TCYK, LLC v. JOHN DOES 1-14
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01629

Tags
Last Updated October 4, 2016 at 11:12 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Notice of Appearance/
NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Ann Day on behalf of Defendant JOHN DOE NO. 2. (Day, Pamela)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 Notice of Appearance/
    NOTICE of Appearance by Alastair J. Warr on behalf of Defendant JOHN DOE. (Warr, Alastair)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE of Appearance by Keith A. Vogt on behalf of Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Vogt, Keith)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [17] Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Docket Number [16]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/27/2014. (JKS)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Motion to Withdraw
          MOTION to Withdraw [16] MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/11/14 To Serve Summons , filed by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order A - Order to Withdraw Docket Entry #16)(Nicoletti, Paul)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/23/2014, Entered: 2/23/2014 Motion for Extension of Time
            ***WITHDRAWN, See Dkt. #[18] Order*** MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/11/14 To Serve Summons, filed by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - ISP Communication, # (2) Text of Proposed Order B - Proposed Order to Extend Time to Serve Summons)(Nicoletti, Paul) Modified on 2/27/2014 (JKS).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until April 11, 2014 to effectuate service of the summons and Complaint on the Doe Defendant(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/18/2014. (DW)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Motion for Extension of Time
                MOTION for Extension of Time to April 11, 2014 To Serve Summons, filed by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - ISP Communication, # (2) Text of Proposed Order B - Proposed Order to Extend Time to Serve Summons)(Nicoletti, Paul)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting Defendant John Doe No. 4's [9] Motion to Quash Subpoena. The Plaintiff is ordered to notify Comcast Holdings Corporation of the court's ruling. Copy to Jeremy L. Seal via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/5/2014. (SWM)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 DismissalCourt Filing
                    ORDER (Marginal Notation): Approved [11] NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO JOHN DOE #4 ONLY. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/3/2014.(DW)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO JOHN DOE #4 ONLY, IP 69.243.136.228, filed by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Nicoletti, Paul)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy L. Seal on behalf of Defendant JOHN DOE. (Seal, Jeremy)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Motion to Quash
                          MOTION to Quash Subpoena, filed by Defendant JOHN DOES 1-14. (Attachments: # (1) Appearance, # (2) Memo in Support)(Seal, Jeremy)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's [6] Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery (see Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/20/2013. (SWM)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: 11/7/2013 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                              BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re [6] MOTION for Leave to File TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENAS PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE , filed by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - IMDB Registration, # (2) Exhibit B - Movie News, # (3) Exhibit C - New York Times Article, # (4) Exhibit D - Declaration of Darren Griffen)(Nicoletti, Paul)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: 11/7/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                MOTION for Leave to File TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENAS PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE, filed by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nicoletti, Paul)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 Report - Copyright (AO Form 121)
                                  NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: # (1) Complaint and Exhibits A - B, filed 10/11/2013) (copy to Register via US Mail) (JKS)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Report - Copyright (AO Form 121)
                                    NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: # (1) COMPLAINT and EXHIBITS filed 10/11/2013) (copy to Register via US Mail) (JKS)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Magistrate Judge's Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction
                                      MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Nicoletti on behalf of Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Nicoletti, Paul)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Complaint
                                          COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT against JOHN DOES 1-14, filed by TCYK, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-2837834) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Copyright Catalog, # (2) Exhibit B-File Hashes for IP Address, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(Nicoletti, Paul)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 117 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?