Makaeff v. Trump University, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-01679-RBD-DAB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 18, 2016 at 11:25 PM ST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ed Oberkrom, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Lynn Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 rachelj@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart Andrew Davidson +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 sdavidson@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Dearman +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 mdearman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo J.R. Everett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Lynn Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 rachelj@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart Andrew Davidson +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 sdavidson@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Dearman +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 mdearman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo JOHN BROWN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Lynn Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 rachelj@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart Andrew Davidson +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 sdavidson@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Dearman +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 mdearman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Sonny Low, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Lynn Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 rachelj@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart Andrew Davidson +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 sdavidson@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Dearman +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 mdearman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Tarla Makaeff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Lynn Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 rachelj@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart Andrew Davidson +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 sdavidson@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Dearman +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 mdearman@rgrdlaw.com
v.
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Russomanno & Borrello, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herman Joseph Russomanno, III +1 305 373 2101 +3732 373 373 2103 herman2@russomanno.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trump Organization, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Ann Martin +1 310 303 3225 +1 310 265 5522 jmartin@trumpnational.com
No Logo Gerald Martin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Russomanno & Borrello, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herman Joseph Russomanno, III +1 305 373 2101 +3732 373 373 2103 herman2@russomanno.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trump Organization, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Ann Martin +1 310 303 3225 +1 310 265 5522 jmartin@trumpnational.com
Trump University, LLC Trump University, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Russomanno & Borrello, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herman Joseph Russomanno, III +1 305 373 2101 +3732 373 373 2103 herman2@russomanno.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trump Organization, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Ann Martin +1 310 303 3225 +1 310 265 5522 jmartin@trumpnational.com
No Logo Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum to Gerald Martin, In Re
Citation Motion to Compel
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER dismissing case Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/18/2014. (VMF) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER to show cause why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice. Show Cause Response due by 6/16/2014. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/5/2014. (VMF) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER denying 21 Amended Renewed Motion for attorney fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 4/29/2014. (LAK) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
        Corrected DECLARATION of Amber L. Eck re 21 Amended Renewed MOTION for Attorney Fees by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Dearman, Mark) Modified on 12/26/2013 (CH). (Entered: 12/24/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
          RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 Plaintiffs' Amended Renewed Motion for Award of Fees and Costs Regarding Gerald Martin's Deposition filed by Gerald Martin, Donald J. Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Russomanno, Herman) Modified on 12/24/2013 (CH). (Entered: 12/23/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
            DECLARATION of Rachel L. Jensen re 21 Plaintiffs' Amended Renewed Motion for Award of Fees and Costs Regarding Gerald Martin's Deposition by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Dearman, Mark) Modified on 12/24/2013 (CH). (Entered: 12/20/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
              DECLARATION of Amber L. Eck re 21 Plaintiffs' Amended Renewed Motion for Award of Fees and Costs Regarding Gerald Martin's Deposition by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Dearman, Mark) Modified on 12/24/2013 (CH). (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                Plaintiffs' Amended Renewed Motion for Award of Fees and Costs Regarding Gerald Martin's Deposition by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Dearman, Mark) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 12/24/2013 (CH). (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER denying without prejudice 16 Motion for attorney fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/15/2013. (LAK) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE to counsel Jason A. Forge, Thomas R. Merrick, Amber L. Eck, Helen I. Zeldes, AlreenHaeggquist, Aaron M. Olsen of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (CH) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 17 motion for Jill Martin to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/7/2013. (LAK) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MOTION for Jill Martin to appear pro hac vice by Gerald Martin, Donald J. Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Russomanno, Herman) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Renewed MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Regarding Gerald Martin's Deposition by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Amber Eck in Support of Motion, # 2 Affidavit of Rachel L. Jensen in Support of Motion)(Dearman, Mark) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 11/8/2013 (CH). (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1 (VMF) (ctp) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Amended condititonal notice of hearing and order granting 13 Motion to modify. Should Gerald Martin fail to attend the deposition scheduled for 11/5/13 at 9:00, he shall appear before Magistrate Karla R. Spauling 11/5/13 at 1:30. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 10/30/2013. (LAK) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                Unopposed MOTION to modify 8 COURT'S OCTOBER 29, 2013 ORDER1 by Gerald Martin, Donald J. Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Russomanno, Herman) Modified on 10/31/2013 (CH). (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. New case number: 6:13-cv-1679-ORL-37-KRS. Magistrate Judge David A. Baker no longer assigned to the case. (MAL) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER. This case is hereby transferred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 10/29/2013. (LAK) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE to counsel, David K. Schneider, of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). See 7 . (Copies mailed). (LMM) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE to counsel, Jill A. Martin, of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). See 7 . (Copies mailed). (LMM) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 1 Motion to Compel Gerald Martin to appear for his deposition. See Order and Conditional Notice of Hearing for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 10/29/2013. (Spaulding, Karla) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 1 MOTION to Compel compliance with subpoena duces tecum and ad testificandum, and request for order to show cause why non-party Gerald Martin should not be held in contempt and memorandum of law in support filed by Gerald Martin, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Russomanno, Herman) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 5 motion to appear pro hac vice. Rachel L. Jensen, Esq., may specially appear in this case as counsel for Movants John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff, and Ed Berkrom, with Mark Dearman, Esq., serving as local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 10/28/2013. (ECJ) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MOTION for Rachel L. Jensen to appear pro hac vice by Tarla Makaeff. (Dearman, Mark) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                  SUPPLEMENT PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S OCTOBER 25, 2013 ORDER by Tarla Makaeff. (Dearman, Mark) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER re 1 MOTION to Compel. By 4:00 p.m. Eastern time on 10/25/2013, Plaintiffs shall file a supplement to their motion. On or before 10/28/2013 Gerald Martin shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion and supplemental filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 10/25/2013. (LMM) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                      DECLARATION of Rachel L. Jensen in support of re 1 MOTION to Compel compliance with subpoena duces tecum and ad testificandum, and request for order to show cause why non-party Gerald Martin should not be held in contempt and memorandum of law in support by All Plaintiffs. (LMM) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 1 Motion to Compel Gerald Martin to appear for his deposition. See Order and Conditional Notice of Hearing for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 10/29/2013. (Spaulding, Karla)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          MOTION to Compel compliance with subpoena duces tecum and ad testificandum, and request for order to show cause why non-party Gerald Martin should not be held in contempt and memorandum of law in support by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(LMM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Space Space

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?