Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., et al v. Dale Funk
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 12-15740

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 9:40 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3380 - TORTS PERSONAL PROPERTY-Other
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
Filed order (Deputy Clerk: AT) Appellant Dale Funk’s unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal No. 12-15740 is granted. Appeal No. 12-15740 is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The court sua sponte consolidates appeal No. 12-16053 with appeal Nos. 12- 15757, 12-15782, and 12-15816. The pending motion to vacate or modify the appeal bond and motion to dismiss filed in appeal No. 12-15782 shall be addressed by separate order. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court for appeal No. 12-15740. [8220112] (WL)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782, 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15816 response opposing motion (,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 06/18/2012. [8218788] [12-15782, 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15816] (HIZ)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
      Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782, Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15816 Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 06/15/2012. [8216413] [12-15782, 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15816] (CLB)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Nick S. Movaghar for - MagSafe Apple Power Adapter Litigation and Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15782, 12-15816. Date of service: 06/14/2012. [8215215] [12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15782, 12-15816] (NSM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joseph Darrell Palmer for Appellant Jeremy Lee in 12-15816. Date of service: 06/13/2012. [8213442] [12-15816, 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15782] (JDP)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
            Filed (ECF) - MagSafe Apple Power Adapter Litigation and Appellees Apple, Inc., Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman Joint Motion to dismiss party from case. Date of service: 06/11/2012. [8209941]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15757, 12-15782, 12-15816. Resent NDA. 06/11/2012 by RY] (ACA)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
              Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon Motion for miscellaneous relief [Vacate or modify appeal bond (Dkt. No. 161)]. Date of service: 06/08/2012. [8207780]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15740, 12-15816, 12-15757. Resent NDA. 06/11/2012 by RY] (THF)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                Filed order (EDWARD LEAVY and MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS) Appellant Gaudet’s motion, filed in appeal No. 12-15757, to stay the district court’s May 29, 2012 order is denied. See Hilton v. Braunskill, 481 U.S. 770, 776 (1987). The briefing schedule established previously in these consolidated appeals shall remain in effect. [8206637] [12-15757, 12-15740, 12-15782, 12-15816] (KD)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                  Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [8206579] [12-15757, 12-15740, 12-15782, 12-15816] (JFF)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 71 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?