SCENIC AMERICA, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00093
District Judge James E. Boasberg, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 1, 2016 at 6:10 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SCENIC AMERICA, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas M. Gremillion +1 202 662 9549 tg433@law.georgetown.edu
v.
No Logo Federal Highway Administration, Defendant
No Logo RAY LAHOOD, Defendant
United States Department of Transportation United States Department of Transportation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick D. Davis +1 202 305 0879 +1 202 616 8470 patrick.davis2@usdoj.gov
No Logo VICTOR MENDEZ, Defendant
No Logo Outdoor Advertising Association Of America Inc., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Blair Jones +1 202 434 5478 +1 202 434 5029 ajones@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kannon K. Shanmugam +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 kshanmugam@wc.com
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 0706
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMORANDUM OPINION to 19 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/23/2013. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER DENYING Defendants' 11 Motion to Dismiss and DENYING Intervenor's 10 Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall meet, confer, and provide the Court with a joint proposed briefing schedule on or before November 4, 2013. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/23/2013. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                  ERRATA by SCENIC AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration John Reggenboegen)(Gremillion, Thomas) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, RAY LAHOOD, VICTOR MENDEZ, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss (CORRECTED) filed by OUTDOOR ADVERTISING ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Shanmugam, Kannon) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                        Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION to Dismiss (CORRECTED), 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SCENIC AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FHWA 2007 Guidance, # 2 Exhibit Bureau of Public Roads Report on Customary Use, # 3 Exhibit FHWA Manual, # 4 Exhibit Federal State Agreements, # 5 Exhibit Federal State Agreements, # 6 Exhibit Federal State Agreements, # 7 Exhibit Federal State Agreements, # 8 Exhibit Federal State Agreements, # 9 Exhibit Federal State Agreements, # 10 Exhibit Federal State Agreements, # 11 Exhibit Federal State Agreements, # 12 Exhibit Federal State Agreements, # 13 Exhibit FHWA Texas Division Letter, # 14 Exhibit FHWA 1996 Guidance, # 15 Exhibit FHWA Mississippi Division Letter, # 16 Exhibit FHWA Kentucky Division Email, # 17 Declaration Declaration of Kirk Pristas, # 18 Declaration Declaration of Barbara Capozzi, # 19 Declaration Declaration of Stephanie Kindt, # 20 Declaration Declaration of Charley Weeth, # 21 Declaration Declaration of Margaret Lloyd, # 22 Declaration Declaration of Mary Tracy, # 23 Exhibit Dukic study, # 24 Exhibit Wachtel Study, # 25 Declaration Declaration of Nikki Laliberte)(Gremillion, Thomas) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Allison B. Jones on behalf of OUTDOOR ADVERTISING ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Jones, Allison) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by SCENIC AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gremillion, Thomas) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/8/2013, Entered: None
                              ERRATA to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, RAY LAHOOD, VICTOR MENDEZ, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents & Table of Authorities)(Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 06/08/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Dismiss by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, RAY LAHOOD, VICTOR MENDEZ, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Dismiss (CORRECTED) by OUTDOOR ADVERTISING ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2007 Guidance, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shanmugam, Kannon) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Dismiss by OUTDOOR ADVERTISING ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shanmugam, Kannon) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, RAY LAHOOD, VICTOR MENDEZ, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, RAY LAHOOD, VICTOR MENDEZ, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 4 Motion to Intervene of Outdoor Advertising Association of America, Inc. OAAA is permitted to intervene under Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b). Intervenor shall be held to the same deadlines (e.g., briefing schedules) as Defendants. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/14/2013. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Davis on behalf of All Defendants (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant by OUTDOOR ADVERTISING ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(znmw, ) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (6) REISSUED as to FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, RAY LAHOOD, VICTOR MENDEZ, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, US ATTORNEY, US ATTORNEY GENERAL. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Notice)(ls, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                  ELECTRONIC (5) SUMMONS Issued as to FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, RAY LAHOOD, VICTOR MENDEZ, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, ) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                    COMPLAINT against FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, RAY LAHOOD, VICTOR MENDEZ, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0090-3195592) filed by SCENIC AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 415 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?