3R Connect Creative Management Agency, LLC et al v. Fiorello et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-02762
District Judge Alison J. Nathan, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Alison J. Nathan
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 7:51 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo 3R Connect Creative Management Agency, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Hoguet Newman Regal & Kenney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Patrick Curley +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 jcurley@hnrklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Malcom Reice +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 rreice@hnrklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Abigail Shaw +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 sshaw@hnrklaw.com
No Logo 3R Connect Systems, LLC, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Christian Fiorello, Defendant

Represented by The Basil Law Group, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert James Basil +1 917 512 3066 +1 831 536 1075 robertjbasil@rjbasil.com
No Logo Dennis O'Connor, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Timeline
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS: the parties having amicably resolved all claims between them, hereby stipulate and agree that this action shall he dismissed, with prejudice, and without fees or costs being awarded to either Plaintiffs or Defendants as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/23/2013) (cd) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by 3R Connect Systems, LLC, 3R Connect Creative Management Agency, LLC.(Shaw, Susan) Modified on 5/23/2013 (jno). (Entered: 05/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16: This action is scheduled for an initial case management conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a), on Friday, May 31, 2013, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 17-A, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York as further set forth in this order., ( Initial Conference set for 5/31/2013 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/16/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/8/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/8/2013 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/10/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a DECISION proceeding held on 5/9/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: DECISION held on 5/9/2013 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/10/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Robert J. Basil dated 5/9/2013 re: Accordingly, Defendants respectfully request that this Court terminate the Preliminary Injunction hearing based upon the bad faith misconduct of Plaintiffs' counsel and to consider such sanctions that the Court deems appropriate. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of this and the attached letter in the above captioned case. Both parties are admonished that any additional unprofessional or discourteous conduct may result in sanctions, as too will any additional violations of this Court's Individual Practices, to include Rule 1.A, which provides that "correspondence between counsel shall not be sent to the Court." Defendants' request is denied. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/13/2013) (cd) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/13/2013) (cd) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: On May 9, 2013, the Court held a telephone conference with the parties in the above captioned case. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction against Defendants is DENIED and the temporary restraining order issued by this Court on April 25, 2013, is hereby lifted. By separate order, this case will be referred for general pretrial to Magistrate Judge Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/13/2013) (cd) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Christian Fiorello, Dennis O'Connor, Christian James-Creative Management Agency LLC, Christian James, Ltd. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by 3R Connect Systems, LLC, 3R Connect Creative Management Agency, LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by 3R Connect Creative Management Agency, LLC, 3R Connect Systems, LLC.(cd) (sdi). (Entered: 05/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: A preliminary injunction hearing in this matter has been scheduled for 10:00am on May 8, 2013. Briefing on the application for a preliminary injunction is now complete. At the conference in this matter on April 25, 2013, Plaintiffs asserted that they would call two witnesses at the hearing: Mr. Joshi and Mr. Haslani. Defendants asserted that they would call two to three witnesses: Mr. Fiorello, Mr. O'Connor, and possibly an unidentified employee. In light of the parties' submissions and their positions at the conference on April 25, 2013, it is hereby ORDERED that by 12:00pm on May 7, 2013, each party shall submit by email pursuant to Rule l.A of this Court's Individual Rules in Civil Cases, (nathannysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov), a letter indicating: 1. For Plaintiffs, whether they intend to call Mr. Joshi and/or Mr. Haslani; 2. For Defendants, whether they intend to call Mr. Fiorello and/or Mr. O'Connor, and whether they intend to call an employee and, if they do, to identify that employee by name, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/6/2013) (cd) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 2 Order to Show Cause,, with Reply Affidavit and Exhibits. Document filed by 3R Connect Creative Management Agency, LLC, 3R Connect Systems, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Haslani Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits to Haslani Affidavit - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits to Haslani Affidavit - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits to Haslani Affidavit - Part 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits to Haslani Affidavit - Part 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibits to Haslani Affidavit - Part 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibits to Haslani Affidavit - Part 6)(Shaw, Susan) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/5/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert James Basil on behalf of Christian Fiorello, Dennis O'Connor. New Address: The Basil Law Group PC, 1270 Broadway, Suite 305, New York, NY, United States 10001, 9175123066. (Basil, Robert) (Entered: 05/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by John Patrick Curley on behalf of 3R Connect Creative Management Agency, LLC, 3R Connect Systems, LLC. New Address: Hoguet, Newman, Regal & Kenney, LLP, 10 East 40th Street, New York, New York, USA 10016, 212-689-8808. (Curley, John) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Patrick Curley on behalf of 3R Connect Creative Management Agency, LLC, 3R Connect Systems, LLC (Curley, John) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Richard M. Reice dated 5/1/2013 re: Plaintiffs respectfully ask that the Court add Plaintiffs' requested relief to the issues to be considered at the May 8 hearing. Defendants' papers in opposition to Plaintiffs' initial injunction request are due tomorrow, May 2, 2013, and Plaintiffs naturally would not object to Defendants' having an additional day or two to revise their papers to respond to the substance of this letter. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. To broaden the scope of PI hearing is denied. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/2/2013) (cd) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Robert J. Basil dated 5/2/2013 re: Accordingly, Defendants object to any expansion of the Preliminary Injunction hearing scheduled for May 8 before this Court. Document filed by Christian Fiorello.(cd) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Opposition and Motion served on 3R Connect on 5/2/2-13. Document filed by Christian Fiorello, Dennis O'Connor. (Basil, Robert) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Document filed by Christian Fiorello, Dennis O'Connor. Responses due by 5/23/2013 Return Date set for 6/6/2013 at 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Basil, Robert) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 2 Order to Show Cause,,. Document filed by Christian Fiorello, Dennis O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix Documents, # 2 Affidavit Appendix Declaration, # 3 Affidavit Brian O'Connor Dec, # 4 Affidavit Caitlin Smyth Dec, # 5 Affidavit Cheyenne Ogden Dec, # 6 Affidavit Howard Haynes Dec, # 7 Affidavit Lauren Lotka Dec, # 8 Affidavit Morgan Mershon Dec, # 9 Affidavit Salvatore Furia Dec, # 10 Affidavit Christopher Stout Dec, # 11 Affidavit Tennile Turner Dec, # 12 Affidavit William Conway Dec, # 13 Text of Proposed Order, # 14 Affidavit Christian James Dec)(Basil, Robert) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Richard M. Reice dated 4/30/2013 re: Response to Defendants' Updated Request For the Disbursement of Funds. Document filed by 3R Connect Creative Management Agency, LLC.(cd) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the attached letters in the above-captioned case, (see attached), as well as the letters attached to its order dated April 29, 2013, (Dkt. No.5). Defendants' request for an alteration of the Temporary Restraining Order or other relief is hereby DENIED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/30/2013) (cd) Modified on 5/2/2013 (cd). (Entered: 04/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Robert J. Basil dated 12/14/2012 re: I seek therefore, relief from the injunction, but only insofar as it prevents my firm, as escrow agent, from paying commissions and salaries to workers that have earned their wages. The first such payroll is due on April 30. So I will need to contact the funding source quickly if this is to be a meaningful effort. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of this letter as well as the attached Email. Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to submit to the Court, by 10:00 AM on April 30, 2013, a responsive letter not to exceed two pages in length. Plaintiffs are to submit this letter in conformity with Rule 1A of this Court's Individual Rules in Civil Cases. Also pursuant to that Rule, and with reference to the attached Email, the parties are admonished that they are not to include substantive communications in the body of Emails sent to Chambers and they are not to include the Court on correspondence between counsel. In their letter, and pursuant to Plaintiffs' assertion at the conference in this matter on April 25, 2013, Plaintiffs are to address whether -- as indicated -- they are willing to pay employee salaries and commissions pending the outcome of the Preliminary Injunction process. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/29/2013) (ft) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on Richard Malcom Reice on 4-26-2013. Document filed by Christian Fiorello, Dennis O'Connor. (Basil, Robert) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert James Basil on behalf of Christian Fiorello, Dennis O'Connor (Basil, Robert) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by 3R Connect Creative Management Agency, LLC, 3R Connect Systems, LLC. Defendants show cause why an Order should not be issued pursuant to FRCP 65 to preliminarily continue the temporary restrains as set forth above during the pendency of this action. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/8/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. No security need by posted. Show Cause Response due by 5/2/2013, at 12 pm. Show Cause reply due by 5/6/2013, at 12 pm. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/25/2013) (cd) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Christian Fiorello, Dennis O'Connor. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401065883)Document filed by 3R Connect Systems, LLC, 3R Connect Creative Management Agency, LLC.(jom) (jd). (Entered: 04/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 796 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?