Power of Few, LLC, The v. Does, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-02200
District Judge Wiley Y. Daniel, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 10, 2016 at 2:07 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Power of Few, LLC, The, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown & Kannady, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott T. Kannadyy +1 303 757 3800 scott@brownlegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott T. Kannadyy +1 303 757 3800 scott@brownlegal.com
v.
No Logo JOHN DOE 1, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 10, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 11, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 12, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #13, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 14, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 15, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 16, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 17, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 18, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 19, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #2, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 20, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 21, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 3, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 4, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 5, Defendant
No Logo John Doe#6, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 7, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #8, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 9, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 241
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
    STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
      STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a status report within five (5) days of the date of this order, then on the tenth day of each month thereafter, informing the Court of the status of service in this case. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/27/2013. (mehcd) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/21/2013. (mehcd) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM regarding 4 MOTION for Discovery PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE filed by Power of Few, LLC, The. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/20/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (5) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/20/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel for all further proceedings and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Judge William J. Martinez no longer assigned to case by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/1/2013. (agarc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                    REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights. (agarc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (agarc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Discovery PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Plaintiff The Power of Few, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhbit B)(Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                          SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to 1 Complaint by Plaintiff The Power of Few, LLC. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT against Does 1-21 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3493995), filed by The Power of Few, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 175 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?