TCYK, LLC v. DOE, subscriber assigned IP Address 50.151.205.216 (Formerly Doe No. 3)
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06727
District Judge Gary Feinerman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 5:52 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
MAILED Copyright report with certified copy of Minute Order dated 11/22/2013 to Registrar, Washington DC. (et, ) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff has filed a notice of voluntary dismissal 14 , the terms of which are set forth therein. Status hearing scheduled for 12/4/2013 10 is stricken. Civil case closed. Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DOE, subscriber assigned IP Address 50.151.205.216 (Formerly Doe No. 3) by Erin Kathryn Russell (Russell, Erin) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
          MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to take discovery 6 is granted. Plaintiff may cause a subpoena to be issued to the Doe Defendant's ISP. This order is without prejudice to the ISP or the Doe Defendant moving on any ground to quash the subpoena. Motion hearing scheduled for 10/16/2013 11 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery 6 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/16/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 12/4/2013 at 9:00 AM. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 11/27/2013. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, to "District Judges," to "Judge Gary Feinerman," to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures) for details on the initial status hearing and Initial Status Report.Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Gary Feinerman for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/2/2013.(kj, ) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery 6 before Honorable John F. Grady on 10/9/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM by TCYK, LLC in support of motion for discovery 6 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                      MOTION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                              CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                COMPLAINT filed by TCYK, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8747567. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 140 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?