BKGTH Productions, LLC v. Does 1-80
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-04714

Tags
Last Updated October 9, 2016 at 6:14 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 Order on Motion for Discovery
MINUTE entry before Honorable Susan E. Cox: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for leave to take discovery prior to rule 26(f) conference [9] is granted. Status hearing set for 1/13/2014 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (np, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Notice of Motion
    NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery[9] before Honorable Susan E. Cox on 10/8/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 referring case to magistrate judge
      EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER:Case referred to the Honorable Susan E. Cox pursuant to IOP13(F)2(b). Signed by Executive Committee on 7/15/2013.(rp, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Notice of Motion
        NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery[9] before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 10/2/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Hierl, Michael)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
          MEMORANDUM by BKGTH Productions, LLC in support of motion for discovery[9] Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B)(Hierl, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Motion for Discovery
            MOTION by Plaintiff BKGTH Productions, LLC for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 magistrate judge status hearing
              MINUTE entry before Honorable Mary M. Rowland:Status hearing held on 7/15/2013. Mailed notice (gel, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
                MINUTE entry before Honorable Mary M. Rowland:Initial status hearing set for 7/15/2013 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mary M. Rowland for the purpose of scheduling a settlement conference. Parties are to bring dates when both clients and counsel will be available for a settlement conference. Judge Rowland generally conducts settlement conferences Mondays through Thursdays at 1:00 p.m. Other dates and times may be available as required by the Court or the parties. The parties are directed to review and to comply with Judge Rowland's Standing Order regarding Setting Settlement Conferences, which is available on Judge Rowland's webpage located on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.Mailed notice (gel, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 referring case to magistrate judge
                  EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER:Case referred to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland pursuant to Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/8/13.(ea, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: 7/1/2013 Copyright Report
                    MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (mgh, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Attorney Appearance
                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Attorney Appearance
                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 civil cover sheet
                          CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT filed by BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8495367. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 140 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?