TCYK, LLC v. Doe 1 et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-02950

Tags
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 1:54 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Theodore N Cox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Stephenson Jr. david.thunderlaw@gmail.com
v.
No Logo John 5 Doe, Defendant
No Logo John 7 Doe, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 1, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 10, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 11, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 12, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #13, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 14, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 15, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 16, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 17, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 18, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 19, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #2, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 20, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 3, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 4, Defendant
No Logo John Doe#6, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #8, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 9, Defendant
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 Terminated Party
Party John Doe 4, John Doe 2 and John Doe 3 terminated pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed in this case on 3/10/2014. Text Only Entry (evana, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 2, John Doe 3, and John Doe 4 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
      MINUTE ORDER granting [20] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. Plaintiff shall serve remaining defendants by 3/28/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/26/2014. (mehcd)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 MemorandumCourt Filing
        MEMORANDUM regarding [20] MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/25/14. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Motion for Extension of Time
          MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proof of Service--CenturyLink, # (2) Exhibit Proof of Service--Comcast, # (3) Exhibit CenturyLink Response, # (4) Exhibit Comcast Response)(Stephenson, David)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: 2/17/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 12 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 19 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Terminated Party
                Party John Doe 11 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 01/13/14. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 11 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 Terminated Party
                    Party John Doe 18 and John Doe 9 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 01/09/14. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 9 and John Doe 18 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Terminated Party
                        Party John Doe 6 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 12/20/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 6 Without Prejudice by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Order on Motion for LeaveCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [7] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/31/2013. (mehcd)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a status report on the tenth day of each month informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, the Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, the Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/31/2013. Text Only Entry (mehcd)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                MEMORANDUM regarding [7] MOTION for Leave to to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(b) Conference filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/30/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/30/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Motion for Leave
                                    MOTION for Leave to to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(b) Conference by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion, # (2) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Stephenson, David)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
                                      REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (sphil, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Magistrate Judge Consent FormCourt Filing
                                        Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. No summons issued. (sphil, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Case Assigned to JudgeCourt Filing
                                          Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (sphil, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stephenson, David)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Notice of Case Association
                                              NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3597190), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Spreadsheet of Defendants' IP Addresses, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Copyright Registration, # (3) Exhibit Listings of the Film Showings in Colorado, # (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, David)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 147 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?