The Power of Few, LLC v. Rosa
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-02312-WYD-MEH

Tags
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 12:40 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Power of Few, LLC, The, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown & Kannady, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott T. Kannadyy +1 303 757 3800 scott@brownlegal.com
v.
No Logo Doe 1, Defendant
No Logo Doe 10, Defendant
No Logo Doe #11, Defendant
No Logo Doe 12, Defendant
No Logo Doe 13, Defendant
No Logo Doe 14, Defendant
No Logo Doe 15, Defendant
No Logo Doe 16, Defendant
No Logo Doe 17, Defendant
No Logo Doe 18, Defendant
No Logo Doe 19, Defendant
No Logo Doe 2, Defendant
No Logo Doe #3, Defendant
No Logo DOE #4, Defendant
No Logo Doe #5, Defendant
No Logo Doe 6, Defendant
No Logo Doe 7, Defendant
No Logo Doe #8, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguero Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Bryan Aguero +1 720 325 6787 maguero@aguerolawpc.com
No Logo Doe 9, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: 6/12/2014 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
REPORT on the determination of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (evana, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: 6/12/2014 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE in its entirety, including all claims and counterclaims between and among the parties, with each party to bear its own costs and fees, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/12/2014. (evana, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 Stipulation of Dismissal of Case
      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only) of Dismissal)(Kannady, Scott)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/12/2014 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/2/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 10/2/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. A final pretrial order shall be prepared by the parties and submitted to the court no later than seven (7) days before the final pretrial conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/11/2014. (evana, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
          COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 3/11/2014. Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 3/14/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: 3/4/2014 Proposed Scheduling Order
            Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Kannady, Scott)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER re: [40] Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Power of Few, LLC, The, Paula Jungen (an individual) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/3/2014. (evana, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Paula Jungen by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The (Kannady, Scott)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Status Report
                  Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Kannady, Scott)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Answer to Amended Complaint
                    ANSWER to [30] Amended Complaint, by Doe 11.(Aguero, Matthew)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 37 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER dismissing without prejudice Stephen Brown (Doe 8) by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/24/14. (dkals, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 36 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Stephen Brown by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The (Kannady, Scott)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Power of Few, LLC, The. Doe 4 served on 1/18/2014, answer due 2/10/2014. (Kannady, Scott)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Power of Few, LLC, The. Doe 11 served on 1/17/2014, answer due 2/7/2014. (Kannady, Scott)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Summons Issued
                              SUMMONS issued by Clerk pursuant to filing of Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # (1) Summons, # (2) Summons) (dbera, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                MINUTE ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/11/2014 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/13/14. (jjhsl, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER. ORDERED that John Does 2, 5, 7, 9, 10, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18 and 19 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/13/14. (jjhsl, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Amended Complaint
                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Doe 11, Doe 4, Doe 8, filed by Power of Few, LLC, The. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Summons to Defendant Paula Jungen, # (4) Summons to Defendant Stephen Brown, # (5) Summons to Defendant Emily La Rosa)(Kannady, Scott)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Does 2, 5, 7, 9, 10, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19 by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The (Kannady, Scott)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [26] Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/20/13.(jjhsl, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: 12/19/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                          MEMORANDUM regarding [26] MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by Power of Few, LLC, The. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/19/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: 12/19/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Kannady, Scott)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER re: [24] Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Power of Few, LLC, The, it is ORDERED that John Does 3 and 6 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and shall hereafter be taken off the caption, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/13/2013. (ervsl, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/12/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe #3, 6 by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The (Kannady, Scott)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Status Report
                                                  Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Kannady, Scott)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe 1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/12/13. (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 1 by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          MINUTE ORDER. John Doe 11's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Quash Subpoena 16 is granted. Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously 17 is granted in that Defendant may proceed anonymously in this matter as "John Doe 11" only for the purpose of adjudicating any motion to quash or motion to dismiss by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/29/13.(jjhsl, ) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            MEMORANDUM regarding 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Quash and/or Motion to Dismiss filed by Doe 11, 17 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Quash and/or Motion to Dismiss filed by Doe 11. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/28/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Quash and/or Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Doe 11. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order - Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously)(Aguero, Matthew) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Quash and/or Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Doe 11. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Aguero, Matthew) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Defendant John Doe 8's Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously, and granting 13 John Doe 8's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Quash Subpoena. John Doe 8 may file any motion to quash or motion to dismiss on or before 10/31/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/18/2013. (mehcd) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    MEMORANDUM regarding 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously filed by Doe 8, 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Quash Subpeona filed by Doe 8. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/17/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Quash Subpeona by Defendant Doe 8. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Aguero, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously by Defendant Doe 8. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order - Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously)(Aguero, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/05/13.(jjhsl, ) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            MEMORANDUM regarding 3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Power of Few, LLC, The. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/5/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (5) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/5/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (dbera, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff The Power of Few, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 10/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Defendant John Doe 8's Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously, and granting 13 John Doe 8's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Quash Subpoena. John Doe 8 may file any motion to quash or motion to dismiss on or before 10/31/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/18/2013. (mehcd)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Does 1-19 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3510965), filed by The Power of Few, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 113 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?