Josephat Henry, et al v. S.t Croix Alumina, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 12-1844

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2016 at 9:42 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3385 - Property Damage: Product Liability
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011383691 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of Service dated 09/10/2013 by US mail, ECF, hand delivery. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011378263 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER (SMITH, FISHER and SHWARTZ, Circuit Judges) Motion for Reconsideration is denied. The Motion to Dismiss is also denied. The Appellants' opening brief and appendix shall be filed within 7 days of the date of this order and each side shall file a consolidated brief and no brief shall exceed 15,000 words, filed. Panel No.: ECO-055. Smith, Authoring Judge. [12-1844, 12-1845]--[Edited 09/04/2013 by TMM] (TMM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011347371 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
      ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1845 to Motion to dismiss case for untimely filing. Certificate of Service dated 08/05/2013. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011337029 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
        ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee Glencore Ltd in 12-1844, 12-1845 to dismiss case for untimely filing. Certificate of Service dated 07/25/2013. [12-1844, 12-1845] (RPT)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011327567 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
          ECF FILER: Reply by Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1845 to Response Response , filed. Certificate of Service dated 07/17/2013. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011321887 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
            ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Glencore Ltd in 12-1844, 12-1845 to Motion Order/Opinion (use to reconsider, clarify, amend, vacate or review an order or opinion). Certificate of Service dated 07/11/2013. [12-1844, 12-1845] (RPT)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011312524 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
              ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants to Clarify/Reconsider Ruling on Word Limit for Opening Brief and Motion for Leave for Rohn to File Seperate Opening Brief Regarding Sanctions Order and Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Court's Ruling. Certificate of Service dated 07/02/2013. [12-1844, 12-1845]--[Edited 07/02/2013 by TMM] (LJR)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011308565 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                AMENDED ORDER (SMITH, FISHER and SHWARTZ, Circuit Judges) considering the foregoing motion, response and reply. Appellants' motion to exceed page/word limitations is denied as presented. Appellants must file a revised brief of no more than 15,000 words within 14 days of the date of this Order, filed. Panel No.: XCO-011. Smith, Authoring Judge. [12-1844, 12-1845] (ARL)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011308185 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER (SMITH, FISHER and SHWARTZ, Circuit Judges) Motion, response, and reply are considered. Appellants' motion to exceed page/word limitations is denied as presented. Appellants must file a revised brief of no more than 19, 000 words within 14 days of the date of this Order, filed. Panel No.: XCO-011. Smith, Authoring Judge. [12-1844, 12-1845] (TMM)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011138922 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                    ORDER (Clerk) referring to the merits panel the Motion by Appellants Martha Acosta, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Sylvia Browne, Mercedes Rosa, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Sonya Cirilo and Neftali Camacho to file certain documents contained in joint appendix under seal. The documents contained in volume 29 of appendix will be held provisionally under seal pending disposition of the motion, filed. [12-1844, 12-1845] (MCW)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011136866 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                      ECF FILER: Appellants' Reply to Appellees' Response to Motion to Exceed Word-Count Limit and to establish combined limit for appellees' opening briefs and appellants' combined reply brief, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/15/2013. [12-1844, 12-1845]--[Edited 01/16/2013 by TMM] (LJR)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011132755 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                        ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to BRIEF on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1845 containing certificate of Exact Word Court, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/11/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011131752 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                          ORDER (Clerk) Action on the Motion and Response is deferred. Appellants are hereby directed to file a supplement containing the exact word count of the Appellants' brief filed on January 4, 2013 within 7 days of the date of the Order. The briefing schedule shall be stayed pending resolution of Appellants' motion, filed. [12-1844, 12-1845] (TMM)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011131539 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                            ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1845 containing Table of Contents, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/10/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011131103 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                              ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1845 to seal Vol 29 of Joint Appendix containing documents originally filed under seal with the District Court. Certificate of Service dated 01/10/2013. SEND TO MERITS PANEL. [12-1844, 12-1845]--[Edited 01/17/2013 by MCW] (LJR)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011130044 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                NON COMPLIANCE Order issued to Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1845 regarding the appendix filed on 01/04/2013. Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order. Compliance due by 01/14/2013. This Order does not change the deadline for filing the next brief. [12-1844, 12-1845] (MCW)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011128751 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                  ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Glencore Ltd to Motion to Accept Noncompliant filing. Certificate of Service dated 01/08/2013. [12-1844, 12-1845] (RHH)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011125075 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                    ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1845 to accept noncompliant filing of Appellant's Opening Brief. Certificate of Service dated 01/04/2013. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011125058 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                      ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011125046 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                        ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011125014 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                          ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124974 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                            ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124930 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                              ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124904 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124870 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                  ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124824 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                    ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124796 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                      ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124760 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                        ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124733 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                          ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124688 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                            ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124644 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                              ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124600 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124570 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124546 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124527 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124506 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124467 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124443 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124431 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124410 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124375 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by US mail, ECF, hand delivery. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124360 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Appellees Aloca Inc, Glencore Ltd and St Croix Alumina in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Alcoa Inc, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Glencore Ltd, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and St Croix Alumina in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2013 by ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011124342 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1844, Appellant Lee J. Rohn and Appellees Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in 12-1845, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/04/2013 by hand delivery, US mail, ECF. [12-1844, 12-1845] (LJR)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011084848 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        ORDER (Clerk) Motion by Appellant for extension of time to file brief and appendix is granted. Appellant's brief and appendix must be filed and served on or before 1/4/13, filed. [12-1844, 12-1845] (TMM)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011082404 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants for Extension of Time to file to file Brief and Appendix until 01/4/2012. Certificate of Service dated 11/19/2012. [12-1844, 12-1845]--[Edited 11/19/2012 by TMM] (LJR)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011055155 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Mercedes Rosa and Lee J. Rohn due on or before 12/03/2012. Appendix due on or before 12/03/2012. [12-1844, 12-1845] (TMM)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003010958481 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa, received. (TMM)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003010933025 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                FOLLOW UP LETTER to Lee J. Rohn, Esq. for Martha Acosta, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Sylvia Browne, Mercedes Rosa, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez, Sonya Cirilo and Neftali Camacho, requesting the following document(s): Information Statement on or before 07/03/2012. (TMM)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003010918516 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Glencore Ltd , filed.--[Edited 06/05/2012 by TMM] (RPT)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003010911524 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Lee J. Rohn in 12-1845, Appellant Josephat Henry in 12-1844 advising this court that transcripts are not needed.--[Edited 05/29/2012 by TMM] (LJR)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003010911516 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Lee J. Rohn in Appellant Josephat Henry , received.--[Edited 05/29/2012 by TMM] (LJR)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003010911504 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lee J. Rohn on behalf of Appellant(s) Josephat Henry, et al.. [12-1845, 12-1844] (LJR)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003010897194 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          FOLLOW UP LETTER to Laura J. Baughman, Esq., Gordon C. Rhea, Esq. and Lee J. Rohn, Esq. for Appellants requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/25/2012. Information Statement on or before 05/25/2012. Concise Summary on or before 05/25/2012. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 05/25/2012. (TMM)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003010875017 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Richard H. Hunter on behalf of Appellee(s) Glencore Ltd.--[Edited 04/20/2012 by MB] (RHH)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003010872678 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee St Croix Alumina, filed.--[Edited 04/18/2012 by TMM] (ACS)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003010872675 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Alcoa Inc in 12-1845, filed.--[Edited 04/18/2012 by TMM] (ACS)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003010872672 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew C. Simpson on behalf of Appellee(s) St. Croix Alumina, LLC Alcoa LLC.--[Edited 04/18/2012 by TMM] (ACS)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003010871684 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    FOLLOW UP LETTER to Laura J. Baughman, Esq. and Gordon C. Rhea, Esq., for Appellants requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/01/2012. Disclosure Statement on or before 05/01/2012. Concise Summary on or before 05/01/2012. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 05/01/2012. (TMM)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003010856496 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Rene P. Tatro and Juliet A. Markowitz on behalf of Appellee(s) Glencore, Ltd.. [12-1844, 12-1845]--[Edited 04/02/2012 by TMM] (RPT)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003010855212 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        CLERK ORDER , The actions at Nos. 12-1844 and 12-1845 are consolidated for all purposes. In addition, it is the Court's practice to hold sittings in the VI twice each year. In order to facilitate the Court's docket for these sittings, the parties are advised that these cases are tentatively listed for calendaring in December 2012. Due to the tentative calendar date, the parties and court reporters are expected to abide by all scheduling orders. The parties and court reporters are further advised that motions for extension of time are strongly disfavored absent extraordinary circumstances, filed. [12-1844, 12-1845] (TMM)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003010854486 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Martha Acosta, Sylvia Browne, Neftali Camacho, Sonya Cirilo, Maude Drew, Wilhelmina Glasgow, Josephat Henry, Amado Rodriguez, George Rodriguez and Mercedes Rosa in District Court No. 1-99-cv-00036. (TMM)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 30 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?