Cellular Communications Equipment LLC v. NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00584
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 12:12 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 bbumgardner@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Christopher Cecil +1 817 806 3812 +1 817 377 3485 tcecil@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Fagan, Jr. +1 817 806 3817 +1 817 377 3485 mfagan@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Brannon Latimer +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 blatimer@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
AT&T, Inc. AT&T, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Ncr Corp
Unknown Role, At Home Corp
Unknown Role, Net2phone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mail.com, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by AT&T, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian James Gaffney +1 214 757 3024 +1 214 746 2213 bg172e@att.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Wood Kennerly +1 650 320 1800 +1 650 320 1900 chriskennerly@paulhastings.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Christian Platt +1 858 720 2500 +1 858 720 2555 christianplatt@paulhastings.com
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 595 3111 debby@yw-lawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Cellco Partnership, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas M Dunham +1 202 282 5852 +1 202 282 5100 tdunham@winston.com
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV +1 903 597 8311 patrickclutter@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 63 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Debby E. Gunter by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Withdrawing Attorney. Attorney S Christian Platt terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/9/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER denying as moot 46 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/25/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Corrine M Saylor on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc. (Saylor, Corrine) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 59 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
              AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION consolidating cases 6:13cv507, 6:13cv508, 6:13cv509, 6:13cv510, 6:13cv511, 6:13cv568, 6:13cv569, 6:13cv584 and 6:13cv738 for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. Lead case is 6:13cv507. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. Individual cases remain active for venue motions and trial, and all pending motions will be considered as filed. All future motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control Order by 3/15/2014, and a single Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order by 3/21/2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/27/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 55 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael James Fagan, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/20/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC REGARDING SPECIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER setting Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2014 02:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 52 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Joint Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. (Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                              LREF
                              Blank 51 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC Of Readiness For Scheduling Conference (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellco Partnership Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc., Corporate Parent Vodafone Group PLC for Cellco Partnership Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NEC Corporation of America (Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd. (Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 46 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick) Modified on 11/18/2013 (mll, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2013: # 2 Revised Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/17/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John D Zele on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4406818. (Zele, John) (Entered: 11/17/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert W Busby on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4406621. (Busby, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy D Peterson on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4406619. (Peterson, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Auchter Allgood on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America (Allgood, Adam) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradford A Cangro on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America (Cangro, Bradford) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rick L Rambo on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America (Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Bennett Molster, III on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc. (Molster, Charles) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M Dunham on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc. (Dunham, Thomas) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 34 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Pursuant to stipulation of the parties, it is hereby ordered that Defendant Verizon Communications Inc. is dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. Answer due by 11/18/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Verizon Communications Inc. by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Cellco Partnership Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert A Yarbrough, III on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint is extended to 11-18-2013. No further extensions will be granted without a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/27/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 27 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by AT&T Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Defendant AT&T Inc is hereby DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/18/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant AT&T Inc. by AT&T Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by S Christian Platt on behalf of AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC (Platt, S) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Wood Kennerly on behalf of AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC (Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to NEC Corporation of America on 8/12/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to AT&T Mobility LLC on 8/12/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to AT&T Inc. on 8/12/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Cellco Partnership Inc. on 8/12/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Verizon Communications, Inc. on 8/12/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants NEC Casio Mobile Communications, Ltd. and NEC Corporation of America to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 11-18-2013. No further extensions will be granted without a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/03/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Behalf of All Defendants by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                Defendants' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC.( Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. (Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es), # 3 Summons(es), # 4 Summons(es), # 5 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Christopher Cecil on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Cecil, Thomas) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Fagan on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Brannon Latimer on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Latimer, Steven) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Verizon Communications, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4256335.), filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,377,804, # 3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 6,819,923, # 4 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 7,215,962, # 5 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 7,941,174, # 6 Exhibit E - U.S. Patent No. 8,055,820, # 7 Exhibit F - U.S. Patent No. 7,218,923)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?