New York Progress and Protection PAC v. Walsh
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06769-PAC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 5:46 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo New York Progress and Protection PAC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Individual Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael E. Rosman , +1 202 833 8400 +1 202 833 8410 rosman@cir-usa.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Todd R. Geremia +1 212 326 3429 +1 212 755 7306 trgeremia@jonesday.com
v.
No Logo Douglas A. Kellner, Defendant
No Logo Evelyn J. Aquila, Defendant
No Logo Frederic M. Umane, Defendant
No Logo Gregory C. Soumas, Defendant
No Logo Gregory P. Peterson, Defendant
No Logo J.P. SIPP, Defendant
No Logo James A. Walsh, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York State Department Of Health

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Paul Dearing +1 212 416 6685 +1 212 416 6350 richard.dearing@ag.ny.gov
Space Judith Naomi Vale +1 212 416 6274 judith.vale@ag.ny.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Benjamin Pepper +1 212 416 8567 +1 212 416 6075 joshua.pepper@ag.ny.gov
Space John Michael Schwartz +1 212 416 8559 +1 212 416 6075 john.schwartz@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo Jose Miguel Araujo, Defendant
No Logo Julie Dent, Defendant
No Logo Maria R. Guastella, Defendant
No Logo Michael Michel, Defendant
No Logo Naomi Barrera, Defendant
No Logo Simon Shamoun, Defendant
No Logo The Board of Elections in the City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin John Bowe, Jr +1 212 788 0878 +1 212 788 0940 mbowe@law.nyc.gov
Space Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
De Blasio, Bill De Blasio, Bill, Amicus Curiae
Officially listed as "Bill de Blasio"

Toggle Switch Represented by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew G. Celli, Jr. +1 212 763 5000 +1 212 763 5001 acelli@ecbalaw.com
No Logo Office of the New York Attorney General, Intervenor
Officially listed as "Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman"
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (80) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER: The Motion is hereby withdrawn with prejudice without payments, attorneys' fees, costs, disbursements or expenses except as specified in paragraph 2 of this Stipulation. The State of New York shall pay to Plaintiff and its attorneys the sum of three hundred sixty thousand dollars ($360,000.00), for which an I.R.S. Form 1099 shall be issued, in full and complete satisfaction of any and all claims against the State Defendants, the City Defendants and/or Intervenor-Defendant for attorneys' fees, costs, disbursements and expenses that Plaintiff may have for any and all counsel who have at any time represented Plaintiff in the Action as well as for attorneys' fees, costs, disbursements and expenses that Plaintiff may have up to the date this Stipulation is "so ordered" by the Court in connection with any other proceeding, administrative, judicial or otherwise, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/25/2014) (tn) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 77 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees And Costs: SO ORDERED. Responses due by 6/24/2014, Replies due by 7/8/2014. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/17/2014) (tn) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees And Costs. addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from John M. Schwartz dated June 16, 2014. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh.(Schwartz, John) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 75 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees And Costs: SO ORDERED. Responses due by 6/17/2014, Replies due by 7/1/2014. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/22/2014) (tn) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees And Costs. addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Joshua Pepper dated 5/22/2014. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh.(Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
            DECLARATION of Todd R. Geremia in Support re: 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees And Costs.. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees And Costs. . Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC. (Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                MOTION for Attorney Fees And Costs. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC.(Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/24/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/24/2014 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Colette Cantoni, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/2/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      FINAL JUDGMENT: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 44) is GRANTED; Plaintiff's claim for declaratory relief in the Complaint is GRANTED. The Court therefore DECLARES that the annual aggregate contribution limit and related criminal and civil penalties for violations of that contribution limit set forth in New York Election Laws §§ 14-114(8) and 14-126, as well as in any rules and regulations regarding that contribution limit, are unconstitutional as applied to individual contributions to political committees that engage solely in independent expenditures; Defendants are each PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from applying and enforcing the annual aggregate contribution limit and related criminal and civil penalties for violations of that contribution limit set forth in New York Election Laws §§ 14-114(8) and 14-126 against Plaintiff New York Progress and Protection PAC ("NYPPP") and its individual donors so long as NYPPP engages solely in independent expenditures; Paragraphs 2 and 3 of this Final Judgment shall not go into effect until May 9, 2014, during which time the Court's Order of October 24, 2013 shall remain in effect. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/6/2014) (tn) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 68 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        OPINION & ORDER #104247: Accordingly, the Court holds that the limitations contained in New York Election Laws §§ 14-114(8) and 14-126, as applied to independent expenditure-only organizations, cannot prevent quid pro quo corruption or its appearance, and thus violate the First Amendment. The Court therefore enjoins Defendants from applying and enforcing New York Election Laws §§ 14-114(8) and 14-126 against NYPPP and its individual donors only for independent expenditures. NYPPP's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/24/2014) (tn) Modified on 4/28/2014 (ca). (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Brian Sutherland dated 4/22/2014 re: McCutcheon v. FEC. Document filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman.(Sutherland, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from John M. Schwartz dated April 8, 2014 re: Response to letter, Docket #65. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh.(Schwartz, John) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Louis K. Fisher dated April 3, 2014 re: Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC.(Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION of Todd R. Geremia in Support re: 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC. (Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC. (Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Louis K. Fisher dated March 25, 2014 re: NYPPP v. Walsh Scheduling. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC.(Fisher, Louis) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Brian Sutherland dated 3/21/2014 re: scheduling oral argument. Document filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman.(Sutherland, Brian) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brian Adair Sutherland on behalf of Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman. New Address: New York State Office of the Attorney General, 120 Broadway, New York, NY, United States 10271, (212) 416-8096. (Sutherland, Brian) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Adair Sutherland on behalf of Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman. (Sutherland, Brian) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                            DECLARATION of Joshua Pepper, Esq. in Opposition re: 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35)(Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                              DECLARATION of Clyde Wilcox in Opposition re: 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Wilcox CV))(Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                DECLARATION of Taylor Lincoln in Opposition re: 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Public Citizen Report))(Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                  DECLARATION of Michael Franz in Opposition re: 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                    COUNTER STATEMENT TO 47 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Todd R. Geremia dated 2/25/2014 re: Defendants' Letter Request for an Order Compelling Production of Privileged Documents. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC.(Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to compel discovery addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Joshua Pepper dated 02/25/2014. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Joshua Pepper dated 02/18/14 re: 45 day extension of discovery and of the defendants' time to respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment from March 10, 2014, to April 24, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: There are 81 days from the 12/19/13 conference to the date for defendants' opposition to the summary judgment motion. Discovery may continue to that date. The Department of Law must respond to the pending motion by the close of business on Monday, March 17, 2014. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 02/20/2014) (mov) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Todd R. Geremia dated February 19, 2014 re: Opposition to Defendants' Request for a 45-Day Extension of Discovery and Briefing Schedule. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC.(Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Joshua Pepper dated 2-18-2014., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 46 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error, addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Joshua Pepper dated 2-18-2014. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC. (Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC. (Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: 31 Memorandum & Opinion, Terminate Motions. (sj) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC. Responses due by 3/10/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Statement of Material Facts)(Geremia, Todd) Modified on 1/2/2014 (ldi). (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Pre-Motion Conference proceeding held on 12/19/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Pre-Motion Conference held on 12/19/2013 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/21/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/31/2014.(ca) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from John M. Schwartz dated December 6, 2013 re: Plaintiff's request for pre-motion conference. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh.(Schwartz, John) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Todd R. Geremia dated 12/3/2013 re: Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC.(Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/8/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/8/2013 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Nilsen, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/21/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eva Lenore Dietz on behalf of Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Dietz, Eva) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh.(Schwartz, John) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 32 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC. USCA Case Number 13-3889.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the decision and order denying a preliminary injunction issued by the District Court is REVERSED in accordance with the opinion of this court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 10/24/2013. (nd) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER: Pursuant to the Second Circuit Mandate issued on Thursday, October 24, 2013 at 9AM, the Court preliminarily enjoins defendants from applying and enforcing the annual aggregate contribution limit and related penalties for violations of the contribution limit set forth in N.Y. Elec. Law §§ 14-114(8) and 14-126 against plaintiff NYPPP and its individual donors only for independent expenditures. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/24/2013) (mov) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 13-3868. On October 16, 2013, Petitioner filed an emergency petition for writ of mandamus which sought an order directing the district court to rule on its pending motion for a preliminary injunction. On October 17, 2013, Petitioner filed a letter withdrawing the mandamus petition in light of the district court having issued a decision on the morning of October 17, 2013, denying the motion for a preliminary injunction. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the letter request to withdraw the petition for writ of mandamus is GRANTED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 10/18/2013. (nd) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from 31 Memorandum & Opinion, Terminate Motions,,,,. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 0208-8982515. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  OPINION & ORDER: #103696 Accordingly, NYPPP's motion for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. While normally the Court would direct an expedited answer and discovery, the State Defendants have asked to delay their response to November 12, 2013. NYPPP's consent to this date speaks volumes about what is going on and what is motivating NYPPP's eleventh hour claim for immediate relief. NYPPP's artificial urgency is simply an attempt to avoid the rigorous scrutiny of the New York statutory scheme for campaign finance, which must occur before any relief is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on October 17, 2013) (mov) Modified on 10/24/2013 (sdi). (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Michael Schwartz on behalf of Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Schwartz, John) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Judith Vale dated 10/11/2013 re: NYPPP Letter Request. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh.(Vale, Judith) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Todd R. Geremia dated October 11, 2013 re: Preliminary Injunction Motion. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC.(Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 12, 2013 addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Joshua Pepper dated 10/11/2013. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh.(Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding proposed intervention addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Judith Vale dated October 7, 2013. Document filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman. Return Date set for 10/8/2013 at 02:00 PM.(Vale, Judith) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC. (Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judith Naomi Vale on behalf of Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Vale, Judith) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of William J. McCann, Jr. in Opposition re: 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Judith Vale in Opposition re: 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Richard Paul Dearing to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8940403. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dearing, Richard) Modified on 10/4/2013 (bcu). (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE any party wishing to oppose the instant application shall show cause as to why an order should not be issued granting proposed amicus curaie Public advocate Bill de Blasio'sapplication for leave to file a brief as amicus curaie and granting such other relief as this Court deems just and proper.( Show Cause Hearing set for 10/8/2013 at 02:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Crotty.) Show Cause Response due by 10/7/2013. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/3/2013) (js) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2013: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Declaration of Andrew G. Celli - Public Advocate de Blasios proposed Memorandum of Law of Amicus Curiae) (mov). (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Evan Rosman on behalf of New York Progress and Protection PAC. (Rosman, Michael) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER (TEXT ONLY ORDER): The Court has set a schedule for briefing and oral argument Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction in the above-captioned proceeding. Given the allegations of Plaintiff's Complaint and the supporting materials for Plaintiff's Motion, which relate to the mayoral candidacies of Joseph Lhota and William de Blasio, and in the interest of full and complete disclosure, the Court calls the following facts to the parties' attention: the Court is an acquaintance of Mr. de Blasio and, during the period from January 1, 1994 to November 21, 1997, the Court worked with Mr. Lhota in the mayoral administration of Rudolph Giuliani. In recent years, the Court has met socially with both Mr. Lhota and Mr. de Blasio. Accordingly, the Court has considered 28 §§ 144 and 455 and has concluded that there is no reason for recusal. Nonetheless, if any party wishes to discuss the issue of recusal further, that party should raise the issue promptly. (TEXT ONLY ORDER--Issued by Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J on 9/27/13) (Crotty, Paul) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Benjamin Pepper on behalf of Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Benjamin Pepper on behalf of Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh. (Pepper, Joshua) Modified on 9/27/2013 (db). (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Martin Bowe dated September 26, 2013 re: plaintiff's proposed briefing schedule. Document filed by The Board of Elections in the City of New York.(Bowe, Martin) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The Court has considered the three letters dated September 26, 2013. The Court adopts the following schedule: Defendants' Response: Friday, October 4, 2013 by 2:00 PM. Plaintiff's Reply: Monday, October 7, 2013 by 10:00 AM. The Court will hear oral argument on Tuesday, October 8, 2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 11-D. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J on 9/26/2013)(Text Only Order)(Crotty, Paul) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Todd R. Geremia dated September 26, 2013 re: Plaintiffs proposed briefing schedule. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC.(Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin John Bowe, Jr on behalf of The Board of Elections in the City of New York. (Bowe, Martin) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Edward Kitzinger on behalf of Jose Miguel Araujo, Naomi Barrera, Julie Dent, Maria R. Guastella, Michael Michel, J.P. SIPP, Simon Shamoun, Gregory C. Soumas, The Board of Elections in the City of New York, Frederic M. Umane. (Kitzinger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Joshua Pepper dated 9/26/13 re: schedule for plaintiff's PI motion. Document filed by Evelyn J. Aquila, Douglas A. Kellner, Gregory P. Peterson, James A. Walsh.(Pepper, Joshua) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Todd R. Geremia dated 09/26/2013 re: Request For Expedited Briefing Schedule. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC.(Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Shaun McCutcheon in Support re: 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC. (Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Craig Engle in Support re: 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC. (Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC. (Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC.(Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC.(Geremia, Todd) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Evelyn J. Aquila, Jose Miguel Araujo, Naomi Barrera, Julie Dent, Maria R. Guastella, Douglas A. Kellner, Michael Michel, Gregory P. Peterson, J.P. SIPP, Simon Shamoun, Gregory C. Soumas, The Board of Elections in the City of New York, Frederic M. Umane, James A. Walsh. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401077526)Document filed by New York Progress and Protection PAC.(msa) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?