TCYK, LLC v. DOE
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06663
District Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 1:45 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
MAILED closing copyright report to Register of Copyrights, Washington D.C. (tlm) Modified on 11/14/2013 (tlm). (Entered: 11/14/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Doe Defendant (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Initial status hearing set for 11/19/13 at 9:00 a.m. At least four working days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall conduct a FRCP 26(f) conference and file a joint written Initial Status Report, not to exceed five pages in length, and file the Court's Joint Jurisdictional Status Report and deliver courtesy copies to this Court's Courtroom Deputy in Room 1908. The Court's standing orders on the Initial Status Report and Joint Jurisdictional Status Report maybe obtained from Judge Der-Yeghiayan's web page or from this Court's Courtroom Deputy. Counsel for the Plaintiff is warned that failure to serve summons and complaint on a Defendant will result in a dismissal of the action pursuant to FRCP 4. Counsel for Plaintiff is further directed to file with the Clerk of Court, the appropriate return of service or waiver of service. Mailed notice (mw,) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, due to a clerical error, the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber was directly assigned and Magistrate Judge Daniel G. Martin was directly designated in the cases listed below; therefore It is hereby ordered that, the Clerk is to reassign these cases by lot to a district judge and designate a magistrate judge by lot. Case reassigned to the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/23/2013. (td, ) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
          MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (tlm) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                  COMPLAINT filed by TCYK, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8739972. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 127 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?