TCYK, LLC v. Doe
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06654
District Judge Robert M. Dow, Jr, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 10:37 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Copyright Report
MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: # (1) Order Dated: 1/13/14)(ea, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 23 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Order on Motion to Quash
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 text entry
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: 12/3/2013 Order on Motion to Quash
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Doe by Ryan M. Henderson Pursuant to LR 83.15 (Henderson, Ryan) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Motion by Peter Robert Jennetten for presentment of motion to quash 15 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 12/4/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Jennetten, Peter) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 16 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM by Doe in support of motion to quash 15 Subpoena (Jennetten, Peter) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                    MOTION by Defendant Doe to quash Subpoena (Jennetten, Peter) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Doe by Peter Robert Jennetten (Jennetten, Peter) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing set for 12/4/2013 at 09:00 AM. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Parties to prepare and submit a joint status report at least two days prior to set status. (See Judges web page for status report).Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                          ENTER ORDER FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/2/2013. Mailed notice(tbk, ) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference 8 is granted. ORDER to follow. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery 8 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/1/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM by TCYK, LLC in support of motion for discovery 8 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                  MOTION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, due to a clerical error, 13 c 6654, TCYK, LLC v Doe was assigned to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall and directly designated to Magistrate Judge Sheila M. Finnegan; therefore It is hereby ordered that, the Clerk is to reassign 13 c 6654, TCYK, LLC v Doe by lot to a district judge and designate a magistrate judge by lot. Case reassigned to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/23/2013. (td, ) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                        MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (ea, ) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                              CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                COMPLAINT filed by TCYK, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8739521. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 113 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?