Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. v. Does 1 et al.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-02911
District Judge Wiley Y. Daniel, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 9:28 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lynn Peak Productions, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown & Kannady, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott T. Kannadyy +1 303 757 3800 scott@brownlegal.com
Space Scott T. Kannadyy +1 303 757 3800 scott@brownlegal.com
v.
No Logo Doe 1, Defendant
No Logo Doe 10, Defendant
No Logo Doe #11, Defendant
No Logo Doe 12, Defendant
No Logo Doe 13, Defendant
No Logo Doe 14, Defendant
No Logo Doe 2, Defendant
No Logo Doe #3, Defendant
No Logo DOE #4, Defendant
No Logo Doe #5, Defendant
No Logo Doe 6, Defendant
No Logo Doe 7, Defendant
No Logo Doe #8, Defendant
No Logo Doe 9, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
REPORT on the determination of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (evana, ) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE In accordance with the 29 Notice of Dismissal of Case filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) on May 12, 2014, it is ORDERED that the remaining John Does and this action are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/13/2014. (evana, ) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Plaintiff to show cause why this Court should not recommend that its claims against all remaining Defendant John Does be dismissed without prejudice for failure to serve. Show Cause Response due by 5/5/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/28/2014. (cpear) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER re: 25 Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. it is ORDERED that Defendant Does 4 and 7 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/14/2014. (evana, ) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
            Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Does 4 and 7 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Plaintiffs [Second] Request [Motion] for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants to on or before April 23, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/25/2014.(evana, ) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  MEMORANDUM regarding 22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/24/14. Text Only Entry (rkeec) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                    Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Plaintiff's Request [Motion] for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants by 3/24/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/11/2014. (mehcd) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MEMORANDUM regarding 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/11/14. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                            Monthly STATUS REPORT Corrected by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                              Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification of Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/5/2014. (mehcd) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM regarding 14 MOTION to Clarify re 13 Order on Motion to Expedite filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/4/14. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Clarify re 13 Order on Motion to Expedite by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/29/14.(jhawk, ) Modified on 1/30/2014 (jhawk, ). (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MEMORANDUM regarding 6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/29/14. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                          Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                            Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              MINUTE ORDER: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a status report on the tenth day of each month informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, the Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, the Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/31/2013. Text Only Entry (mehcd) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/28/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel for all further proceedings, and drawn to Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger no longer assigned to case by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/1/2013. (agarc, ) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                      REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (dbera, ) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Case assigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent 0939599 BC LTD., Corporate Parent Studio West Productions (VCC) Inc. for Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                            COMPLAINT against Does 1-14 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3591911), filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 227 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?