TCYK, LLC v. Doe
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06667
District Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 7, 2016 at 5:20 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
Space Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
Space Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
v.
No Logo Doe, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (mr, ) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff having filed a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) 16 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ac, ) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plantiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Doe Defendant (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of District Judge Andrea R. Wood. All previously set status dates and motion hearing dates are hereby stricken. The Court will set a date for a reassignment status conference by separate order. The parties are directed not to notice any motions for presentment prior to the reassignment status conference without first contacting chambers. Inquiries should be directed to the courtroom deputy before the motion is filed. Unless otherwise ordered by this Court, all other hearing dates, deadlines and schedules in effect as of the date of this Order remain in effect. To help the Court learn about the case, counsel for the parties shall confer and then prepare and file a joint Reassignment Status Report, not to exceed five pages, within 14 days of the entry of this Order. If defendants counsel has not yet filed an appearance, the Reassignment Status Report should be prepared by plaintiffs counsel. A template for the Reassignment Status Report, setting forth the information required, is attached to this Order and can be found on the Courts website at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood. (For further details, see attachment.)(jp, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2013: # 1 Reassignment Status Report) (jp, ). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
          EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on November 5, 2013, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Andrea R. Wood, therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 300 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall become effective on Tuesday, November 19,2013. Case reassigned to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/18/2013. (td, ) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
            MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Plaintiff's motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference 10 is granted. Initial status hearing reset to 01/23/14 at 9:00 a.m. Status hearing set for 11/19/13 is stricken. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery 10 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 10/3/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM by TCYK, LLC in support of motion for discovery 10 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                  MOTION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Initial status hearing set for 11/19/13 at 9:00 a.m. At least four working days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall conduct a FRCP 26(f) conference and file a joint written Initial Status Report, not to exceed five pages in length, and file the Court's Joint Jurisdictional Status Report and deliver courtesy copies to this Court's Courtroom Deputy in Room 1908. The Court's standing orders on the Initial Status Report and Joint Jurisdictional Status Report maybe obtained from Judge Der-Yeghiayan's web page or from this Court's Courtroom Deputy. Counsel for the Plaintiff is warned that failure to serve summons and complaint on a Defendant will result in a dismissal of the action pursuant to FRCP 4. Counsel for Plaintiff is further directed to file with the Clerk of Court, the appropriate return of service or waiver of service. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, due to a clerical error, the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber was directly assigned and Magistrate Judge Daniel G. Martin was directly designated in the cases listed below; therefore It is hereby ordered that, the Clerk is to reassign these cases by lot to a district judge and designate a magistrate judge by lot. Case reassigned to the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/23/2013. (td, ) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Correction regarding document number 5 . (kj, ) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                            MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (kj, ) Modified on 9/18/2013 . (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                  CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                    COMPLAINT filed by TCYK, LLC ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8740127. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 184 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?