Cecil King, Jr. v. Bank of New York Mellon
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 13-1970

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 12:00 PM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4140 - Contract: Negotiable Instruments
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404641548 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Mathias Aherns, Muriel King De'Toles, Cecilia King Grant, Cecil D. B. King, Jr., Christa King, Cyril D. B. King, Gina Beate Cera King and Charlene King Perdue. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 09/24/2013. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Yes. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999200249] [13-1970] W. Greco
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404641548 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Mathias Aherns, Muriel King De'Toles, Cecilia King Grant, Cecil D. B. King, Jr., Christa King, Cyril D. B. King, Gina Beate Cera King and Charlene King Perdue. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 09/24/2013. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Yes. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999200249] [13-1970] W. Greco
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404585492 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Frederick D. Greco - DOCUMENT STRUCK.[999174105] [13-1970]--[Edited 08/16/2013 by TAF] W. Greco
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404585492 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Frederick D. Greco - DOCUMENT STRUCK.[999174105] [13-1970]--[Edited 08/16/2013 by TAF] W. Greco
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00404641548 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
          FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Mathias Aherns, Muriel King De'Toles, Cecilia King Grant, Cecil D. B. King, Jr., Christa King, Cyril D. B. King, Gina Beate Cera King and Charlene King Perdue. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 09/24/2013. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Yes. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999200249] [13-1970] W. Greco
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00404585492 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Frederick D. Greco - DOCUMENT STRUCK.[999174105] [13-1970]--[Edited 08/16/2013 by TAF] W. Greco
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
              BRIEF by Appellants Mathias Aherns, Muriel King De'Toles, Cecilia King Grant, Cecil D. B. King, Jr., Christa King, Cyril D. B. King, Gina Beate Cera King and Charlene King Perdue in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 09/24/2013. [999200215] [13-1970] W. Greco
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                Mediation conference data modified. [13-1970] (LP)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                  Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1970] (LP)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                    BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Frederick Dominick Greco. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/25/2013. Response Brief due 10/28/2013 [13-1970] (TAF)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                      Docket correction requested from Mr. Frederick Dominick Greco for Cecil D. B. King, Jr., Cecilia King Grant, Charlene King Perdue, Gina Beate Cera King, Muriel King De'Toles, Christa King, Mathias Aherns and Cyril D. B. King. Re: [8] appearance of counsel. Access to appearance of counsel has been restricted to case participants.. Mailed to: Frederick Dominick Greco. [13-1970] (TAF)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                        DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Mathias Aherns, Muriel King De'Toles, Cecilia King Grant, Cecil D. B. King, Jr., Christa King, Cyril D. B. King, Gina Beate Cera King and Charlene King Perdue. [13-1970] W. Greco
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellants Mathias Aherns, Muriel King De'Toles, Cecilia King Grant, Cecil D. B. King, Jr., Christa King, Cyril D. B. King, Gina Beate Cera King and Charlene King Perdue. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999174107] [13-1970] W. Greco
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by W. Scott Greco for Mathias Aherns, Muriel King De'Toles, Cecilia King Grant, Cecil D. B. King, Jr., Christa King, Cyril D. B. King, Gina Beate Cera King and Charlene King Perdue.[999174102] [13-1970] W. Greco
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Anastasia P. Cordova for Bank of New York Mellon.[999173415] [13-1970] Anastasia Cordova
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John David Wilburn for Bank of New York Mellon.[999173406] [13-1970] John Wilburn
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Bank of New York Mellon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999173397] [13-1970] Stephen Mulligan
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Stephen P. Mulligan for Bank of New York Mellon.[999173392] [13-1970] Stephen Mulligan
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                      DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01230-AJT-TCB. Mailed to: Margaret Melissa Glassman, Frederick Dominick Greco. [13-1970] (TAF)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                        Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01230-AJT-TCB. Case manager: TFischer. [13-1970] (TAF)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?