc. by SMITH CARTER, P.C..(Jefford, Christopher) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 15, 2009 to File Responsive Pleading to 28 Ayer Sales' 4th Party Complaint by SMITH CARTER, P.C.(Forth Party Defendant), SMITH CARTER, P.C..(Jefford, Christopher) Modified on 7/14/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by SMITH CARTER, P.C.(Forth Party Defendant), SMITH CARTER, P.C..(Jefford, Christopher) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SMITH CARTER, P.C.(Forth Party Defendant), SMITH CARTER, P.C.. (Jefford, Christopher) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE by SMITH CARTER, P.C.(Forth Party Defendant), SMITH CARTER, P.C. re 90 Notice of Appearance of John Kiernan (Jefford, Christopher) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3) by CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C.(Fourth Party Defendant), HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC.(Fourth Party Defendant), CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE(Forth Party Defendant), CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC., CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE.(Mayforth, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L. Jefford on behalf of SMITH CARTER, P.C.(Forth Party Defendant), SMITH CARTER, P.C. (Jefford, Christopher) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C.(Fourth Party Defendant), HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC.(Fourth Party Defendant), CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC.. (Mayforth, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Fifth Party Plaintiffs ANSWER to 28 Answer to Third Party Complaint,, Crossclaim,,, 14 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,, ANSWER to 28 Answer to Third Party Complaint,, Crossclaim,,, 14 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Hemisphere Engineering, U.S., Inc., Hemisphere Engineering, Inc., CROSSCLAIM against Hemisphere Engineering, Inc., Hemisphere Engineering, U.S., Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Ayer Sales Inc., Trustees of Boston University by CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C.(Fourth Party Defendant), HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC.(Fourth Party Defendant), CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE(Forth Party Defendant), CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC., CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE.(Mayforth, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Hatem on behalf of CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE(Forth Party Defendant), CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE (Hatem, David) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn E. Mayforth on behalf of CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE(Forth Party Defendant), CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE (Mayforth, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION Pursuant to L.R. 16.1(D)(3). (McLaughlin, Michael) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION Pursuant to L.R. 16.1(D)(3). (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION Pursuant to L.R. 16.1(D)(3). (Brodie, Eric) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) by Trustees of Boston University. (Deneke, Catherine) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine C. Deneke on behalf of Trustees of Boston University (Deneke, Catherine) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION Pursuant to L.R. 16.1(D)(3). (Daum, Caryn) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                AMENDED DOCUMENT by TMJV, a Joint Venture, Turner Construction Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc.. First Amended Cross-Claims and Third Party Complaint. (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) by American Plumbing & Heating Corporation.(Pursley, Thomas) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION Local Rule 16.1(D)(3) Certification of Rectorseal Corporation. (Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) by IPEX USA LLC.(Gold, Eric) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        JOINT STATEMENT of counsel and Proposed Pretrial Schedule. (Daum, Caryn) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/17/2009 to File Answer as to 79 First Amended Third Party Complaint of Turner, McCarthy, and TMJV by IPEX USA LLC.(Gold, Eric) Modified on 7/14/2009 to create correct linkage (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 15, 2009 to File Responsive Pleadings by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CUH2A Summons, # 2 Exhibit HDR Architecture Summons, # 3 Exhibit Smith Carter Summons, # 4 Exhibit CUH2A Smith Carter Joint Venture Summons)(Follett, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/29/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn E. Mayforth on behalf of CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C.(Fourth Party Defendant), HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC.(Fourth Party Defendant), CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC. (Mayforth, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RECTORSEAL CORPORATION'S ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND JURY DEMAND TO FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT OF TURNER, MCCARTHY AND TMJV ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by RectorSeal Corporation.(Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ayer Sales Inc.. SMITH CARTER, P.C. waiver sent on 5/14/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. (Brodie, Eric) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ayer Sales Inc.. CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE waiver sent on 5/28/2009, answer due 7/27/2009. (Brodie, Eric) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 64 Answer to Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,,,, by IPEX USA LLC.(Murphy, Paul) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner. (Molloy, Maryellen) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 3, 2009 to File Answer re 64 Answer to Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,,,, of Rectorseal Corp. by IPEX USA LLC.(Gold, Eric) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend 15 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, by McCarthy Building Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 39 Answer to Crossclaim,, Counterclaim,,, 38 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, 40 Answer to Crossclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against IPEX USA LLC by RectorSeal Corporation.(Kloecker, Valerie) Modified on 4/27/2009 to modify docket text (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 55 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of RectorSeal Corporation by Turner Construction Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., TMJV, a Joint Venture.(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 14 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,, of the Trustees of Boston University by Turner Construction Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., TMJV, a Joint Venture.(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 16 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, of American Heating and Plumbing Corporation by TMJV, a Joint Venture, Turner Construction Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc..(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 38 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, by Turner Construction Company, TMJV, a Joint Venture.(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Ayer Sales, Inc.'s ANSWER to 58 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of RectorSeal Corporation by Ayer Sales Inc..(Brodie, Eric) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to Cross-Claims of Ayer Sales, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Ayer Sales Inc. by RectorSeal Corporation. (Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to Third-Party Complaint of American Plumbing & Heating Corporation, COUNTERCLAIM against American Plumbing & Heating Corporation by RectorSeal Corporation. (Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION For RectorSeal Corporation to File Amended Pleadings by RectorSeal Corporation. (Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ANSWER to Third Party Complaint of Turner, McCarthy and TMJV, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against TMJV, a Joint Venture, Turner Construction Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc. by RectorSeal Corporation. (Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Ayer Sales, Inc.'s ANSWER to 44 Answer to Crossclaim, Counterclaim of RectorSeal Corporation by Ayer Sales Inc..(Brodie, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Ayer Sales, Inc.'s ANSWER to 39 Answer to Crossclaim,, Counterclaim,,, of IPEX USA, LLC by Ayer Sales Inc..(Brodie, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Ayer Sales, Inc.'s ANSWER to 38 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, of IPEX USA, LLC by Ayer Sales Inc..(Brodie, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ayer Sales Inc.. (Brodie, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 32 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Varga, Gregory) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            American Plumbing & Heating Corporation ANSWER to 43 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim of RectorSeal Corporation by American Plumbing & Heating Corporation.(Pursley, Thomas) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              American Plumbing & Heating Corporation ANSWER to 39 Answer to Crossclaim,, Counterclaim,,, of IPEX USA LLC by American Plumbing & Heating Corporation.(Pursley, Thomas) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ayer Sales Inc.. HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC. waiver sent on 3/25/2009, answer due 5/26/2009. (Brodie, Eric) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ayer Sales Inc.. CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C. waiver sent on 3/25/2009, answer due 5/26/2009. (Brodie, Eric) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RectorSeal Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Capital Southwest Corporation, Corporate Parent Capital Southwest Corporation for RectorSeal Corporation.. (Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 28 Answer to Third Party Complaint,, Crossclaim,,, of Ayer Sales, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Ayer Sales Inc. by RectorSeal Corporation.(Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 20 Third Party Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against American Plumbing & Heating Corporation by RectorSeal Corporation.(Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 15 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against TMJV, a Joint Venture, Turner Construction Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc. by RectorSeal Corporation.(Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            American Plumbing & Heating Corporation's ANSWER to 33 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim of Ayer Sales, Inc. by American Plumbing & Heating Corporation.(Pursley, Thomas) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 28 Answer to Third Party Complaint,, Crossclaim,,, of Ayer Sales, Inc., CROSSCLAIM against RectorSeal Corporation by IPEX USA LLC.(Gold, Eric) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 33 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim of American Plumbing & Heating, CROSSCLAIM against Ayer Sales Inc., RectorSeal Corporation, COUNTERCLAIM against American Plumbing & Heating Corporation by IPEX USA LLC.(Gold, Eric) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 15 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, of Turner and TMJV, CROSSCLAIM against Ayer Sales Inc., RectorSeal Corporation, COUNTERCLAIM against Turner Construction Company, Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture by IPEX USA LLC.(Gold, Eric) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IPEX USA LLC. (Gold, Eric) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 6, 2009 to File Response/Reply to Amended Counterclaims by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Daum, Caryn) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Eric L. Brodie on behalf of Ayer Sales Inc., Ayer Sales Inc. (Brodie, Eric) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 14 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,, by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Daum, Caryn) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 20 Third Party Complaint of American Plumbing & Heating, CROSSCLAIM against RectorSeal Corporation, IPEX USA LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against American Plumbing & Heating Corporation by Ayer Sales Inc..(Mitrou, David) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America by Turner Construction Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture. (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Cloherty on behalf of McCarthy Building Companies, Inc. (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Hatem on behalf of CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C.(Fourth Party Defendant), HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC.(Fourth Party Defendant), CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC. (Hatem, David) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M. Gold on behalf of IPEX USA LLC (Gold, Eric) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 15 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (4th Party Complaint) against CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC., SMITH CARTER, P.C., CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE, CROSSCLAIM against IPEX USA LLC, RectorSeal Corporation by Ayer Sales Inc..(Mitrou, David) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie N. Kloecker on behalf of RectorSeal Corporation (Kloecker, Valerie) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Trustees of Boston University's ANSWER to 15 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, by Trustees of Boston University.(Follett, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 27, 2009 to File Response/Reply as to 20 Third Party Complaint by IPEX USA LLC.(Murphy, Paul) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Murphy on behalf of IPEX USA LLC (Murphy, Paul) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                American Plumbing & Heating Corporation's ANSWER to 15 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, Turner Construction Company, Inc., McCarthy Building Companies, Inc. and Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture by American Plumbing & Heating Corporation.(Pursley, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 27, 2009 to file a responsive pleading by RectorSeal Corporation.(Kirpalani, Maynard) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 25, 2009 to For Plaintiff to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Counterclaims by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Daum, Caryn) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT of American Plumbing & Heating Corporation against Ayer Sales Inc., IPEX USA LLC, RectorSeal Corporation, filed by American Plumbing & Heating Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pursley, Thomas) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Third Party Summons Issued as to Ayer Sales Inc., IPEX USA LLC, RectorSeal Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Third Party Summons Issued as to CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC., SMITH CARTER, P.C., CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Plumbing & Heating Corporation. (Pursley, Thomas) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              American Plumbing & Heating Corporation ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Turner Construction Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture by American Plumbing & Heating Corporation.(Pursley, Thomas) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Turner Construction Company, Inc., McCarthy Companies, Inc., and Turner McCarthy Joint Venture's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ayer Sales Inc., IPEX USA LLC, RectorSeal Corporation, CROSSCLAIM against Trustees of Boston University, American Plumbing & Heating Corporation, COUNTERCLAIM against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America by Turner Construction Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture.(McLaughlin, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2009: # 1 Signed Main Document) (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against CUH2A, Architects Engineers Planners, P.C., HDR ARCHITECTURE, INC., SMITH CARTER, P.C., CUH2A SMITH CARTER, A JOINT VENTURE, CROSSCLAIM against Turner Construction Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture, COUNTERCLAIM against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America by Trustees of Boston University.(Follett, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Third MOTION for Extension of Time to February 2, 2009 to File Answer Complaint for Declaratory Relief by Turner Construction Company.(McLaughlin, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/2/09 to File Answer to Complaint for Declaratory Relief by Turner Construction Company.(McLaughlin, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture served on 11/6/2008, answer due 11/26/2008. (Daum, Caryn) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture served on 11/5/2008, answer due 11/25/2008. (Daum, Caryn) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Turner Construction Company served on 11/6/2008, answer due 11/26/2008. (Daum, Caryn) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed McCarthy Building Companies, Inc. served on 11/5/2008, answer due 11/25/2008. (Daum, Caryn) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Trustees of Boston University served on 11/6/2008, answer due 11/26/2008. (Daum, Caryn) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed American Plumbing & Heating Corporation served on 11/6/2008, answer due 11/26/2008. (Daum, Caryn) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Extension of Time to December 3, 2008 to File Answer to Complaint for Declaratory Relief by Turner Construction Company.(McLaughlin, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. McLaughlin on behalf of Turner Construction Company (McLaughlin, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.. (Daum, Caryn) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Trustees of Boston University, Turner Construction Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., Turner/McCarthy, A Joint Venture, American Plumbing & Heating Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against all defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 01010000000002172965, filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Policy, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daum, Caryn) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?