TCYK LLC v. Does 1-8
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00296

Tags
Last Updated September 29, 2016 at 1:32 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Blair B. Chintella

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Nicoletti +1 248 203 7800 +1 248 928 7051 pauljnicoletti@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Takiguchi and Vogt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith A. Vogt +1 312 583 3400 +1 312 755 4408 KVogt@takiguchiandvogt.com
v.
No Logo John Doe #2, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by John Doe #2

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Doe #2
No Logo John Doe #8, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by John Doe #8

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Doe #8 +1 260 627 7762
No Logo John Does 1-8, Defendant
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Order on Motion to Quash
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Motion to Quash
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Order on Motion to Quash
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 Motion to Quash
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 Motion to Quash
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: 11/12/2013 Memorandum in Support
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: 11/12/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 Receipt
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J Nicoletti on behalf of TCYK LLC. (cer)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement with Jury Demand against John Does 1-8 (Filing Fee: $400.00; Receipt #INN1003879) filed by TCYK LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet).(cer)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 108 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?