TCYK, LLC v. DOE, subscriber assigned IP Address 71.194.130.79 (Formerly Doe No. 133)
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06671
District Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 4:34 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 status hearing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Status hearing held and continued to 05/14/14 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff appeared and reported to the Court that the parties are still attempting to reach a resolution. Mailed notice (mw, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 status hearing
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Status hearing held and continued to 03/11/14 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff appeared and reported to the Court that the parties are attempting to reach a resolution. Mailed notice (mw, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Status Report
      STATUS Report Initial Status Report by TCYK, LLC (Hierl, Michael)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Terminate Hearings
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Counsel for Plaintiff advised this Court's Courtroom Deputy that the parties are in good faith attempting to reach a resolution in this matter and that counsel for Plaintiff had a medical emergency. Based upon counsel's representations, Plaintiff's request to continue status hearing is granted. Status hearing reset to 02/06/14 at 9:00 a.m. Status hearing set for 01/23/14 is stricken. Mailed notice (mw, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
          MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Plaintiff's motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference 9 is granted. Initial status hearing reset to 01/23/14 at 9:00 a.m. Status hearing set for 11/19/13 is stricken.Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery 9 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 10/3/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Initial status hearing set for 11/19/13 at 9:00 a.m. At least four working days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall conduct a FRCP 26(f) conference and file a joint written Initial Status Report, not to exceed five pages in length, and file the Court's Joint Jurisdictional Status Report and deliver courtesy copies to this Court's Courtroom Deputy in Room 1908. The Court's standing orders on the Initial Status Report and Joint Jurisdictional Status Report maybe obtained from Judge Der-Yeghiayan's web page or from this Court's Courtroom Deputy. Counsel for the Plaintiff is warned that failure to serve summons and complaint on a Defendant will result in a dismissal of the action pursuant to FRCP 4. Counsel for Plaintiff is further directed to file with the Clerk of Court, the appropriate return of service or waiver of service. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, due to a clerical error, the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber was directly assigned and Magistrate Judge Daniel G. Martin was directly designated in the cases listed below; therefore It is hereby ordered that, the Clerk is to reassign these cases by lot to a district judge and designate a magistrate judge by lot. Case reassigned to the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/23/2013. (td, ) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                        MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (gcy, ) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                              CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                COMPLAINT filed by TCYK, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8740298. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 162 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?