TCYK, LLC v. Doe
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06729
District Judge Elaine E. Bucklo, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 12:30 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Hearing on plaintiff's motion to take discovery set for 10/17/2013 is stricken. The parties will be advised of a new court date. Mailed notice (jdh) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery 7 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/17/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
      MEMORANDUM by TCYK, LLC in support of motion for discovery 7 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
        MOTION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
          NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
            MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (tg, ) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                  CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                    COMPLAINT filed by TCYK, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8747755. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 146 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?