TCYK, LLC v. JOHN DOES 1-9
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-14322

Tags
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 7:16 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ann Galloway

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Nicoletti +1 248 203 7800 +1 248 928 7051 pauljnicoletti@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Altruis Benefit Consulting, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edmund S. Yee +1 248 952 5100 +1 248 952 5138 eyee@mckelviedeluca.com
No Logo Craig Risch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Craig Risch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig Risch
No Logo JOHN DOES 1-9, Defendant
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC (Nicoletti, Paul) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Voluntary Dismissal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
          STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Altruis Benefit Consulting (Yee, Edmund) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2014 04:00 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman *SEE NOTICE FOR FURTHER INFORMATION* (DTof) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
              ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Altruis Benefit Consulting. (Yee, Edmund) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund S. Yee on behalf of Altruis Benefit Consulting. (Yee, Edmund) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Altruis Benefit Consulting waiver sent on 3/26/2014, answer due 5/27/2014. (Nicoletti, Paul) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Order on Motion to ExtendCourt Filing
                    ORDER Granting Plaintiff's [17] Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Doe Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (FMos)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                      ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: [17] MOTION TO EXTEND Time to Serve Defendant filed by TCYK, LLC. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/23/2014, Entered: 2/23/2014 Motion to Extend
                        MOTION TO EXTEND Time to Serve Defendant by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - ISP Communication) (Nicoletti, Paul)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                          NOTICE by TCYK, LLC re Certificate of Service, [13] Notice of Hearing on Motion, Certificate of Service, [10] MOTION to Quash, [11] Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge, Certificate of Service, [12] Notice of Hearing on Motion NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO JOHN DOE #8 ONLY (CRAIG RISCH) (IP 68.61.232.132) (Nicoletti, Paul)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC as to John Doe #4 Only, NOTICE by TCYK, LLC (Nicoletti, Paul)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC as to John Doe #5 Only, NOTICE by TCYK, LLC (Nicoletti, Paul)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                NOTICE OF HEARING on [10] MOTION to Quash. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2014 at 9:00 AM [TIME CHANGE ONLY] before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand in ANN ARBOR, MI (FMos)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE OF HEARING on [10] MOTION to Quash. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2014 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand in ANN ARBOR, MI (FMos)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: [10] MOTION to Quash filed by Craig Risch. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 Motion to Quash
                                      MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena by Craig Risch. (DWor)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                        ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's [6] Motion for Leave to Serve Third-Party Supboenas Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (FMos)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: [6] MOTION for Leave to File TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENAS PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE filed by TCYK, LLC. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: 11/12/2013 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
                                            STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by TCYK, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit TCYK Org) (Nicoletti, Paul)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: 11/7/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                              MOTION for Leave to File TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENAS PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits Memorandum of Law, # (2) Exhibit A - IMDB Registration, # (3) Exhibit B - Movie News, # (4) Exhibit C - New York Times Article, # (5) Exhibit D - Declaration of Darren Griffin) (Nicoletti, Paul)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: 11/7/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER Requiring Further Response, ( Response due by 11/12/2013) - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
                                                  STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by TCYK, LLC (Nicoletti, Paul)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER Requiring Disclosure of the Identities of Each Member of the TCYK, LLC. ( Responses due by 11/1/2013.) - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Nicoletti on behalf of TCYK, LLC. (Nicoletti, Paul)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed by TCYK, LLC against JOHN DOES 1-9 with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Copyright Catalog, # (2) Exhibit B-IP file Hash Tags) (Nicoletti, Paul) Modified on 10/11/2013 (KKra). [FEE PAID RECEIPT NO. 0645-4331066]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 98 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?