Timothy Sams v. Heritage Transport Inc
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 13-2142

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 16, 2016 at 6:19 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4350 - Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 2:12-cv-00462-DCN.. [13-2142] (DL)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
    ORDER filed [999278440] granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [17] Copies to all parties.. [13-2142] (DL)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
      MOTION by Appellant Heritage Transport Inc to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [17]. Date and method of service: 01/15/2014 ecf. [999278372] [13-2142] Edward Pritchard
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
        ORDER filed [999269831] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 01/16/2014. Response brief due 02/18/2014 Copies to all parties.. [13-2142] (DL)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
          ORDER filed [999258718] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 12/27/2013. Response brief due 01/29/2014 Copies to all parties.. [13-2142] (DL)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
            ORDER filed [999224644] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 12/11/2013. Response brief due 01/13/2014 Copies to all parties.. [13-2142] (DL)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Janet Carol Brooks Holmes for Heritage Transport Inc.[999210543] [13-2142] Janet Holmes
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Daniel R. Settana, Jr. for Heritage Transport Inc.[999210542] [13-2142] Daniel Settana
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                  DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Ms. Janet Brooks Holmes for Appellant Heritage Transport Inc and Mr. Daniel Roy Settana, Jr. for Appellant Heritage Transport Inc re: filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g)). Appearance form due on 10/10/2013 from Janet Brooks Holmes and Daniel Roy Settana Jr. [13-2142] (BHR)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                    Mediation conference data modified. [13-2142] (SLW)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Timothy J. Sams. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999201520] [13-2142] Waring Howe
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Waring S. Howe, Jr. for Timothy J. Sams.[999201517] [13-2142] Waring Howe
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                          Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-2142] (SLW)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                            BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/04/2013. Response Brief due 12/06/2013 [13-2142] (DL)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Edward K. Pritchard, III for Heritage Transport Inc.[999199049] [13-2142] Edward Pritchard
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Heritage Transport Inc. [13-2142] Edward Pritchard
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                  DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 2:12-cv-00462-DCN.. [13-2142] (DL)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Heritage Transport Inc. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999199051] [13-2142] Edward Pritchard
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:12-cv-00462-DCN. Case manager: DLett. [13-2142] (DL)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 30 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?