Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc., et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 12-7103

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2016 at 6:32 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207542735 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
CLERK'S ORDER filed [1464128] withholding issuance of the mandate. [12-7103]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207542730 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    OPINION filed [1464126] (Pages: 19) for the Court by Judge Rogers [12-7103]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207542727 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      PER CURIAM JUDGMENT filed [1464123] that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby affirmed for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Rogers, Tatel and Sentelle. [12-7103]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207529502 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Rogers, Tatel and Sentelle. [12-7103]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207521142 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
          PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1451805] allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants -- 15 Minutes, Appellees -- 15 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney - due 09/03/2013 [12-7103]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207507698 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1443431] scheduling oral argument before Judges ROGERS, TATEL, SENTELLE Monday, 09/16/2013 AM [12-7103]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207480854 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
              APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1427854] filed by Bell Helicopter Textron Canada, Ltd. and Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc. [Service Date: 03/28/2013 ] Length of Brief: 6995 words. [12-7103] (Shanmugam, Kannon)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207471446 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                CLERK'S ORDER filed [1422574] granting appellants' unopposed motion to extend time to file the reply brief [1422220-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Reply Brief due 03/28/2013 [12-7103]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 78 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?