Home Buyers Warranty Corp. v. Lois Hanna
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 13-1834

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2016 at 3:53 PM EDT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4896 - Other Statutes
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
ORDER filed [999228089] granting Motion to extend filing time [19], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Response brief due 10/31/2013 Copies to all parties.. [13-1834] (DSD)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
    MOTION by Appellee Lois Hanna to extend filing time for response brief Health issues until October 31, 2013. Date and method of service: 10/28/2013 ecf. [999227834] [13-1834] Christopher Brinkley
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
      BRIEF by Appellants Home Buyers Warranty Corporation, National Home Insurance Company and New Home Warranty Insurance Company in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 09/23/2013. [999199334] [13-1834] Carlos Yguico
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
        FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Home Buyers Warranty Corporation, National Home Insurance Company and New Home Warranty Insurance Company. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 09/23/2013. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Not applicable. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999199329] [13-1834] Carlos Yguico
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Carlos V. Yguico for Home Buyers Warranty Corporation, National Home Insurance Company and New Home Warranty Insurance Company.[999197224] [13-1834] Carlos Yguico
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
            ORDER filed [999152881] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 9/26/2013, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 09/26/2013. Response brief due 10/28/2013 Copies to all parties. [13-1834] (CP)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Home Buyers Warranty Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999144973] [13-1834] James Marshall
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant New Home Warranty Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999144967] [13-1834] James Marshall
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant National Home Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999144964] [13-1834] James Marshall
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                    OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellee Lois Hanna. [13-1834] Christopher Brinkley
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                      Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1834] (SLW)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                        BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/12/2013. Response Brief due 09/16/2013 [13-1834] (CP)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                          DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Home Buyers Warranty Corporation, National Home Insurance Company and New Home Warranty Insurance Company. [13-1834] James Marshall
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by James W. Marshall, III for Home Buyers Warranty Corporation, National Home Insurance Company and New Home Warranty Insurance Company.[999143096] [13-1834] James Marshall
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Lois Hanna. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999142985] [13-1834] Christopher Brinkley
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Christopher L. Brinkley for Lois Hanna.[999142981] [13-1834] Christopher Brinkley
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                  DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 2:13-cv-01859. Mailed to: Carlos V. Yguico. [13-1834] (CP)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:13-cv-01859. Case manager: CPoulsen. [13-1834] (CP)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 130 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?